Philpot v. Gelman
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Andrew Gelman
Case Number: 1:2018cv08968
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Robert W. Clarida dated November 28, 2018 re: Stipulation of Discontinuance. Document filed by Andrew Gelman.(Clarida, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Andrew Gelman. (Clarida, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court has not received the joint status letter and proposed case management plan and scheduling order previously requested in the Court's October 18, 2018 order. The letter was due one week prior to the status conference set for December 4, 2018 at 4:20 p.m. The parties are directed to comply with the Courts October 18, 2018 order in its entirety forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/28/2018) (anc)
November 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrew Gelman answer due 12/19/2018. (anc)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION: Plaintiff and Defendants, by their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate and agree as follows: The date by which Defendants must answer or otherwise move in response to the Complaint filed in this Action shall be December 19, 2018. The date of the initial pretrial conference, originally scheduled for December 4, 2018 (ECF 11), shall be adjourned until January 4, 2018, or as soon thereafter as the Court shall direct. No previous extensions of any dates have been requested or granted. The parties' November 13, 2018 application to extend the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and adjourn the initial pretrial conference is granted in part and denied in part. Dkt. No. 13. The parties' application to extend the period of time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to December 19, 2018. The parties' application to adjourn the initial pretrial conference is denied. The initial pretrial conference set for December 4, 2018 will proceed as scheduled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/15/2018) (anc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Andrew Gelman served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Hutcherson, Kenton)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Andrew Gelman. (Clarida, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert William Clarida on behalf of Andrew Gelman. (Clarida, Robert)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 04:20 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/18/2018) (jca)
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Kenton James Hutcherson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Gelman. (pne)
October 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kenton James Hutcherson to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
October 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenton James Hutcherson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following corrections have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
October 2, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 2, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 2, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot.(Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Gelman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 1, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #2 MOTION for Kenton James Hutcherson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15640447. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hutcherson, Kenton) Modified on 10/2/2018 (pne).
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Kenton James Hutcherson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15640447. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutcherson, Kenton)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Gelman. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15640337)Document filed by Larry G. Philpot.(Hutcherson, Kenton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Gelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Gelman
Represented By: Robert William Clarida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Kenton James Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?