Fortitude Financial Investments Inc. v. LStar Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Fortitude Financial Investments Inc.
Defendant: LStar Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv10744
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by LStar Management, LLC.(Wengrovsky, Todd)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LStar Management, LLC.(Wengrovsky, Todd)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Wengrovsky on behalf of LStar Management, LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED. By January 8, 2019, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. LStar Management, LLC answer due 1/8/2019 (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/19/2018) (cf)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Kristen B. Weil dated December 18, 2018. Document filed by Fortitude Financial Investments Inc..(Weil, Kristen)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED. By December 18, 2018, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. LStar Management, LLC answer due 12/18/2018 (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/10/2018) (cf)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Kristen Weil dated December 10, 2018. Document filed by Fortitude Financial Investments Inc..(Weil, Kristen)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. LStar Management, LLC served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service was accepted by Sandy Maher, Operations Manager. Document filed by Fortitude Financial Investments Inc.. (Weil, Kristen)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/23/2019 at 11:20 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further sets forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/19/2018) (cf)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/19/2018) (cf)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Godfrey Della Fera on behalf of Fortitude Financial Investments Inc.. (Della Fera, Stephen)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LStar Management, LLC. (pc)
November 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kristen Bradbury Weil. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $9,000,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (pc) Modified on 11/19/2018 (pc).
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fortitude Financial Investments Inc..(Weil, Kristen)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weil, Kristen)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LStar Management LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Fortitude Financial Investments Inc.. (Weil, Kristen)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LStar Management, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15926271)Document filed by Fortitude Financial Investments Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Complaint, #8 Exhibit H to Complaint, #9 Exhibit I to Complaint, #10 Exhibit J to Complaint)(Weil, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortitude Financial Investments Inc. v. LStar Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LStar Management, LLC
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortitude Financial Investments Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Bradbury Weil
Represented By: Stephen Godfrey Della Fera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?