The New York Times Company et al v. Federal Communications Commission
Plaintiff: Nicholas Confessore, The New York Times Company and Gabriel Dance
Defendant: Federal Communications Commission
Case Number: 1:2018cv08607
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission.(Onozawa, Tomoko)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter filed by The New York Times Company, Gabriel Dance, Nicholas Confessore. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 15, 2018, is CANCELLED. The FCC shall file its motion for summary judgment by December 17, 2018. The Times shall file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to the FCCs motion by January 17, 2019. The FCC shall file its opposition to The Times's cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by February 15, 2019. The Times shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion by February 22, 2019. Each party is limited to a total of 45 pages of briefing, to be allocated between the two memoranda of law. (Cross Motions due by 1/17/2019, Motions due by 12/17/2018, Responses due by 2/15/2019, Replies due by 2/22/2019.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/9/2018) (jca) Modified on 11/9/2018 (jca).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David McCraw dated November 8, 2018 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Nicholas Confessore, Gabriel Dance, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated 10/11/2018. filed by Federal Communications Commission. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendant shall file its Answer by November 9, 2018. Federal Communications Commission answer due 11/9/2018. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/16/2018) (cf)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall file its Answer by November 2, 2018. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/12/2018) (jca) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jca).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Federal Communications Commission answer due 11/2/2018. (jca)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated 10/11/2018. Document filed by Federal Communications Commission.(Onozawa, Tomoko)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tomoko Onozawa on behalf of Federal Communications Commission. (Onozawa, Tomoko)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/2/2018) (jca)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Communications Commission. (jgo)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Communications Commission, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nicholas Confessore, Gabriel Dance, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero Inbursa for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Communications Commission. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15594454)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Gabriel Dance, Nicholas Confessore.(McCraw, David)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Communications Commission. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15594454)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Gabriel Dance, Nicholas Confessore.(McCraw, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The New York Times Company et al v. Federal Communications Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Communications Commission
Represented By: Tomoko Onozawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Confessore
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New York Times Company
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Dance
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?