Pearson v. Experian et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Pearson
Defendant: O'Reilly, Marsh & Corteselli PC, Equifax, Nassau Educators Federal Credit Union and Experian
Case Number: 1:2018cv09356
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file the joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by December 10, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/7/2018) (kgo)
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nassau Educators Federal Credit Union.(Bechtel, Lyndsey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against Equifax, Experian, O'Reilly, Marsh & Corteselli PC. Document filed by Nassau Educators Federal Credit Union.(Bechtel, Lyndsey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lyndsey Christine Bechtel on behalf of Nassau Educators Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Bechtel, Lyndsey)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by O'Reilly, Marsh & Corteselli PC.(Marsh, James)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Experian.(Tobitsch, Kerianne)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian. Document filed by Experian.(Tobitsch, Kerianne)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Equifax.(Klein, Jonathan)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James G. Marsh on behalf of O'Reilly, Marsh & Corteselli PC. (Marsh, James)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/22/2018) (jca)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward B. Geller on behalf of Vernon Pearson. (Geller, Edward)
October 17, 2018 Civil Case Opening Fee Refunded: for #4 Notice of Removal. Filing fee refunded for Receipt number ANYSDC-15748708, for the following reason(s): duplicate payment. (jom)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. The deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to November 19, 2018. Experian answer due 11/19/2018 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/17/2018) (cf)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Experian Information Solutions, Inc. dated October 16, 2018. Document filed by Experian.(Tobitsch, Kerianne)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerianne Tobitsch on behalf of Experian. (Tobitsch, Kerianne)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: CV-004643-18/HU. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15748708).Document filed by Equifax. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Consent to Removal, #2 Exhibit B -- State Court Complaint)(Klein, Jonathan)
October 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Daniel Klein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
October 15, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 15, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 15, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Daniel Klein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Suffolk; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax. Document filed by Equifax.(Klein, Jonathan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Klein, Jonathan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk. Case Number: 4643-18. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15739846).Document filed by Equifax. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Klein, Jonathan) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Experian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly, Marsh & Corteselli PC
Represented By: James G. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau Educators Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Lyndsey Christine Bechtel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Represented By: Kerianne Tobitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Pearson
Represented By: Edward B. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?