Berkley Custom Insurance Managers v. York Risk Services Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Berkley Custom Insurance Managers
Defendant: York Risk Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv09297
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkley Specialty Insurance Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Signet Star Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkley Custom Insurance Managers, Other Affiliate Berkley Insurance Company for Berkley Custom Insurance Managers. Document filed by Berkley Custom Insurance Managers.(Tobin, Rhonda)
October 17, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. York Risk Services Group, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. Document filed by Berkley Custom Insurance Managers. (Butts, Josiah)
October 17, 2018 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Josiah Tyler Denson Butts on behalf of Berkley Custom Insurance Managers. (Butts, Josiah)
October 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rhonda Joy Tobin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 1000000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
October 11, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Tobin, Rhonda)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against York Risk Services Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15726365)Document filed by Berkley Custom Insurance Managers.(Tobin, Rhonda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley Custom Insurance Managers v. York Risk Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley Custom Insurance Managers
Represented By: Rhonda Joy Tobin
Represented By: Josiah Tyler Denson Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Risk Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?