Shepard et al v. Wo Hop City, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shirley Shepard and Andrea Shepard
Defendant: Wo Hop City, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv09634
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wo Hop City, Inc. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh) Modified on 12/11/2018 (ama).
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #9 Certificate of Service Complaints (Deadline to Answer December 3, 2018) addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Morton S. Minsley, Esq. dated November 29, 2018. Document filed by Wo Hop City, Inc..(Minsley, Morton)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Morton Seth Minsley on behalf of Wo Hop City, Inc.. (Minsley, Morton)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Wo Hop City, Inc. served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. Service was accepted by Ana Ling Authorized Agent. Document filed by Shirley Shepard; Andrea Shepard. (Timpone, Andrea)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wo Hop City, Inc.. (dnh)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wo Hop City, Inc. d/b/a Wo Hop Restaurant, Inc., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea Shepard, Shirley Shepard. (Fladgate, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fladgate, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Wo Hop City, Inc.. Document filed by Shirley Shepard, Andrea Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Fladgate, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrea Terese Timpone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 17:501. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 17:101. (pne)
October 22, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrea Terese Timpone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrea Shepard, Wo Hop City, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pne)
October 22, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrea Terese Timpone to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
October 22, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 22, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 22, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Timpone, Andrea)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Timpone, Andrea)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Wo Hop City, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15781525)Document filed by Shirley Shepard, Andrea Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit Unsigned Version C&D Letter, #3 Exhibit Unsigned Version C&D Letter)(Timpone, Andrea) Modified on 10/22/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepard et al v. Wo Hop City, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Shepard
Represented By: Andrea Terese Timpone
Represented By: Christopher Jon Fladgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Shepard
Represented By: Andrea Terese Timpone
Represented By: Christopher Jon Fladgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wo Hop City, Inc.
Represented By: Morton Seth Minsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?