Nachshen v. Jem Real Estate Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Defendant: Caliente Cab Rest. Co., Inc. and Jem Real Estate Co., LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv10996
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Henry B Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (ajc)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the respective parties here, that the Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action shall be extended up to and including March 8, 2019. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED the parties hereby consent to electronic service of all per Rule 5(b)(2)(E) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with the acknowledgment that Defendants' counsels spam filter may disrupt service of such items, in which case the parties agree to extend any corresponding deadline to add whatever time was lost by such service delay. SO ORDERED. Caliente Cab Rest. Co., Inc. answer due 3/8/2019; Jem Real Estate Co., LLC answer due 3/8/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 1/11/2019) (ne)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Caliente Cab Rest. Co., Inc., Jem Real Estate Co., LLC. (Gould, Theo)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theo E. M. Gould on behalf of Caliente Cab Rest. Co., Inc., Jem Real Estate Co., LLC. (Gould, Theo)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caliente Cab Rest. Co., Inc.. (sj)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/27/2018) (jca)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Caliente Cab Rest. Co., Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
November 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Glen Howard Parker to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name in the 'To' field must include 'c/o', 'via', or 'attn'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jem Real Estate Co., LLC. (pne)
November 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 27, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Caliente Cab Rest. Co., Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen) Modified on 11/27/2018 (pne).
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jem Real Estate Co., LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caliente Cab Rest. Co., Inc., Jem Real Estate Co., LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15957182)Document filed by Steven Nachshen.(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nachshen v. Jem Real Estate Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliente Cab Rest. Co., Inc.
Represented By: Theo E. M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jem Real Estate Co., LLC
Represented By: Theo E. M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?