Owens v. John Doe of Store Vintage Wine and Spirits et al

Plaintiff: David S. Owens
Defendant: John Doe of Store Vintage Wine and Spirits, John Doe Doctor of Bellevue Hospital and Jane Doe Doctor of Mount Sinai Saint Luke's Hospital
Case Number: 1:2018cv10278
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to David S. Owens 18-A-2545/5325148Y Auburn Correctional Facility P.O. Box 618 Auburn, NY 13024 on 12/7/2018. (nb)
December 4, 2018 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #5 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from David Owens received on 12/4/18. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from David Owens, dated 11/10/18 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court inform him as to the status of this case. Document filed by David S. Owens.(sc)
November 21, 2018 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to David S. Owens 18-A-2545/5325148Y Auburn Correctional Facility P.O. Box 618 Auburn, NY 13024 on 11/21/2018. (nb)
November 16, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted Request for Docket Sheet. re: #4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION etc. Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (sc) Modified on 11/20/2018 (sc).
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by David S. Owens.(sc)
November 6, 2018 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Prisoner Authorization, to David S. Owens 18-A-2545/5325148Y Auburn Correctional Facility P.O. Box 618 Auburn, NY 13024. (aea)
November 6, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 12/6/2018. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/6/2018) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization)(dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 5, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe Doctor of Mount Sinai Saint Luke's Hospital, John Doe Doctor of Bellevue Hospital, John Doe of Store Vintage Wine and Spirits. Document filed by David S. Owens.(rdz)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by David S. Owens.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. John Doe of Store Vintage Wine and Spirits et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe of Store Vintage Wine and Spirits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Doctor of Bellevue Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Doctor of Mount Sinai Saint Luke's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?