DeBlasio v. New York City Health and Hospital Corporation

Plaintiff: Philip E. DeBlasio
Defendant: New York City Health and Hospital Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv11405
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order of Dismissal, #4 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), Noitce of Appeal Forms to Philip E. DeBlasio NYSID: 04489407Y B&C No. 3491801884 Manhattan Detention Complex 125 White Street New York, NY 10013. (vba)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order 4 CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to submit a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP application") and prisoner authorization or pay the $400.00 in filing fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/10/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. By order dated December 7, 2018, the Court directed Plaintiff, within thirty days, to submit a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP application") and prisoner authorization or pay the $400.00 in fees required to file a civil action in this Court. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the complaint. Plaintiff has not filed an IFP application and prisoner authorization or paid the fee. Accordingly, the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/10/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 10, 2018 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, to Philip E. DeBlasio NYSID: 04489407Y B&C No. 3491801884 Manhattan Detention Complex 125 White Street New York, NY 10013. (vba)
December 7, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 1/7/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/7/2019. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 1/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/7/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IFP application, #2 Exhibit Prisoner authorization)(asg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 4, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
December 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Health and Hospital Corporation. Document filed by Philip E. DeBlasio. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeBlasio v. New York City Health and Hospital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip E. DeBlasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Health and Hospital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?