Seife et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Peter Lurie and Charles Seife
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II, Francis S. Collins, U.S. Food and Drug Administration, Scott Gottlieb and National Institutes of Health
Case Number: 1:2018cv11462
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So Ordered.(Alex M. Azar, II answer due 3/13/2019; Francis S. Collins answer due 3/13/2019; Scott Gottlieb answer due 3/13/2019; National Institutes of Health answer due 3/13/2019; U.S. Department of Health and Human Services answer due 3/13/2019; U.S. Food and Drug Administration answer due 3/13/2019.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/4/2019) (anc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from AUSA Joseph N. Cordaro dated February 1, 2019. Document filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Francis S. Collins, Scott Gottlieb, National Institutes of Health, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Food and Drug Administration.(Cordaro, Joseph)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Nicholas Cordaro on behalf of Alex M. Azar, II, Francis S. Collins, Scott Gottlieb, National Institutes of Health, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Cordaro, Joseph)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Langford on behalf of Peter Lurie, Charles Seife. (Langford, John)
December 27, 2018 Case Stayed (ne)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER M10-468: The United States Attorney's Office shall notify the Court immediately upon the restoration of Department of Justice funding. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/27/2018) (ne)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,, served. Alex M. Azar, II served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019; Francis S. Collins served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019; Scott Gottlieb served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019; National Institutes of Health served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019; U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019; U.S. Food and Drug Administration served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Charles Seife; Peter Lurie. (Schulz, David)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (pc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scott Gottlieb. (pc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex M. Azar, II. (pc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (pc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Institutes of Health. (pc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Francis S. Collins. (pc)
December 10, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
December 10, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Scott Gottlieb, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Peter Lurie, Charles Seife. (Morten, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Food and Drug Administration, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Peter Lurie, Charles Seife. (Morten, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Francis S. Collins, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Peter Lurie, Charles Seife. (Morten, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Institutes of Health, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Peter Lurie, Charles Seife. (Morten, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alex M. Azar II, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Peter Lurie, Charles Seife. (Morten, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Peter Lurie, Charles Seife. (Morten, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Morten, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II, Francis S. Collins, Scott Gottlieb, National Institutes of Health, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16021491)Document filed by Charles Seife, Peter Lurie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Morten, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seife et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Cordaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Cordaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis S. Collins
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Cordaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Cordaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gottlieb
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Cordaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institutes of Health
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Cordaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lurie
Represented By: Christopher John Morten
Represented By: John Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Seife
Represented By: Christopher John Morten
Represented By: John Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?