Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Spear Dermatology Products, Inc. and Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Mylan Pharaceuticals, Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11156
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW NECHAMA POTASNICK AS COUNSEL OF RECORD granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: The Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw Nechama Potasnick as Counsel of Record in the above captioned action is GRANTED. (Attorney Nechama Potasnick terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/24/2019) (jwh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Nechama Potasnick to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Spear Dermatology Products, Inc., Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Steven)
January 11, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #8 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Spear Dermatology Products, Inc., Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Webb, John)
January 10, 2019 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AMENDED ANSWER to #8 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Spear Dermatology Products, Inc., Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Webb, John) Modified on 1/11/2019 (jgo).
January 10, 2019 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (WRONG PARTY SELECTED) ANSWER to #8 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Document filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Webb, John) Modified on 1/10/2019 (lb).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Anthony Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Lorenzo Gasparetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison)
January 3, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Anthony Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16130574. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Anthony Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16130574. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony Newman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A (Certificates of Good Standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order (Order for Admission of Anthony Newman Pro Hac Vice))(Newman, Anthony)
December 21, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Lorenzo Gasparetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Lorenzo Gasparetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lorenzo Gasparetti in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order ([Proposed] Order for Admission of Lorenzo Gasparetti Pro Hac Vice))(Gasparetti, Lorenzo)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendant's consent request to extend its time to respond to the complaint to January 10, 2019 is hereby granted. It is further ordered that the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for April 19, 2019 will be adjourned to April 12, 2019 at 2:45 p.m. The parties shall submit the materials described in Dkt. No. 11 one week in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 1/10/2019, ( Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 02:45 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/19/2018) (ama)
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Document filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Webb, John)
December 18, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #18 MOTION for Lorenzo Gasparetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16073977. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Lorenzo Gasparetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16073977. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lorenzo Gasparetti in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order for Admission of Lorenzo Gasparetti Pro Hac Vice)(Gasparetti, Lorenzo) Modified on 12/18/2018 (bcu).
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Bagnall Webb on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. New Address: Reed Smith LLP (New York), 599 Lexington Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, NY, United States 10022, (212) 549-0375. (Webb, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Complaint, #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John B. Webb dated December 11, 2018., FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference re: #11 Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John B. Webb dated December 11, 2018. Document filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Webb, John)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Bagnall Webb on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Webb, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Peter Gordon on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Gordon, Jonathan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service was accepted by Sandra Halstead, Registered Agent at CT Corp.. Document filed by Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Spear Dermatology Products, Inc.. (Lieberman, Steven)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/3/2018) (cf)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Nechama Potasnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Daniel McCallum to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Document filed by Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Spear Dermatology Products, Inc..(Lieberman, Steven)
December 3, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven M Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven M Lieberman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven M Lieberman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
November 30, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Daniel McCallum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15981655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #7 MOTION for Nechama Potasnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15981660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Nechama Potasnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15981660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Spear Dermatology Products, Inc., Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of N Potasnick, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Potasnick, Nechama)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Daniel McCallum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15981655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Spear Dermatology Products, Inc., Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D McCallum, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McCallum, Daniel)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Spear Dermatology Products, Inc., Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lieberman, Steven)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Steven)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Spear Dermatology Products, Inc..(Lieberman, Steven)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Lieberman, Steven)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Spear Dermatology Products, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15981645)Document filed by Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Spear Dermatology Products, Inc..(Lieberman, Steven) Modified on 12/3/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Lorenzo E. Gasparetti
Represented By: Anthony S. Newman
Represented By: Jonathan Peter Gordon
Represented By: John Bagnall Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spear Dermatology Products, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Lieberman
Represented By: Nechama Potasnick
Represented By: Daniel McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spear Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Lieberman
Represented By: Nechama Potasnick
Represented By: Daniel McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?