Sullivan, Jr. v. UT Southwestern Health Systems
Plaintiff: Phillip Sullivan, Jr.
Defendant: UT Southwestern Health Systems
Case Number: 1:2018cv11252
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. UT Southwestern Health Systems served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. Service was accepted by c/o C T Corp. System. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Seelig, Anne)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, March 29th, 2019 at 3:30pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. And as set forth herein. Initial Conference set for 3/29/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/04/2018) (ama)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UT Southwestern Health Systems. (dnh)
December 4, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 4, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
December 4, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UT Southwestern Health Systems, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UT Southwestern Health Systems. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15996396)Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr..(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan, Jr. v. UT Southwestern Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UT Southwestern Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Sullivan, Jr.
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Represented By: Anne Melissa Seelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?