Kathy Wu v. Tousey Winery, LLC
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Defendant: Tousey WInery, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv09245
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Kathy Wu. (Marks, Bradly)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from David B. Shanies dated November 13, 2018. Document filed by Tousey Winery, LLC.(Shanies, David)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tousey Winery, LLC served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougerty, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Kathy Wu. (Marks, Bradly)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tousey Winery, LLC. (dnh)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TOUSEY WINERY, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kathy Wu. (Marks, Bradly)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Bradly)
October 10, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Bradly Gurion Marks. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
October 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 10, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bradly Gurion Marks. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kathy Wu. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tousey WInery, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15706005)Document filed by Kathy Wu.(Marks, Bradly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathy Wu v. Tousey Winery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Represented By: Bradly Gurion Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tousey WInery, LLC
Represented By: David Bradley Shanies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?