Abramson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Betty Abramson
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv09309
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
0 Judge: Sarah Netburn
1 Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2018 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Betty Abramson. (Gottesman, Josephine)
November 14, 2018 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (dnh)
November 13, 2018 9 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement and Social Security). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/13/2018) (rro)
November 13, 2018 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Betty Abramson. (Gottesman, Josephine)
October 13, 2018 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottesman, Josephine)
October 12, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/12/2018) (cf)
October 12, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/12/2018) (cf)
October 12, 2018 4 Featured Case STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Josephine Gottesman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Josephine Gottesman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand Code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 11, 2018 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Betty Abramson.(Gottesman, Josephine)
October 11, 2018 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottesman, Josephine) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jgo).
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Document filed by Betty Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Appeals Council denial)(Gottesman, Josephine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abramson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Abramson
Represented By: Josephine Gottesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?