Frost et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Debra A. Frost and Gregory D. Frost
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11136
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332rp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by January 31, 2019. Plaintiffs will not be given any further opportunity to amend the complaint to address issues raised by the motion to dismiss. If Plaintiffs do amend, by three (3) weeks after the amended complaint is filed, Defendant shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) submit a letter to the Court, copying Plaintiff, stating that it relies on the previously filed motion to dismiss. If Defendant files an answer or a new motion to dismiss, the Court will deny the previously filed motion to dismiss as moot. It is further ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiffs shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by January 31, 2019. Defendants reply, if any, shall be served by February 7, 2019. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply the Court with one courtesy hard copy of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Finally, it is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 13, 2019 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2019, Responses due by 1/31/2019, Replies due by 2/7/2019.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/14/2019) (jca)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Service)(Haber, Richard)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/6/2018) (ne)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Richard P. Haber dated December 6, 2018. filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ENDORSEMENT: The time for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to January 10, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/6/2018) (rro) Modified on 12/7/2018 (rro).
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth N. Miller on behalf of Debra A. Frost, Gregory D. Frost. (Miller, Kenneth)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline to answer is hereby extended to January 10, 2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Richard P. Haber dated December 6, 2018. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Haber, Richard)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Louis L. Stanton is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 30, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 30, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
November 30, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
November 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard P. Haber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 1,113,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1,113,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Haber, Richard)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haber, Richard)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 655498/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15979810).Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings and Process, #2 Certificate of Service)(Haber, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra A. Frost
Represented By: Kenneth N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory D. Frost
Represented By: Kenneth N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Richard P. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?