Sadowski v. Seeking Alpha, Inc.

Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Defendant: Seeking Alpha, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv09193
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David S. Korzenik dated 11/29/2018 re: Requesting that Your Honor extend Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint from December 3, 2018 to January 8, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for defendant(s) to answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint in this action is extended to 1-8-19. SO ORDERED. (Seeking Alpha, Inc. answer due 1/8/2019.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/30/2018) (jca)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Seeking Alpha Ltd. for Seeking Alpha, Inc.. Document filed by Seeking Alpha, Inc..(Keegan, Terence)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Terence Patrick Keegan on behalf of Seeking Alpha, Inc.. (Keegan, Terence)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David S. Korzenik on behalf of Seeking Alpha, Inc.. (Korzenik, David)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Request GRANTED. The time for defendant(s) to answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint in this action is extended to 12-3-18. (Seeking Alpha, Inc. answer due 12/3/2018.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/30/2018) (jwh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, On Consent of Both Parties addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Joseph Dunne, esq dated 10/30/2018. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski.(Dunne, Joseph)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seeking Alpha, Inc.. (pne)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
October 9, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 9, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 9, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Seeking Alpha, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Dunne, Joseph)
October 8, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunne, Joseph)
October 8, 2018 Filing 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Dunne, Joseph)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seeking Alpha, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15672989)Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadowski v. Seeking Alpha, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seeking Alpha, Inc.
Represented By: Terence Patrick Keegan
Represented By: David S. Korzenik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?