Canfield et al v. SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Diana Weaver, Robert Canfield, Latrecia Onunkwor, Bonnie Kartz and David Ostermeyer
Defendant: SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc., DST Systems, Inc., John Does, Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc., The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc. and The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc., 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan
Case Number: 1:2018cv08913
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Andrew Schermerhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15894176. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Andrew Schermerhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15894176. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Canfield(individually), Robert Canfield(individually and for his individual account damages on behalf of the DST SYSTEMS, INC. 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN), Bonnie Kartz(individually), Bonnie Kartz(individually and for her individual account damages on behalf of the DST SYSTEMS, INC. 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN), Latrecia Onunkwor(individually), Latrecia Onunkwor(individually and for her individual account damages on behalf of the DST SYSTEMS, INC. 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN), David Ostermeyer(individually and for his individual account damages on behalf of the DST SYSTEMS, INC. 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN), David Ostermeyer(individually), Diana Weaver(individually and for her individual account damages on behalf of the DST SYSTEMS, INC. 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN), Diana Weaver(individually). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
November 1, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Bonnie Kartz, Robert Canfield, Latrecia Onunkwor, Diana Weaver, David Ostermeyer, Diana Weaver, David Ostermeyer, Latrecia Onunkwor, Robert Canfield, Bonnie Kartz added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Bonnie Kartz, Robert Canfield, Latrecia Onunkwor, Diana Weaver, David Ostermeyer, Diana Weaver, David Ostermeyer, Latrecia Onunkwor, Robert Canfield, Bonnie Kartz. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Katz, Joshua)
October 23, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
October 23, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
October 23, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-06685-ALC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
October 1, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. as possibly related to 17-cv-6685. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Joshua B Katz to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua B Katz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert Canfield; Bonnie Kartz; Latrecia Onunkwor; Diana Weaver; David Ostermeyer. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joshua B Katz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pdf case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua B Katz to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties Robert Canfield, Bonnie Kartz, Latrecia Onunkwor, Diana Weaver and David Ostermeyer with party text 'for their individual account damages on behalf of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) profit sharing plan'; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-6685. Document filed by Robert Canfield, Bonnie Kartz, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Ostermeyer, Diana Weaver.(Katz, Joshua) Modified on 10/1/2018 (jgo).
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Katz, Joshua) Modified on 10/1/2018 (jgo).
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against DST Systems, Inc., John Does, Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc., SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc., The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc., 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15633669)Document filed by Latrecia Onunkwor, Bonnie Kartz, Robert Canfield, Diana Weaver, David Ostermeyer.(Katz, Joshua) Modified on 10/1/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canfield et al v. SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Weaver
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Canfield
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrecia Onunkwor
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Kartz
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ostermeyer
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DST Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc., 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?