Smith v. The City of New York et al

Plaintiff: Tyquan Smith
Defendant: Captain Jeffries, C.O. Lee, The City of New York, C.O. John/Jane Does #1-10, Captain Isler, Captain John Doe #1, Supervisor C.O. John/Jane Doe #1-2, Warden John/Jane Doe #1, C.O. Charles and City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2018cv08416
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/4/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (mml)
October 22, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER terminating #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ok. Conference adjourned to 1/4/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/4/2019) (mml)
October 22, 2018 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Galen Toews on behalf of City Of New York. (Toews, Mark)
October 19, 2018 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joanne M. McLaren dated October 19, 2018. Document filed by City Of New York.(McLaren, Joanne)
September 17, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/26/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/17/2018) (jca)
September 17, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents C.O. Charles, City Of New York, Captain Isler, Captain Jeffries, Captain John Doe #1, C.O. Lee, Supervisor C.O. John/Jane Doe #1-2, Warden John/Jane Doe #1, C.O. John/Jane Does #1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Tyquan Smith. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Adams, Martin)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 17, 2018 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.O. John/Jane Does #1-10, C.O. Charles, City Of New York, Captain Isler, Captain Jeffries, Captain John Doe #1, C.O. Lee, Supervisor C.O. John/Jane Doe #1-2, Warden John/Jane Doe #1. (pc)
September 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Martin Ellis Adams re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add C.O. John/Jane Does #1-10 to CM ECF with the party text "in their official capacities". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
September 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Martin Ellis Adams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Captain Isler, C.O. Charles, C.O. John/Jane Does #1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc)
September 14, 2018 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York; Warden John/Jane Doe # 1; Supervisor C.O. John/Jane Doe # 1-2; Captain Isler, Shield No. 929; Captain John Doe #1; C.O. Charles, Shield No. 7619; C.O. Lee; Captain Jeffries C.O. John/Jane Does #1-10, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tyquan Smith. (Adams, Martin)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Adams, Martin)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against C.O. John/Jane Does #1-10, C.O. Charles, Captain Isler, Captain Jeffries, Captain John Doe #1, C.O. Lee, Supervisor C.O. John/Jane Doe #1-2, The City of New York, Warden John/Jane Doe #1. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15575199)Document filed by Tyquan Smith.(Adams, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. John/Jane Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisor C.O. John/Jane Doe #1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden John/Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Joanne Maureen McLaren
Represented By: Mark Galen Toews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyquan Smith
Represented By: Martin Ellis Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?