Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa v. Small

Plaintiff: Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa
Defendant: Esq. Charles H. Small
Case Number: 1:2018cv11399
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Charles H. Small.Document filed by Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 2C-2E, #6 Exhibit 2F, #7 Exhibit 2G, #8 Exhibit 2H, #9 Exhibit 2I-2K, #10 Exhibit 3-4, #11 Declaration of Service)(Moskowitz, Andrew)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Charles H. Small served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. Service was accepted by Charles H. Small, Esq.. Document filed by Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa. (Moskowitz, Andrew)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles H. Small. (pc)
December 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
December 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew M Moskowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,500,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew M Moskowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa, Charles H. Small. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Charles H. Small, Esq., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa. (Moskowitz, Andrew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Moskowitz, Andrew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles H. Small. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16012536)Document filed by Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Moskowitz, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa v. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Charles H. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa
Represented By: Andrew M Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?