Padilla-Lala et al v. Whitaker et al
Plaintiff: Walter Mauricio Padilla-Lala and Julio Aucabzhala Agualsuca
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna, Judge Mary Beth Keller, Secretary Kirstjen Nielsen, Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker and Director Thomas D. Homan
Case Number: 1:2018cv11499
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2412
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Case Stayed (rro)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER M10-468: The United States Attorney's Office shall notify the Court immediately upon the restoration of Department of Justice funding. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/27/2018) (rjm)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Brandon M. Waterman dated December 21, 2018 re: The Court should dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction. Document filed by L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Mary Beth Keller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Supervisory Detention and Deportation Officer Darius L. Robinson, #2 Ex. A - Documents relating to Padilla-Lala, #3 Ex. B - Documents relating to Agualsuca)(Waterman, Brandon)
December 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Show Cause Hearing held on 12/13/2018. Plaintiff Counsel: Salvador Vincent Delgado, Jr.; Defense Counsel: Brandon Waterman and Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Mary Beth Keller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Waterman, Brandon)
December 12, 2018 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Salvador Vincent Delgado, Jr for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 2 Civil Cover Sheet, 1 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (pne)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Julio Aucabzhala Agualsuca, Walter Mauricio Padilla-Lala. Defendants shall show cause as to why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining the defendants during the pendency of this action from taking further steps to unlawfully remove Plaintiff Padilla-Lala nor Plaintiff Aucabzhala and be enjoined and restrained during pendency of this action and permanently from removing either plaintiff. ORDERED that, sufficient reason having been shown therefor, pending the hearing of plaintiffs application for a preliminary injunction, pursuant to Rule 65, Fed. R. Civ. P., the defendant is temporarily restrained and enjoined from taking any further step to remove Plaintiff Padilla-Lala nor Plaintiff Aucabzhala during the pendency of this hearing. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/10/2018) (jwh)
December 10, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker. (pne)
December 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 10, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pne)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. Francis Cissna, Thomas D. Homan, Mary Beth Keller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401224190)Document filed by Walter Mauricio Padilla-Lala, Julio Aucabzhala Agualsuca.(pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla-Lala et al v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Mary Beth Keller
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Thomas D. Homan
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Mauricio Padilla-Lala
Represented By: Salvador Vincent Delgado, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Aucabzhala Agualsuca
Represented By: Salvador Vincent Delgado, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?