Alarcon et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Plaintiff: Ing Shan Jang, Adam Katz, Joyce Meyers, Veronica Elizabeth Gil Franco, Hector Franco, Catherine Hillmann, Peter Bako, Richard Eckert, Helen Katz, Michael Hresko, Janet Boyd, Galina Gervas, Mariela Fajardo, Eugenia Borawska, Karen Gutierrez, James Gawlick, Howard Kupersmith, Michael Jacoby, John Ednie, Harry Martin, Adelaida Marcial, Debra Cizike, Jose Gutierrez, Meibol Alarcon, Viviana Gutierrez, Joe Ching Lee, Kyle Mitts, Mathew Coleman, Hector Gutierrez, Jr., Leroy Johnson, Ing Chi Jang, Edward T. DiTomasso, Laurie E. Dillion, William Gavin, Giuseppe Chieffo, Kerry Leigh, Mark Belton, Robert Carroll, Samantha Hillmann, Brian Hillmann, Caroline Mechanick, Sandi Katz, Helena Lysakowski, Marsha Ford, Felix Lopez, Richard Alejo, Oksana Gervas, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang, Cassandra Belgrave, Marissa Bonnelly, Fidel Cruz, Janet Bonnelly, Carlos Monroy, Donna Ficara, Colleen Herzog, Bernard Bonnelly, Ryszard Krysiuk, Jeffrey Bernstein, Jesse A. Mechanick, Socorro Manoloto, Anita Berger, Daysi Jaramillo, James Evensen, Debra Dasaro, Gina Gutierrez, Junior Ivan Almendarez, Conor Mitts, Patricia Miller, Bartosz Lysakowski and Anna Marie Brillantes
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina and Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv10779
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
November 28, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
November 28, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
November 28, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
November 28, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grochow, Robert)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. Document filed by Patricia Miller, Viviana Gutierrez(as the Administrator of the Estate of Hector Gutierrez and on behalf of all survivors of Hector Gutierrez), Cassandra Belgrave, Junior Ivan Almendarez, Conor Mitts, Caroline Mechanick, Donna Ficara(as the Administrator of the Estate of Anthony Ficara and on behalf of all survivors of Anthony Ficara), Laurie E. Dillion, Oksana Gervas, Janet Boyd(as the Executor of the Estate of Bruce Boyd and on behalf of all survivors of Bruce Boyd), Joe Ching Lee, Anna Marie Brillantes, Hector Gutierrez, Jr., Galina Gervas, Conor Mitts(as the Co-executor of the Estate Sean M. Mitts and on behalf of all survivors of Sean M. Mitts), Joyce Meyers, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang, Hector Franco, Ryszard Krysiuk, Eugenia Borawska, Colleen Herzog(as the Administrator of the Estate of Joseph Herzog and on behalf of all survivors of Joseph Herzog), Brian Hillmann, Karen Gutierrez, Jeffrey Bernstein(, as the Executor of the Estate of Murray Bernstein and on behalf of all survivors of Murray Bernstein), Veronica Elizabeth Gil Franco, Jeffrey Bernstein, James Gawlick, Michael Jacoby, Debra Cizike(as the Administrator of the Estate of James Cizike and on behalf of all survivors of James Cizike), Junior Ivan Almendarez(as the Administrator of the Estate of Maria Gonzales-Almendarez and on behalf of all survivors of Maria Gonzales-Almendarez), Bartosz Lysakowski, Catherine Hillmann, Oksana Gervas(as the Administrator of the Estate of Iaroslav Gervas and on behalf of all survivors of Iaroslav Gervas), Adam Katz, Daysi Jaramillo, Gina Gutierrez, Robert Carroll(as the Administrator of the Estate of Lucille Carroll and on behalf of all survivors of Lucille Carroll ), Debra Cizike, Colleen Herzog, Bernard Bonnelly(as the Administrator of the Estate of James Paul Bonnelly and on behalf of all survivors of James Paul Bonnelly), Edward T. DiTomasso, Viviana Gutierrez, Marissa Bonnelly, Samantha Hillmann, Viviana Gutierrez(Viviana Gutierrez, as the mother and natural guardian of C.N.G., the Minor Child of Hector Gutierrez, deceased), Robert Carroll, James Evensen, Mariela Fajardo, Kerry Leigh, Giuseppe Chieffo, Mathew Coleman, Laurie E. Dillion(as the Executor of the Estate of Timothy Dillion and on behalf of all survivors of Timothy Dillion), John Ednie, Debra Dasaro(as the Executor of the Estate of Dominick Dasaro and on behalf of all survivors of Dominick Dasaro), Harry Martin, Felix Lopez, Carlos Monroy, Ing Shan Jang, Debra Dasaro, Meibol Alarcon, Janet Boyd, Meibol Alarcon(as Administrator of the Estate of Thomas Alarcon and on behalf of all survivors of Thomas Alarcon), Caroline Mechanick(as the Administrator of the Estate of Peter David Mechanick and on behalf of all survivors of Peter David Mechanick), Helen Katz, Viviana Gutierrez(as the mother and natural guardian of B.A.G., the Minor Child, of Hector Gutierrez, deceased), Richard Eckert, William Gavin, Jesse A. Mechanick, Socorro Manoloto, Kyle Mitts, Howard Kupersmith, Janet Bonnelly, Adelaida Marcial, Sandi Katz, Kyle Mitts(as the Co-executor of the Estate Sean M. Mitts and on behalf of all survivors of Sean M. Mitts), Marsha Ford, Catherine Hillmann(as the Administrator of the Estate of John W. Hillmann and on behalf of all survivors of John W. Hillmann), Leroy Johnson, Michael Hresko, Edward T. DiTomasso(as the Administrator of the Estate of Edward A. DiTomasso and on behalf of all survivors of Edward A, DiTomasso), Fidel Cruz, Bernard Bonnelly, Donna Ficara, Ing Chi Jang, Mark Belton, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang( as the Administrator of the Estate of Ing-Ping Eve Jang and on behalf of all survivors of Ing-Ping Eve Jang), Richard Alejo, Anita Berger, Jose Gutierrez, Bartosz Lysakowski(as Administrator of the Estate of Waldemar Lysakowski and on behalf of all survivors of Waldemar Lysakowski), Anita Berger(as Administrator of the Estate of Philip Berger and on behalf of all survivors of Philip Berger), Peter Bako, Helena Lysakowski, Helen Katz(as the Executrix of the Estate of Hal Katz and on behalf of all survivors of Hal Katz), Mark Belton(as the Administrator of the Estate of Margaret Belton and on behalf of all survivors of Margaret Belton ).(Grochow, Robert)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (sj)
November 21, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
November 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Allen Grochow to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Cover Sheet was not signed by filing attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
November 21, 2018 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-15931380, paid on 11/19/2018. (sj)
November 21, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
November 21, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Allen Grochow to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03md1570. Document filed by Meibol Alarcon, Meibol Alarcon(as Administrator of the Estate of Thomas Alarcon and on behalf of all survivors of Thomas Alarcon), Richard Alejo, Junior Ivan Almendarez, Junior Ivan Almendarez(as the Administrator of the Estate of Maria Gonzales-Almendarez and on behalf of all survivors of Maria Gonzales-Almendarez), Peter Bako, Cassandra Belgrave, Mark Belton, Mark Belton(as the Administrator of the Estate of Margaret Belton and on behalf of all survivors of Margaret Belton ), Anita Berger, Anita Berger(as Administrator of the Estate of Philip Berger and on behalf of all survivors of Philip Berger), Jeffrey Bernstein(, as the Executor of the Estate of Murray Bernstein and on behalf of all survivors of Murray Bernstein), Jeffrey Bernstein, Bernard Bonnelly(as the Administrator of the Estate of James Paul Bonnelly and on behalf of all survivors of James Paul Bonnelly), Bernard Bonnelly, Janet Bonnelly, Marissa Bonnelly, Eugenia Borawska, Janet Boyd(as the Executor of the Estate of Bruce Boyd and on behalf of all survivors of Bruce Boyd), Janet Boyd, Anna Marie Brillantes, Robert Carroll(as the Administrator of the Estate of Lucille Carroll and on behalf of all survivors of Lucille Carroll ), Robert Carroll, Giuseppe Chieffo, Joe Ching Lee, Debra Cizike(as the Administrator of the Estate of James Cizike and on behalf of all survivors of James Cizike), Debra Cizike, Mathew Coleman, Fidel Cruz, Debra Dasaro(as the Executor of the Estate of Dominick Dasaro and on behalf of all survivors of Dominick Dasaro), Debra Dasaro, Edward T. DiTomasso, Edward T. DiTomasso(as the Administrator of the Estate of Edward A. DiTomasso and on behalf of all survivors of Edward A, DiTomasso), Laurie E. Dillion, Laurie E. Dillion(as the Executor of the Estate of Timothy Dillion and on behalf of all survivors of Timothy Dillion), Richard Eckert, John Ednie, James Evensen, Mariela Fajardo, Donna Ficara(as the Administrator of the Estate of Anthony Ficara and on behalf of all survivors of Anthony Ficara), Donna Ficara, Marsha Ford, Hector Franco, William Gavin, James Gawlick, Galina Gervas, Oksana Gervas, Oksana Gervas(as the Administrator of the Estate of Iaroslav Gervas and on behalf of all survivors of Iaroslav Gervas), Veronica Elizabeth Gil Franco, Gina Gutierrez, Jose Gutierrez, Karen Gutierrez, Viviana Gutierrez(as the Administrator of the Estate of Hector Gutierrez and on behalf of all survivors of Hector Gutierrez), Viviana Gutierrez, Viviana Gutierrez(Viviana Gutierrez, as the mother and natural guardian of C.N.G., the Minor Child of Hector Gutierrez, deceased), Viviana Gutierrez(as the mother and natural guardian of B.A.G., the Minor Child, of Hector Gutierrez, deceased), Hector Gutierrez, Jr., Colleen Herzog(as the Administrator of the Estate of Joseph Herzog and on behalf of all survivors of Joseph Herzog), Colleen Herzog, Brian Hillmann, Catherine Hillmann, Catherine Hillmann(as the Administrator of the Estate of John W. Hillmann and on behalf of all survivors of John W. Hillmann), Samantha Hillmann, Michael Hresko, Michael Jacoby, Ing Chi Jang, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang( as the Administrator of the Estate of Ing-Ping Eve Jang and on behalf of all survivors of Ing-Ping Eve Jang), Ing Shan Jang, Daysi Jaramillo, Leroy Johnson, Adam Katz, Helen Katz, Helen Katz(as the Executrix of the Estate of Hal Katz and on behalf of all survivors of Hal Katz), Sandi Katz, Ryszard Krysiuk, Howard Kupersmith, Kerry Leigh, Felix Lopez, Bartosz Lysakowski, Bartosz Lysakowski(as Administrator of the Estate of Waldemar Lysakowski and on behalf of all survivors of Waldemar Lysakowski), Helena Lysakowski, Socorro Manoloto, Adelaida Marcial, Harry Martin, Jesse A. Mechanick, Caroline Mechanick, Caroline Mechanick(as the Administrator of the Estate of Peter David Mechanick and on behalf of all survivors of Peter David Mechanick), Joyce Meyers, Patricia Miller, Conor Mitts, Conor Mitts(as the Co-executor of the Estate Sean M. Mitts and on behalf of all survivors of Sean M. Mitts), Kyle Mitts, Kyle Mitts(as the Co-executor of the Estate Sean M. Mitts and on behalf of all survivors of Sean M. Mitts), Carlos Monroy.(Grochow, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Gregory J. Cannata and Robert A. Grochow dated 11/19/18 re: Joining 03 MDL 01570-GBD-SN In Re: Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001. Document filed by Meibol Alarcon, Meibol Alarcon(as Administrator of the Estate of Thomas Alarcon and on behalf of all survivors of Thomas Alarcon), Richard Alejo, Junior Ivan Almendarez, Junior Ivan Almendarez(as the Administrator of the Estate of Maria Gonzales-Almendarez and on behalf of all survivors of Maria Gonzales-Almendarez), Peter Bako, Cassandra Belgrave, Mark Belton, Mark Belton(as the Administrator of the Estate of Margaret Belton and on behalf of all survivors of Margaret Belton ), Anita Berger, Anita Berger(as Administrator of the Estate of Philip Berger and on behalf of all survivors of Philip Berger), Jeffrey Bernstein(, as the Executor of the Estate of Murray Bernstein and on behalf of all survivors of Murray Bernstein), Jeffrey Bernstein, Bernard Bonnelly(as the Administrator of the Estate of James Paul Bonnelly and on behalf of all survivors of James Paul Bonnelly), Bernard Bonnelly, Janet Bonnelly, Marissa Bonnelly, Eugenia Borawska, Janet Boyd(as the Executor of the Estate of Bruce Boyd and on behalf of all survivors of Bruce Boyd), Janet Boyd, Anna Marie Brillantes, Robert Carroll(as the Administrator of the Estate of Lucille Carroll and on behalf of all survivors of Lucille Carroll ), Robert Carroll, Giuseppe Chieffo, Joe Ching Lee, Debra Cizike(as the Administrator of the Estate of James Cizike and on behalf of all survivors of James Cizike), Debra Cizike, Mathew Coleman, Fidel Cruz, Debra Dasaro(as the Executor of the Estate of Dominick Dasaro and on behalf of all survivors of Dominick Dasaro), Debra Dasaro, Edward T. DiTomasso, Edward T. DiTomasso(as the Administrator of the Estate of Edward A. DiTomasso and on behalf of all survivors of Edward A, DiTomasso), Laurie E. Dillion, Laurie E. Dillion(as the Executor of the Estate of Timothy Dillion and on behalf of all survivors of Timothy Dillion), Richard Eckert, John Ednie, James Evensen, Mariela Fajardo, Donna Ficara(as the Administrator of the Estate of Anthony Ficara and on behalf of all survivors of Anthony Ficara), Donna Ficara, Marsha Ford, Hector Franco, William Gavin, James Gawlick, Galina Gervas, Oksana Gervas, Oksana Gervas(as the Administrator of the Estate of Iaroslav Gervas and on behalf of all survivors of Iaroslav Gervas), Veronica Elizabeth Gil Franco, Gina Gutierrez, Jose Gutierrez, Karen Gutierrez, Viviana Gutierrez(as the Administrator of the Estate of Hector Gutierrez and on behalf of all survivors of Hector Gutierrez), Viviana Gutierrez, Viviana Gutierrez(Viviana Gutierrez, as the mother and natural guardian of C.N.G., the Minor Child of Hector Gutierrez, deceased), Viviana Gutierrez(as the mother and natural guardian of B.A.G., the Minor Child, of Hector Gutierrez, deceased), Hector Gutierrez, Jr., Colleen Herzog(as the Administrator of the Estate of Joseph Herzog and on behalf of all survivors of Joseph Herzog), Colleen Herzog, Brian Hillmann, Catherine Hillmann, Catherine Hillmann(as the Administrator of the Estate of John W. Hillmann and on behalf of all survivors of John W. Hillmann), Samantha Hillmann, Michael Hresko, Michael Jacoby, Ing Chi Jang, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang( as the Administrator of the Estate of Ing-Ping Eve Jang and on behalf of all survivors of Ing-Ping Eve Jang), Ing Shan Jang, Daysi Jaramillo, Leroy Johnson, Adam Katz, Helen Katz, Helen Katz(as the Executrix of the Estate of Hal Katz and on behalf of all survivors of Hal Katz), Sandi Katz, Ryszard Krysiuk, Howard Kupersmith, Kerry Leigh, Felix Lopez, Bartosz Lysakowski, Bartosz Lysakowski(as Administrator of the Estate of Waldemar Lysakowski and on behalf of all survivors of Waldemar Lysakowski), Helena Lysakowski, Socorro Manoloto, Adelaida Marcial, Harry Martin, Jesse A. Mechanick, Caroline Mechanick, Caroline Mechanick(as the Administrator of the Estate of Peter David Mechanick and on behalf of all survivors of Peter David Mechanick), Joyce Meyers, Patricia Miller, Conor Mitts, Conor Mitts(as the Co-executor of the Estate Sean M. Mitts and on behalf of all survivors of Sean M. Mitts), Kyle Mitts, Kyle Mitts(as the Co-executor of the Estate Sean M. Mitts and on behalf of all survivors of Sean M. Mitts), Carlos Monroy.(Grochow, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gregory J. Cannata and Robert A. Grochow dated 11/19/18 re: Joining 03 MDL 01570-GBD-SN In Re: Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001. Document filed by Meibol Alarcon, Meibol Alarcon(as Administrator of the Estate of Thomas Alarcon and on behalf of all survivors of Thomas Alarcon), Richard Alejo, Junior Ivan Almendarez, Junior Ivan Almendarez(as the Administrator of the Estate of Maria Gonzales-Almendarez and on behalf of all survivors of Maria Gonzales-Almendarez), Peter Bako, Cassandra Belgrave, Mark Belton, Mark Belton(as the Administrator of the Estate of Margaret Belton and on behalf of all survivors of Margaret Belton ), Anita Berger, Anita Berger(as Administrator of the Estate of Philip Berger and on behalf of all survivors of Philip Berger), Jeffrey Bernstein(, as the Executor of the Estate of Murray Bernstein and on behalf of all survivors of Murray Bernstein), Jeffrey Bernstein, Bernard Bonnelly(as the Administrator of the Estate of James Paul Bonnelly and on behalf of all survivors of James Paul Bonnelly), Bernard Bonnelly, Janet Bonnelly, Marissa Bonnelly, Eugenia Borawska, Janet Boyd(as the Executor of the Estate of Bruce Boyd and on behalf of all survivors of Bruce Boyd), Janet Boyd, Anna Marie Brillantes, Robert Carroll(as the Administrator of the Estate of Lucille Carroll and on behalf of all survivors of Lucille Carroll ), Robert Carroll, Giuseppe Chieffo, Joe Ching Lee, Debra Cizike(as the Administrator of the Estate of James Cizike and on behalf of all survivors of James Cizike), Debra Cizike, Mathew Coleman, Fidel Cruz, Debra Dasaro(as the Executor of the Estate of Dominick Dasaro and on behalf of all survivors of Dominick Dasaro), Debra Dasaro, Edward T. DiTomasso, Edward T. DiTomasso(as the Administrator of the Estate of Edward A. DiTomasso and on behalf of all survivors of Edward A, DiTomasso), Laurie E. Dillion, Laurie E. Dillion(as the Executor of the Estate of Timothy Dillion and on behalf of all survivors of Timothy Dillion), Richard Eckert, John Ednie, James Evensen, Mariela Fajardo, Donna Ficara(as the Administrator of the Estate of Anthony Ficara and on behalf of all survivors of Anthony Ficara), Donna Ficara, Marsha Ford, Hector Franco, William Gavin, James Gawlick, Galina Gervas, Oksana Gervas, Oksana Gervas(as the Administrator of the Estate of Iaroslav Gervas and on behalf of all survivors of Iaroslav Gervas), Veronica Elizabeth Gil Franco, Gina Gutierrez, Jose Gutierrez, Karen Gutierrez, Viviana Gutierrez(as the Administrator of the Estate of Hector Gutierrez and on behalf of all survivors of Hector Gutierrez), Viviana Gutierrez, Viviana Gutierrez(Viviana Gutierrez, as the mother and natural guardian of C.N.G., the Minor Child of Hector Gutierrez, deceased), Viviana Gutierrez(as the mother and natural guardian of B.A.G., the Minor Child, of Hector Gutierrez, deceased), Hector Gutierrez, Jr., Colleen Herzog(as the Administrator of the Estate of Joseph Herzog and on behalf of all survivors of Joseph Herzog), Colleen Herzog, Brian Hillmann, Catherine Hillmann, Catherine Hillmann(as the Administrator of the Estate of John W. Hillmann and on behalf of all survivors of John W. Hillmann), Samantha Hillmann, Michael Hresko, Michael Jacoby, Ing Chi Jang, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang( as the Administrator of the Estate of Ing-Ping Eve Jang and on behalf of all survivors of Ing-Ping Eve Jang), Ing Shan Jang, Daysi Jaramillo, Leroy Johnson, Adam Katz, Helen Katz, Helen Katz(as the Executrix of the Estate of Hal Katz and on behalf of all survivors of Hal Katz), Sandi Katz, Ryszard Krysiuk, Howard Kupersmith, Kerry Leigh, Felix Lopez, Bartosz Lysakowski, Bartosz Lysakowski(as Administrator of the Estate of Waldemar Lysakowski and on behalf of all survivors of Waldemar Lysakowski), Helena Lysakowski, Socorro Manoloto, Adelaida Marcial, Harry Martin, Jesse A. Mechanick, Caroline Mechanick, Caroline Mechanick(as the Administrator of the Estate of Peter David Mechanick and on behalf of all survivors of Peter David Mechanick), Joyce Meyers, Patricia Miller, Conor Mitts, Conor Mitts(as the Co-executor of the Estate Sean M. Mitts and on behalf of all survivors of Sean M. Mitts), Kyle Mitts, Kyle Mitts(as the Co-executor of the Estate Sean M. Mitts and on behalf of all survivors of Sean M. Mitts), Carlos Monroy.(Grochow, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA and SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION FOR RELIEF OF BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Grochow, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grochow, Robert) Modified on 11/21/2018 (sj).
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. Document filed by Jeffrey Bernstein, Cassandra Belgrave, Janet Boyd, Meibol Alarcon, Meibol Alarcon(as Administrator of the Estate of Thomas Alarcon and on behalf of all survivors of Thomas Alarcon), Janet Boyd(as the Executor of the Estate of Bruce Boyd and on behalf of all survivors of Bruce Boyd), Bernard Bonnelly, Mark Belton, Richard Alejo, Anita Berger, Bernard Bonnelly(as the Administrator of the Estate of James Paul Bonnelly and on behalf of all survivors of James Paul Bonnelly), Janet Bonnelly, Marissa Bonnelly, Anita Berger(as Administrator of the Estate of Philip Berger and on behalf of all survivors of Philip Berger), Peter Bako, Jeffrey Bernstein(, as the Executor of the Estate of Murray Bernstein and on behalf of all survivors of Murray Bernstein), Mark Belton(as the Administrator of the Estate of Margaret Belton and on behalf of all survivors of Margaret Belton ).(Grochow, Robert) Modified on 11/21/2018 (sj).
November 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Richard Eckert, Edward T. DiTomasso, Joe Ching Lee, Fidel Cruz, Debra Cizike, Robert Carroll, Robert Carroll, John Ednie, Mariela Fajardo, Edward T. DiTomasso, James Evensen, Laurie E. Dillion, Debra Cizike, Giuseppe Chieffo, Debra Dasaro, Debra Dasaro, Laurie E. Dillion, Anna Marie Brillantes, Mathew Coleman added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,.Document filed by Richard Eckert, Edward T. DiTomasso, Joe Ching Lee, Fidel Cruz, Debra Cizike, Robert Carroll, Robert Carroll, John Ednie, Mariela Fajardo, Edward T. DiTomasso, James Evensen, Laurie E. Dillion, Debra Cizike, Giuseppe Chieffo, Debra Dasaro, Debra Dasaro, Laurie E. Dillion, Anna Marie Brillantes, Mathew Coleman. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,.(Grochow, Robert)
November 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Socorro Manoloto, Patricia Miller, Adelaida Marcial, Bartosz Lysakowski, Bartosz Lysakowski, Kyle Mitts, Conor Mitts, Conor Mitts, Kyle Mitts, Caroline Mechanick, Carlos Monroy, Hector Gutierrez, Jr., Jesse A. Mechanick, Joyce Meyers, Helena Lysakowski, Harry Martin, Caroline Mechanick added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,.Document filed by Socorro Manoloto, Patricia Miller, Adelaida Marcial, Bartosz Lysakowski, Bartosz Lysakowski, Kyle Mitts, Conor Mitts, Conor Mitts, Kyle Mitts, Caroline Mechanick, Carlos Monroy, Hector Gutierrez, Jr., Jesse A. Mechanick, Joyce Meyers, Helena Lysakowski, Harry Martin, Caroline Mechanick. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,.(Grochow, Robert)
November 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Samantha Hillmann, William Gavin, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang, Junior Ivan Almendarez, Brian Hillmann, James Gawlick, Catherine Hillmann, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang, Colleen Herzog, Donna Ficara, Kerry Leigh, Colleen Herzog, Donna Ficara, Michael Jacoby, Ryszard Krysiuk, Jose Gutierrez, Veronica Elizabeth Gil Franco, Hector Franco, Helen Katz, Junior Ivan Almendarez, Leroy Johnson, Gina Gutierrez, Oksana Gervas, Viviana Gutierrez, Ing Shan Jang, Catherine Hillmann, Adam Katz, Howard Kupersmith, Viviana Gutierrez, Felix Lopez, Helen Katz, Michael Hresko, Sandi Katz, Viviana Gutierrez, Daysi Jaramillo, Karen Gutierrez, Viviana Gutierrez, Marsha Ford, Oksana Gervas, Ing Chi Jang, Galina Gervas, Eugenia Borawska added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,.Document filed by Samantha Hillmann, William Gavin, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang, Junior Ivan Almendarez, Brian Hillmann, James Gawlick, Catherine Hillmann, Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang, Colleen Herzog, Donna Ficara, Kerry Leigh, Colleen Herzog, Donna Ficara, Michael Jacoby, Ryszard Krysiuk, Jose Gutierrez, Veronica Elizabeth Gil Franco, Hector Franco, Helen Katz, Junior Ivan Almendarez, Leroy Johnson, Gina Gutierrez, Oksana Gervas, Viviana Gutierrez, Ing Shan Jang, Catherine Hillmann, Adam Katz, Howard Kupersmith, Viviana Gutierrez, Felix Lopez, Helen Katz, Michael Hresko, Sandi Katz, Viviana Gutierrez, Daysi Jaramillo, Karen Gutierrez, Viviana Gutierrez, Marsha Ford, Oksana Gervas, Ing Chi Jang, Galina Gervas, Eugenia Borawska. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,.(Grochow, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alarcon et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ing Shan Jang
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Katz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Meyers
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Elizabeth Gil Franco
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Franco
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Hillmann
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Bako
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Eckert
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Katz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hresko
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Boyd
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galina Gervas
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariela Fajardo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenia Borawska
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Gutierrez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gawlick
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Kupersmith
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jacoby
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ednie
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Martin
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelaida Marcial
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Cizike
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gutierrez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meibol Alarcon
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viviana Gutierrez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ching Lee
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Mitts
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Coleman
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Gutierrez, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Johnson
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ing Chi Jang
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward T. DiTomasso
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie E. Dillion
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gavin
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuseppe Chieffo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Leigh
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Belton
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carroll
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Hillmann
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hillmann
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Mechanick
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandi Katz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Lysakowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Ford
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Lopez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alejo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oksana Gervas
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ing Hsuan Caroline Jang
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Belgrave
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Bonnelly
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Cruz
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Bonnelly
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Monroy
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Ficara
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Herzog
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Bonnelly
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryszard Krysiuk
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bernstein
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse A. Mechanick
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Manoloto
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Berger
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daysi Jaramillo
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Evensen
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Dasaro
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Gutierrez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Ivan Almendarez
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conor Mitts
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Miller
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartosz Lysakowski
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Marie Brillantes
Represented By: Robert Allen Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?