De Manzo v. LATAM Linhas Aereas S.A.
Plaintiff: Yolanda Delia Arias Santos and Yolanda Arias De Manzo
Defendant: LATAM Airlines Group, S.A., LATAM Linhas Aereas S.A. and LATAM Airlines Group S.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10835
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LATAM Airlines Group S.A.. (sj)
December 31, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LATAM Airlines Group, S.A., re: #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Yolanda Delia Arias Santos. (Viana, Michelle)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Latam Airlines Group S.A., re: #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Yolanda Delia Arias Santos. (Viana, Michelle) Modified on 12/26/2018 (jgo).
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Complaint against LATAM Airlines Group S.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Yolanda Delia Arias Santos. Related document: #8 Complaint.(Viana, Michelle)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LATAM Linhas Aereas S.A.. (sj)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Latam Linhas Aereas, S.A., re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Yolanda Arias De Manzo. (Viana, Michelle)
December 5, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Latham Airlines Group S.A.. The party was added to the case in error. (sj)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against LATAM Linhas Aereas S.A.. Document filed by Yolanda Arias De Manzo.(Viana, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons must be linked to the corresponding pleading. File the Request for Issuance of Summons after the pleading has been accepted by the court. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The caption must correspond to the original complaint filed. If you wish to change the caption you must file an Amended Complaint. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 12/10/2018. (dnh)
December 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: LATAM Airlines Group S.A.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Latam Airlines Group, S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yolanda Arias De Manzo. (Viana, Michelle) Modified on 12/4/2018 (dnh).
December 2, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Viana, Michelle)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/29/2018) (ks)
November 28, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Yolanda Arias De Manzo added. Party added pursuant to #4 Complaint.Document filed by Yolanda Arias De Manzo. Related document: #4 Complaint.(Viana, Michelle)
November 28, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents LATAM Airlines Group S.A. added. Party added pursuant to #4 Complaint.Document filed by Yolanda Arias De Manzo. Related document: #4 Complaint.(Viana, Michelle)
November 28, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents LATAM Airlines Group S.A. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Yolanda Arias De Manzo, Latham Airlines Group S.A., LATAM Airlines Group S.A.. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Viana, Michelle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against LATAM Linhas Aereas S.A.. Document filed by Yolanda Arias De Manzo.(Viana, Michelle) Modified on 12/4/2018 (dnh).
November 28, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents LATAM Linhas Aereas S.A. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Yolanda Arias De Manzo. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Viana, Michelle)
November 28, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Yolanda Arias De Manzo added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Yolanda Arias De Manzo. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Viana, Michelle)
November 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the defendant as to whom the summons is being requested was not selected. Caption Error; the caption must directly correspond to the pleading. Defendant Name Error; Defendant name listed on the PDF must match the party of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1332; Dollar Demand 600,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dnh).
November 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; No Cause of Action listed; No Nature of Suit Selected; Citizenship of Principal Parties section is for Diversity Cases Only (Federal Question was selected); No Courthouse Assignment selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Due to party modification the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Viana, Michelle) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dnh).
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yolanda Delia Arias Santos. (Viana, Michelle) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dnh).
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against LATAM Airlines Group, S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15951924)Document filed by Yolanda Delia Arias Santos.(Viana, Michelle) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dnh).
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michelle Pimenta Viana to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/26/2018. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Manzo v. LATAM Linhas Aereas S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATAM Airlines Group, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATAM Linhas Aereas S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATAM Airlines Group S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Delia Arias Santos
Represented By: Michelle Pimenta Viana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Arias De Manzo
Represented By: Michelle Pimenta Viana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?