Brice v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Ashley Brice
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11240
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER NO. 159 [Regarding the End of the Bellwether Trial Process for Personal Injury and Wrongful Death Cases]: As far as the Court is concerned, the settlement of the last two bellwether cases set for trial brings to a close the bellwether trial process in the MDL. That said, the parties should meet and confer with respect to whether the Court should schedule any additional bellwether trials in light of the settlements. The parties should be prepared to address that issue and, more broadly, the next steps for the remaining cases in Phase 2, Category C - including but not limited to whether or when those cases should be remanded (or transferred) to their respective transferor court - at the next status conference, which is currently scheduled for January 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/12/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(ne)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. General Motors, LLC served on 12/5/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service was accepted by CSC Lawyers. Document filed by Ashley Brice. (Emison, Brett)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MDL CONSOLIDATION ORDER: Pursuant to the June 12, 2014 Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), In re: General Motors Ignition Switch Litigation, 14-MD-2543, has been assigned to this Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (14-MD-2543, Docket No. 1). As this case, Brice v. General Motors LLC, 18-CV-11240, has been directly filed in this district and, based on the Court's review, appears to be within the scope of the multidistrict litigation, it is hereby ORDERED that it is transferred to 14-MD-2543 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, subject to the process for objections set forth in Section II of Order No. 8. (14-MD-2543, Docket No. 249, at 4-5). Counsel is advised to consult the docket in 14-MD-2543, including Order Nos. 1 and 25 (14-MD-2543 Docket Nos. 19 and 422, respectively), as well as the GM Ignition Switch MDL website (http://gmignitionmdl.com), for other pertinent information. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/4/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:18-cv-11240-JMF(ne)
December 6, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (ne)
December 6, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 6, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors, LLC. (pc)
December 4, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 14md2543. (pc)
December 4, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 4, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Motors, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ashley Brice. (Emison, Brett)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-MD-2543. Document filed by Ashley Brice.(Emison, Brett)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Emison, Brett)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15995940)Document filed by Ashley Brice.(Emison, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brice v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Brice
Represented By: Brett A. Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?