Citibank, N.A. v. Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC

Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.
Defendant: Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv09973
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332ni
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC.(Furman, Ariel)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on January 18, 2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by January 11, 2019, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by January 11, 2019, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Abrams. The status letter and the proposed case management plan should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Rules & Instructions, which were updated on August 1, 2018, and are available at nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf/ECF%20Rules%20080118%20Final.pdf. Please consult my Individual Rules and Practices with respect to communications with Chambers and related matters. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/31/18) (yv)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Service was accepted by Rachel L. Zamata, Owner and Principal for the Firm. Document filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Glickman, Barry)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glickman, Barry)
October 30, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Barry Jay Glickman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Barry Jay Glickman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand Code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Glickman, Barry)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup, Inc. for Citibank, N.A.. Document filed by Citibank, N.A..(Glickman, Barry)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glickman, Barry) Modified on 10/30/2018 (jgo).
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-15827201)Document filed by Citibank, N.A..(Glickman, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citibank, N.A. v. Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Rachel Zamata, LLC
Represented By: Ariel Michael Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Barry Jay Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?