ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc. v. Home Depot Product Authority, LLC
Plaintiff: ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc.
Defendant: Home Depot Product Authority, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11507
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Home Depot Product Authority, LLC waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. Document filed by ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc.. (Kwon, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Complaint against Home Depot Product Authority, LLC.Document filed by ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc.. Related document: #8 Complaint.(Kwon, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Yongha Kwon on behalf of ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc.. New Address: Oved & Oved LLP, 401 Greenwich Street, New York, New York, USA 10013, 212.226.2376. (Kwon, Michael)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before January 4, 2019, Plaintiff shall amend its Complaint to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity comprising the Defendant LLC as well as the citizenship of all individual parties. If, by that date, Plaintiff is unable to amend the Complaint to truthfully allege complete diversity of citizenship, then the Complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice to either party SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2019.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/12/2018) (ne)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/12/2018) (ne)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. Document filed by ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc..(Urgenson, Andrew)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc.. Document filed by ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc..(Urgenson, Andrew) Modified on 12/11/2018 (jgo).
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (pne)
December 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Yongha Kwon to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the attorney whose account was used for the filing. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
December 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Yongha Kwon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294; Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332bc; the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
December 11, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 11, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 11, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Justin Urgenson on behalf of ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc.. (Urgenson, Andrew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc..(Kwon, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc.. (Kwon, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kwon, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16029848)Document filed by ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc..(Kwon, Michael) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc. v. Home Depot Product Authority, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Product Authority, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESI Cases and Accessories, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Yongha Kwon
Represented By: Andrew Justin Urgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?