Bank of America, N.A. v. Jash Diamonds, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bank of America,N.A
Defendant: Jash Diamonds, Inc., Maulesh Desai and Kashmira Desai
Case Number: 1:2018cv10339
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Kashmira Desai served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A. (Samuels, Michael)
December 6, 2018 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Maulesh Desai served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A. (Samuels, Michael)
December 6, 2018 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Jash Diamonds, Inc. served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A. (Samuels, Michael)
November 8, 2018 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maulesh Desai. (pne)
November 8, 2018 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kashmira Desai. (pne)
November 8, 2018 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maulesh Desai,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A. (Samuels, Michael)
November 8, 2018 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kashmira Desai,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A. (Samuels, Michael)
November 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Adam Samuels to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name entered in the 'To' field on the PDF does not match party name entered in the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
November 8, 2018 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jash Diamonds, Inc.. (pne)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/8/2018) (cf)
November 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Adam Samuels. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bank of America,N.A, Jash Diamonds, Inc., Maulesh Desai, Kashmira Desai. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
November 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Adam Samuels. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
November 8, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 8, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 8, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 7, 2018 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint,,. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15876240.(Samuels, Michael)
November 7, 2018 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation for Bank of America,N.A. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A.(Samuels, Michael)
November 7, 2018 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Samuels, Michael)
November 7, 2018 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kashmira Desai,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A. (Samuels, Michael) Modified on 11/8/2018 (pne).
November 7, 2018 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maulesh Desai,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A. (Samuels, Michael) Modified on 11/8/2018 (pne).
November 7, 2018 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jash Diamonds, Inc.,, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A. (Samuels, Michael)
November 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Jash Diamonds, Inc., Kashmira Desai, Maulesh Desai. Document filed by Bank of America,N.A. (Attachments: #1 LOC Loan Agreement, #2 Security Agreement, #3 Amendment 1 to Loan Agreement, #4 Amendment 2 to Loan Agreement, #5 Amendment 3 to Loan Agreement, #6 Guaranties, #7 Amendment 4 to Loan Agreement, #8 Amendment 5 to Loan Agreement, #9 First Default Notice, #10 First Default Notice, #11 Third Default Notice, #12 UCC Recordings)(Samuels, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Jash Diamonds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America,N.A
Represented By: Michael Adam Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jash Diamonds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maulesh Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kashmira Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?