Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC v. Dell Inc.
Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10454
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #11 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, . . Document filed by Dell Inc..(Simpson, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Matthew Simpson on behalf of Dell Inc.. (Simpson, Todd)
November 29, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Dorian S. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15976534. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Dorian S. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15976534. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Berger, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Dorian)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, . Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Daniel Paul Hipskind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15934275. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Daniel Paul Hipskind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15934275. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hipskind, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dell Inc. served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares - Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hipskind, Daniel)
November 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Daniel Paul Hipskind to RE-FILE Document No. #3 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; Use only one AO 120 form. If all the registration numbers can not fit on one form, use a rider listing them all. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (pc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dell Inc.. (pc)
November 13, 2018 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
November 13, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 18cv10180. (pc)
November 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
November 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Paul Hipskind. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Daniel P. Hipskind re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-10180. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC.(Hipskind, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC.(Hipskind, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dell Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Hipskind, Daniel) Modified on 11/13/2018 (pc).
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hipskind, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dell Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15893908)Document filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Hipskind, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC v. Dell Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Paul Hipskind
Represented By: Dorian S. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Todd Matthew Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?