Washington v. Naomi Berrie Diabetes Center et al

Plaintiff: Deneene Washington
Defendant: Tonya Richards, Annie Trowbridge, Columbia University Medical Center, Dr. Robin Goland and Naomi Berrie Diabetes Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv11441
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Calliste, Jr on behalf of Deneene Washington. (Calliste, Gregory)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/14/2018) (ks)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Columbia University Medical Center, Dr. Robin Goland(In His Individual Capacity), Dr. Robin Goland(In His Official Capacity), Naomi Berrie Diabetes Center, Tonya Richards(In Her Official Capacity), Tonya Richards(In Her Individual Capacity), Annie Trowbridge(In Her Official Capacity), Annie Trowbridge(In Her Individual Capacity ). (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Naomi Berrie Diabetes Center, Columbia University Medical Center, Annie Trowbridge, Dr. Robin Goland and Tonya Richards, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Deneene Washington. (Klassen, Siobhan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Klassen, Siobhan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Columbia University Medical Center, Dr. Robin Goland(In His Individual Capacity), Dr. Robin Goland(In His Official Capacity), Naomi Berrie Diabetes Center, Tonya Richards(In Her Official Capacity), Tonya Richards(In Her Individual Capacity), Annie Trowbridge(In Her Official Capacity), Annie Trowbridge(In Her Individual Capacity ). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16018059)Document filed by Deneene Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Determination and Order of Dismissal from NYSDHR, #2 Appendix EEOC Notice of Right to Sue)(Klassen, Siobhan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Naomi Berrie Diabetes Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Trowbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia University Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robin Goland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Berrie Diabetes Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deneene Washington
Represented By: Siobhan E. C. Klassen
Represented By: Gregory Calliste, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?