Bachner v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC

Plaintiff: Jeff Bachner
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv09192
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. NBCUniversal Media, LLC served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. Service was accepted by Sati Jarim, for CT Corporation System, Registered Agent. Document filed by Jeff Bachner. (Dunne, Joseph)
October 30, 2018 Terminate Mediation Case Tracking Deadlines: Mediator Assignment Deadline, Mediator Expertise Request Deadline (mf)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: This case, involving claims under the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. 101 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving copyright claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference, the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. No later than one week after the conclusion of all mediation in this case, the parties are directed to notify the Court whether they successfully resolved the case in mediation. The Court specifically requests that a mediator with expertise in copyright matters be assigned. To facilitate prompt mediation, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff: to file proof of service no more than three days after service has been effected; and to produce to Defendant, by the earlier of 1) 14 days after service of process or 2) three business days in advance of any mediation session, copies of records sufficient to show the royalty paid the last three times the picture that is at issue in this case was licensed, as well as the number of times the picture was licensed in the last five years. The Court further directs that the deadline for Defendant(s) to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be STAYED until 30 days after the conclusion of all Mediation in this case. SO ORDERED. ALL ISSUES ARE ELIGIBLE. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/29/2018. Mediator Expertise Request due by 10/22/2018. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/17/2018) (ama) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing.
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (pne)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
October 9, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 9, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 9, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NBCUniversal Media, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeff Bachner. (Dunne, Joseph)
October 8, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunne, Joseph)
October 8, 2018 Filing 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Dunne, Joseph)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15672706)Document filed by Jeff Bachner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bachner v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Bachner
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?