Schwartzwald v. Viacom International Inc.

Plaintiff: Lawrence Schwartzwald
Defendant: Viacom International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10369
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
0 Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
1 Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 1/03/2019 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ama)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The attorneys for the parties have advised the Court that this action has been or will be settled. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party, but without prejudice to restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned if settlement is not achieved within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order. If a party wishes to reopen this matter or extend the time within which it may be settled, the party must make a letter application before this forty-five (45)-day period expires. The parties are advised that if they wish the Court to retain jurisdiction in this matter for purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they shall submit the settlement agreement to the Court to be so ordered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/03/2019) (ama)
December 31, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Lawrence Schwartzwald. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang; and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/29/2018) (rro)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Viacom International Inc. answer due 12/21/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/29/2018) (rro)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Adam Chase on behalf of Viacom International Inc.. (Chase, Jeremy)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Jeremy Chase dated 11/29/2018. Document filed by Viacom International Inc..(Chase, Jeremy)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The application is DENIED without prejudice. Defendant's counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance, after which, said counsel may renew the request for relief. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on counsel for Defendant. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/27/2018) (rro)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/21/2018) (ama)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Richard Liebowitz dated November 16, 2018. Document filed by Lawrence Schwartzwald.(Liebowitz, Richard)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Viacom International Inc.. (sj)
November 8, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 8, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
November 8, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Liebowitz, Richard)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Viacom International Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lawrence Schwartzwald. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Viacom International Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15881174)Document filed by Lawrence Schwartzwald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartzwald v. Viacom International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Schwartzwald
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom International Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Adam Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?