Nachshen v. WFP Retail Co. L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Defendant: WFP Retail Co. L.P. and Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv10998
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from F. Warren Jacoby, Esq. dated April 18, 2017 re: Proposed Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Document filed by Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC, WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Blackline)(Jacoby, Frederic)
April 18, 2019 Filing 31 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC, WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Jacoby, Frederic)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Except for amendments permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1) and this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases ("Individual Rules"), amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 9/2/2019. Deposition due by 7/12/2019. Expert Discovery due by 10/18/2019. Motions due by 11/18/2019. The joint pretrial order shall be due 30 days from the close of discovery, or if any dispositive motion is filed, 21 days from the Court's decision on such motion. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2 to 4 days. Status Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/4/2019) (anc)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for F. Warren Jacoby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
April 3, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for F. Warren Jacoby to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16615506. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for F. Warren Jacoby to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16615506. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC, WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacoby, Frederic)
April 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/3/2019. (Court Reporter Raquel Robles) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 29, 2019 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Robert G. Hanski dated March 29, 2019 re: Joint Letter. Document filed by Steven Nachshen.(Hanski, Robert)
March 29, 2019 Minute Entry The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for April 5, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. is rescheduled to April 3, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (Daniels, Anthony)
March 21, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC, WFP Retail Co. L.P..(Jacoby, Frederic)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: Heath B. Kushnick is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for defendant WFP Retail Co. L.P. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Heath B. Kushnick from the list of counsel in this case and to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 23. So ordered. Granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Heath Brian Kushnick terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/27/2019) (rjm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Heath B. Kushnick in Support re: #23 MOTION for Heath B. Kushnick to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Kushnick, Heath)
February 26, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Heath B. Kushnick to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by WFP Retail Co. L.P..(Kushnick, Heath)
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max Evan Kaplan on behalf of WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Kaplan, Max)
February 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederic Warren Jacoby on behalf of WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Jacoby, Frederic)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of Steven Nachshen. (Hanski, Adam)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Defendant WFP Retail Co. L.P.s proposed order for substitution of counsel, Dkt. No. 16, is denied without prejudice for failing to comply with Local Civil Rule 1.4 and the corresponding Committee Note. The corresponding Committee Note provides, in relevant part, that substitution of counsel may be made by stipulation which has been signed by counsel, the counsels client, and all other parties, and which has been so ordered by the Court. WFP Retail Co. L.P. may re-submit a request to substitute counsel that complies with Local Civil Rule 1.4 for the Courts consideration. Alternatively, new counsel may enter a notice of appearance and outgoing counsel can move to withdraw in accordance with the rule. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on February 20, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
February 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC answer due 3/21/2019; WFP Retail Co. L.P. answer due 3/21/2019. Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (anc)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' application is granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to March 21, 2019. Defendants' request to adjourn the initial pretrial conference is also granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 6, 2019 is adjourned to April 5, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The joint letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's January 15, 2019 order are due no later than March 29, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/15/2019) (anc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from F. Warren Jacoby dated 2/14/2019. Document filed by Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC, WFP Retail Co. L.P..(Jacoby, Frederic)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Heath B. Kushnick, New Attorney: F. Warren Jacoby, Address: Cozen O'Connor, 1650 Market St., 28th Fl., Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, United States 19103, 215-665-2154. Document filed by WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Jacoby, Frederic)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Gerald Hanski on behalf of Steven Nachshen. (Hanski, Robert)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/15/2019) (rjm)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND ORDERED that: (a) Defendant Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC's ("Del Frisco") time to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including February 19, 2019; (b) Plaintiff and Del Frisco consent to electronic service of all documents in this action pursuant to Rule 5(b)(2)(E) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and (c) this Stipulation and Order may be signed in counterparts or with facsimile or electronic signatures and such signatures shall be deemed originals for all purposes. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to February 19, 2019. The Court takes no position on the remainder of the stipulation between the parties. So ordered. Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC answer due 2/19/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/26/2018) (rjm).
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederic Warren Jacoby on behalf of Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC. (Jacoby, Frederic)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC. (Kaplan, Max)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max Evan Kaplan on behalf of Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC. (Kaplan, Max)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND ORDERED that: defendant WFP Retail Co. L.P.'s time to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including February 18, 2019; and as further set forth herein. The parties' December 19, 2018 application to extend the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to February 19, 2019. The Court takes no position on the remainder of the stipulation between the parties. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 8. SO ORDERED. (WFP Retail Co. L.P. answer due 2/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/20/2018) (anc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint until February 18, 2019. Document filed by WFP Retail Co. L.P..(Kushnick, Heath) Modified on 1/15/2019 (db).
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heath Brian Kushnick on behalf of WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Kushnick, Heath)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (pne)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC. (pne)
November 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 27, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WFP Retail Co. L.P., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC, WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15957263)Document filed by Steven Nachshen.(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nachshen v. WFP Retail Co. L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Robert Gerald Hanski
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Retail Co. L.P.
Represented By: Heath Brian Kushnick
Represented By: Max Evan Kaplan
Represented By: Frederic Warren Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Frisco's Grille of New York, LLC
Represented By: Max Evan Kaplan
Represented By: Frederic Warren Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?