Reclaim the Records et al v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Brooke Schreier Ganz and Reclaim the Records
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2018cv08449
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/5/2018) (anc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Reclaim the Records; Brooke Schreier Ganz. (Rankin, David)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service was accepted by Daniel Kennedy, Paralegal. Document filed by Reclaim the Records; Brooke Schreier Ganz. (Rankin, David)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (pne)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rankin, David)
September 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Bruce Rankin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Department of Veterans Affairs. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
September 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David Bruce Rankin to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: MULTIPLE NATURES OF SUIT SELECTED (440 & 895); PLEASE SELECT ONLY ONE. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, re: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Reclaim the Records, Brooke Schreier Ganz. (Rankin, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rankin, David) Modified on 9/18/2018 (pne).
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against United States Department of Veterans Affairs.Document filed by Reclaim the Records, Brooke Schreier Ganz. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Rankin, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15579397)Document filed by Reclaim the Records, Brooke Schreier Ganz.(Rankin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reclaim the Records et al v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Schreier Ganz
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reclaim the Records
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?