Human Rights Watch v. U.S. Central Command et al
Plaintiff: Human Rights Watch
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Air Force, U.S. Central Command, U.S. Department of the Navy, U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General, Office of the Secretary of Defense, U.S. Marine Corps and U.S. Department of the Army
Case Number: 1:2018cv11503
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion to Stay. In light of the lapse of funding to the United States Department of Justice, it is hereby ordered that, absent other direction or order from the Court, (1) this case is hereby stayed until the business day after the President signs into law a budget appropriation that restores Department of Justice funding; and (2) all court deadlines, including scheduling order deadlines, are hereby tolled during the government shutdown and extended thereafter for a period of time equal to the number of calendar days between January 10, 2019, and the date the President signs into law a budget appropriation that restores Department of Justice funding. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/22/2019) (kv)
January 18, 2019 Filing 28 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay and to toll deadlines pending restoration of Justice Department appropriations addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David S. Jones dated January 18, 2019. Document filed by Office of the Secretary of Defense, U.S. Central Command, U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General, U.S. Department of the Air Force, U.S. Department of the Army, U.S. Department of the Navy, U.S. Marine Corps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit standing order staying certain civil actions pending restoration of Justice Department funding)(Jones, David)
December 27, 2018 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of the Navy. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Marine Corps. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of the Army. (dnh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of the Air Force. (dnh)
December 22, 2018 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Navy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John)
December 22, 2018 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Marine Corps, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John)
December 22, 2018 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Army, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John)
December 22, 2018 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Air Force, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John)
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Langford to RE-FILE Document No. #17 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; PDF must also state "AMENDED". Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Langford to RE-FILE Document No. #15 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #16 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Amended Summonses are only issued to parties who have been previously issued one. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Secretary of Defense. (sj)
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Secretary of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John)
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj).
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Navy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj).
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Marine Corps, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj).
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Army, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj).
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Air Force, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj).
December 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Langford to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name in the 'To' field on the PDF does not match party name on pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General. (pne)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Central Command. (pne)
December 11, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 11, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 11, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Human Rights Watch.(Langford, John)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Secretary of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne).
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Navy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne).
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Marine Corps, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne).
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Central Command, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Army, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne).
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Air Force, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne).
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Langford, John)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office of the Secretary of Defense, U.S. Central Command, U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General, U.S. Department of the Air Force, U.S. Department of the Army, U.S. Department of the Navy, U.S. Marine Corps. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16030141)Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Langford, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Human Rights Watch v. U.S. Central Command et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Air Force
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Central Command
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Navy
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Secretary of Defense
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Marine Corps
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Army
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Human Rights Watch
Represented By: John Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?