Abrahams et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Peter Cullen, Duwayne Tinsley, Joseph Cerrato, Steven Oemcke, Louis Kaufman, Robert Walsh, Joseph Lane, Philip Armacida, Francis Lauricella, William Dinkelacker, Scott Gassman, Wayne Abrahams, John Maldonado, Gary Favro, Charles DeRienzo, James Maxwell, Richard Seibert, Kevin Collins, Steven Thorsen, John Moschella, William Martinez, Vincent Straface, Craig Tomasino, Joseph Taranto, Patrick Ryan, Vanessa De Danzine, Donald Lynch, John Friedman, Matthew Gilbert, Dennis Tveter, Andrew Davis, John Gillen, Idelfonso Class, William Lynch, Hector Lorenzo, Philip Kouril, Jay Curry, Shimicka Meadows, David Gaynor, Gary Livoti, Joseph Svercel, Dennis Murphy, Manuel Melo, Francis Orlando, Ira Kugelman, Michael Moloney, Cathleen Perez, John DePrima, Dennis Rudolph, Howard Roberts, Lori Pollock, Roger Harwood, William Popow, Andrew Stern, Mark Makuta, Darryl Carpenter, Jamie Levine, George Johansen, Keith Flinton, Tim Bracken, John Gallagher, Dennis Browne, Guyowen Howard, Gregory Dolan, Raul Perez, Beatrice Seravello, Christopher Panetta, Douglas Roske, John Mccann, Christopher Donohue, George Darini, Wanda Lopez, Gerard Collins, Awilda Santana, Robert Whipple, Sean Butler, Keith Gessner, Michael Cameron, Elizabeth Curcio, Richard Schriefer, Sean Kelly, James Ryder, Karen Mulcahy- Normile, Daniel Thompson, Donald Bradley, Ralph Johnson, Kristen Jones, Randin Miller, Edward Tuffy, Walter Cain, Nicholas Romano, Frank Scorzello, Peter DeNardis, Brian Sheehan, Darin Caputo, Dawn Healey, Eric Covo, Rosemarie Drazka, Wesley Geerholt and Frank Seabrook
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11519
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 12/14/2018, answer due 3/14/2019. Document filed by Scott Gassman; John Gallagher; Vincent Straface; Manuel Melo; Vanessa De Danzine; Christopher Panetta; Walter Cain; Patrick Ryan; Gregory Dolan; Robert Walsh; Jay Curry; Cathleen Perez; Peter Cullen; Kristen Jones; Donald Lynch; Frank Scorzello; Lori Pollock; Christopher Donohue; Duwayne Tinsley; Mark Makuta; John Mccann; Andrew Davis; Joseph Taranto; Andrew Stern; Darryl Carpenter; John Friedman; Wesley Geerholt; Joseph Cerrato; Joseph Svercel; Douglas Roske; Ira Kugelman; Beatrice Seravello; Daniel Thompson; Nicholas Romano; Michael Moloney; Gary Favro; Francis Lauricella; Roger Harwood; Randin Miller; Edward Tuffy; John Maldonado; Guyowen Howard; Idelfonso Class; Eric Covo; James Ryder; Gary Livoti; James Maxwell; William Lynch; Raul Perez; John Moschella; Louis Kaufman; Richard Seibert; Howard Roberts; George Darini; Shimicka Meadows; Hector Lorenzo; Karen Mulcahy- Normile; Francis Orlando; Dennis Murphy; Philip Armacida; Elizabeth Curcio; Wayne Abrahams; Brian Sheehan; Keith Flinton; Robert Whipple; Awilda Santana; William Dinkelacker; Rosemarie Drazka; Richard Schriefer; William Popow; Dawn Healey; Kevin Collins; Steven Oemcke; William Martinez; Joseph Lane; Charles DeRienzo; Wanda Lopez; Dennis Rudolph; Peter DeNardis; George Johansen; Sean Kelly; John DePrima; Gerard Collins; Craig Tomasino; Sean Butler; Frank Seabrook; Tim Bracken; Keith Gessner; Steven Thorsen; Darin Caputo; Jamie Levine; Philip Kouril; Michael Cameron; John Gillen; Dennis Tveter; Donald Bradley; David Gaynor; Matthew Gilbert; Ralph Johnson; Dennis Browne. (Haefele, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Eubanks on behalf of Robert Abraham, Wayne Abrahams, James Abreu, John Actisdano, Cynthia Adam, Thomas Adams, Karl Aepelbacher, Joseph Agri, Vicki Anderson, Eric Ando, Thomas Arias, Claudio Barrera, Burnett Plaintiffs, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., John Odland, Elizabeth Parks, Gerard Prior. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Eubanks, John)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting (854) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; granting (4354) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (630) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; granting (160) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; granting (15) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; granting (13) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN; granting (11) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN; granting (7) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
January 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (14 in 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN, 630 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 160 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN, 13 in 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN, 7 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN, 854 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 4354 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN, 11 in 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN, 15 in 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN) MOTION for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16194547. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16194547. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Abraham, Wayne Abrahams, James Abreu, John Actisdano, Cynthia Adam, Thomas Adams, Karl Aepelbacher, Joseph Agri, Vicki Anderson, Eric Ando, Thomas Arias, Claudio Barrera, Burnett Plaintiffs, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., John Odland, Elizabeth Parks, Gerard Prior. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Michael Eubanks, #2 Proposed Order for Admission pro hac vice of John Michael Eubanks)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (4279 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/13/2018) (jwh) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 12, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 12, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 12, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Scott Gassman, John Gallagher, Vincent Straface, Manuel Melo, Vanessa De Danzine, Christopher Panetta, Walter Cain, Patrick Ryan, Gregory Dolan, Robert Walsh, Jay Curry, Cathleen Perez, Peter Cullen, Kristen Jones, Donald Lynch, Frank Scorzello, Lori Pollock, Christopher Donohue, Duwayne Tinsley, Mark Makuta, John Mccann, Andrew Davis, Joseph Taranto, Andrew Stern, Darryl Carpenter, John Friedman, Wesley Geerholt, Joseph Cerrato, Joseph Svercel, Douglas Roske, Ira Kugelman, Beatrice Seravello, Daniel Thompson, Nicholas Romano, Michael Moloney, Gary Favro, Francis Lauricella, Roger Harwood, Randin Miller, Edward Tuffy, John Maldonado, Guyowen Howard, Idelfonso Class, Eric Covo, James Ryder, Gary Livoti, James Maxwell, William Lynch, Raul Perez, John Moschella, Louis Kaufman, Richard Seibert, Howard Roberts, George Darini, Shimicka Meadows, Hector Lorenzo, Karen Mulcahy- Normile, Francis Orlando, Dennis Murphy, Philip Armacida, Elizabeth Curcio, Wayne Abrahams, Brian Sheehan, Keith Flinton, Robert Whipple, Awilda Santana, William Dinkelacker, Rosemarie Drazka, Richard Schriefer, William Popow, Dawn Healey, Kevin Collins, Steven Oemcke, William Martinez, Joseph Lane, Charles DeRienzo, Wanda Lopez, Dennis Rudolph, Peter DeNardis, George Johansen, Sean Kelly, John DePrima, Gerard Collins, Craig Tomasino, Sean Butler, Frank Seabrook, Tim Bracken, Keith Gessner, Steven Thorsen, Darin Caputo, Jamie Levine, Philip Kouril, Michael Cameron, John Gillen, Dennis Tveter, Donald Bradley, David Gaynor, Matthew Gilbert, Ralph Johnson, Dennis Browne.(Haefele, Robert)
December 11, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 11, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Turner Haefele. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
December 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Turner Haefele to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Wayne Abrahams, Philip Armacida, Tim Bracken, Donald Bradley, Dennis Browne, Sean Butler, Walter Cain, Michael Cameron, Darin Caputo, Darryl Carpenter, Joseph Cerrato, Idelfonso Class, Gerard Collins, Kevin Collins, Eric Covo, Peter Cullen, Elizabeth Curcio, Jay Curry, George Darini, Andrew Davis, Vanessa De Danzine, Peter DeNardis, John DePrima, Charles DeRienzo, William Dinkelacker, Gregory Dolan, Christopher Donohue, Rosemarie Drazka, Gary Favro, Keith Flinton, John Friedman, John Gallagher, Scott Gassman, David Gaynor, Wesley Geerholt, Keith Gessner, Matthew Gilbert, John Gillen, Roger Harwood, Dawn Healey, Guyowen Howard, George Johansen, Ralph Johnson, Kristen Jones, Louis Kaufman, Sean Kelly, Philip Kouril, Ira Kugelman, Joseph Lane, Francis Lauricella, Jamie Levine, Gary Livoti, Wanda Lopez, Hector Lorenzo, Donald Lynch, William Lynch, Mark Makuta, John Maldonado, William Martinez, James Maxwell, John Mccann, Shimicka Meadows, Manuel Melo, Randin Miller, Michael Moloney, John Moschella, Karen Mulcahy- Normile, Dennis Murphy, Steven Oemcke, Francis Orlando, Christopher Panetta, Cathleen Perez, Raul Perez, Lori Pollock, William Popow, Howard Roberts, Nicholas Romano, Douglas Roske, Dennis Rudolph, Patrick Ryan, James Ryder, Awilda Santana, Richard Schriefer, Frank Scorzello, Frank Seabrook, Richard Seibert, Beatrice Seravello, Brian Sheehan, Andrew Stern, Vincent Straface, Joseph Svercel, Joseph Taranto, Daniel Thompson, Steven Thorsen, Duwayne Tinsley, Craig Tomasino, Edward Tuffy, Dennis Tveter, Robert Walsh, Robert Whipple.(Haefele, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haefele, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16030928)Document filed by Scott Gassman, John Gallagher, Vincent Straface, Manuel Melo, Vanessa De Danzine, Christopher Panetta, Walter Cain, Patrick Ryan, Gregory Dolan, Robert Walsh, Jay Curry, Cathleen Perez, Peter Cullen, Kristen Jones, Donald Lynch, Frank Scorzello, Lori Pollock, Christopher Donohue, Duwayne Tinsley, Mark Makuta, John Mccann, Andrew Davis, Joseph Taranto, Andrew Stern, Darryl Carpenter, John Friedman, Wesley Geerholt, Joseph Cerrato, Joseph Svercel, Douglas Roske, Ira Kugelman, Beatrice Seravello, Daniel Thompson, Nicholas Romano, Michael Moloney, Gary Favro, Francis Lauricella, Roger Harwood, Randin Miller, Edward Tuffy, John Maldonado, Guyowen Howard, Idelfonso Class, Eric Covo, James Ryder, Gary Livoti, James Maxwell, William Lynch, Raul Perez, John Moschella, Louis Kaufman, Richard Seibert, Howard Roberts, George Darini, Shimicka Meadows, Hector Lorenzo, Karen Mulcahy- Normile, Francis Orlando, Dennis Murphy, Philip Armacida, Elizabeth Curcio, Wayne Abrahams, Brian Sheehan, Keith Flinton, Robert Whipple, Awilda Santana, William Dinkelacker, Rosemarie Drazka, Richard Schriefer, William Popow, Dawn Healey, Kevin Collins, Steven Oemcke, William Martinez, Joseph Lane, Charles DeRienzo, Wanda Lopez, Dennis Rudolph, Peter DeNardis, George Johansen, Sean Kelly, John DePrima, Gerard Collins, Craig Tomasino, Sean Butler, Frank Seabrook, Tim Bracken, Keith Gessner, Steven Thorsen, Darin Caputo, Jamie Levine, Philip Kouril, Michael Cameron, John Gillen, Dennis Tveter, Donald Bradley, David Gaynor, Matthew Gilbert, Ralph Johnson, Dennis Browne.(Haefele, Robert) Modified on 12/11/2018 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrahams et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Cullen
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duwayne Tinsley
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cerrato
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Oemcke
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Kaufman
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Walsh
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lane
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Armacida
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Lauricella
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dinkelacker
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Gassman
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Abrahams
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Favro
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles DeRienzo
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Maxwell
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Seibert
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Collins
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Thorsen
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Moschella
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Martinez
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Straface
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Tomasino
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Taranto
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ryan
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa De Danzine
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lynch
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Friedman
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Gilbert
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tveter
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Davis
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gillen
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idelfonso Class
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lynch
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Lorenzo
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Kouril
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Curry
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shimicka Meadows
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gaynor
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Livoti
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Svercel
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Murphy
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Melo
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Orlando
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Kugelman
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moloney
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Perez
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John DePrima
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Rudolph
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Roberts
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Pollock
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Harwood
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Popow
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Stern
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Makuta
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Carpenter
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Levine
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Johansen
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Flinton
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Bracken
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gallagher
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Browne
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guyowen Howard
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Dolan
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Perez
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Seravello
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Panetta
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Roske
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mccann
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Donohue
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Darini
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Lopez
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Collins
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Awilda Santana
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Whipple
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Butler
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Gessner
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cameron
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Curcio
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Schriefer
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Kelly
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ryder
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Mulcahy- Normile
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Thompson
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Bradley
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Johnson
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Jones
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randin Miller
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Tuffy
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Cain
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Romano
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Scorzello
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter DeNardis
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Sheehan
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Caputo
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Healey
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Covo
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Drazka
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Geerholt
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Seabrook
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?