Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. v. Pioneer Supermarket of the Bronx

Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.
Defendant: Pioneer Supermarket of the Bronx
Case Number: 1:2018cv10275
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Richard Liebowitz dated December 31, 2018. Document filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc..(Liebowitz, Richard)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Pioneer Supermarket of the Bronx served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. Document filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 11D at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/7/2018) (mro)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pioneer Supermarket of the Bronx. (pne)
November 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
November 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pioneer Supermarket of the Bronx, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pioneer Supermarket of the Bronx. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15868037)Document filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. v. Pioneer Supermarket of the Bronx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Supermarket of the Bronx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?