Bouhajrah et al v. Hill Deli Grocery Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Mohammed Bouhajrah
Defendant: Nasser Almasmari, Azaal Deli Grocery Corp., Hill Deli Grocery Corp. and Ana Deli Grocery Corp
Case Number: 1:2018cv11391
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Enclosing Plaintiff's Damages Chart served on Defendants on January 15, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah(individually), Mohammed Bouhajrah(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Sackowitz, Adam)
January 14, 2019 Terminate Mediation Case Tracking Deadlines: Mediator Assignment Deadline (mf)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Mediation Referral Order for Cases Filed Under the Fair Labor Standards Act served on Defendants on December 21, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah(individually), Mohammed Bouhajrah(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Sackowitz, Adam)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq.: This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/31/2018. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/20/2018) (ama) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing.
December 11, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 11, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS SIMILAR. Create association to 1:18-cv-03262-VEC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 11, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nasser Almasmari. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hill Deli Grocery Corp.. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Azaal Deli Grocery Corp.. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ana Deli Grocery Corp. (dnh)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nasser Almasmari, re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah(individually), Mohammed Bouhajrah(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Sackowitz, Adam)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hill Deli Grocery Corp., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah(individually), Mohammed Bouhajrah(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Sackowitz, Adam)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Azaal Deli Grocery Corp., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah(individually), Mohammed Bouhajrah(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Sackowitz, Adam)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ana Deli Grocery Corp., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah(individually), Mohammed Bouhajrah(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Sackowitz, Adam)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Nasser Almasmari, Ana Deli Grocery Corp, Azaal Deli Grocery Corp., Hill Deli Grocery Corp.. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah(individually), Mohammed Bouhajrah(on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Sackowitz, Adam)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Adam Joseph Sackowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam Joseph Sackowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 4 (Reinstated/Reopened Case);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 1 (Original Proceeding);. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adam Joseph Sackowitz to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Mohammed Bouhajrah with party text 'on behalf of all others similarly situated'; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam Joseph Sackowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mohammed Bouhajrah. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mohammed Bouhajrah added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Sackowitz, Adam)
December 7, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly similar to 18-cv-3262. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mohammed Bouhajrah, Mohammed Bouhajrah added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah, Mohammed Bouhajrah. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Sackowitz, Adam)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nasser Almasmari, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah. (Sackowitz, Adam) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hill Deli Grocery Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah. (Sackowitz, Adam) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Azaal Deli Grocery Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah. (Sackowitz, Adam) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ana Deli Grocery Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah. (Sackowitz, Adam) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sackowitz, Adam) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Nasser Almasmari, Ana Deli Grocery Corp, Azaal Deli Grocery Corp., Hill Deli Grocery Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16013449)Document filed by Mohammed Bouhajrah.(Sackowitz, Adam) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouhajrah et al v. Hill Deli Grocery Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nasser Almasmari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azaal Deli Grocery Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Deli Grocery Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Deli Grocery Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Bouhajrah
Represented By: Adam Joseph Sackowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?