Doe v. Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Carmen Gomez, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Lily Chan, Michael Grey, Lisa Sweburg, Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc., Jacqueline Lucas, Brian Derby and Lauren Keigler
Case Number: 1:2018cv11528
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Sweet
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 2/6/2019 re: #23 FIRST MOTION for Confidentiality Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe" filed by John Doe. Motion Pending. (Chan, Tsz)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 FIRST MOTION for Confidentiality Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe". . Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants as follows: Defendants shall submit their opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Anonymously on or before January 18, 2019. Plaintiff shall submit his reply in further support of his Motion to Proceed Anonymously on or before February 1, 2019. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Anonymously shall be held on February 6, 2019 at 12:00 pm. Defendants' deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to March 19, 2019. No prior extensions have been requested. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #23 FIRST MOTION for Confidentiality Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe". (Replies due by 2/1/2019. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.), Lily Chan answer due 3/19/2019; Brian Derby answer due 3/19/2019; Carmen Gomez answer due 3/19/2019; Michael Grey answer due 3/19/2019; Lauren Keigler answer due 3/19/2019; Jacqueline Lucas answer due 3/19/2019; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC answer due 3/19/2019; Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc. answer due 3/19/2019; Lisa Sweburg answer due 3/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/23/2019) (ne)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #23 FIRST MOTION for Confidentiality Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe". . Document filed by Lily Chan, Brian Derby, Carmen Gomez, Michael Grey, Lauren Keigler, Jacqueline Lucas, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc., Lisa Sweburg. (Lunetta, Kimberley)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sam Scott Shaulson on behalf of Lily Chan, Brian Derby, Carmen Gomez, Michael Grey, Lauren Keigler, Jacqueline Lucas, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc., Lisa Sweburg. (Shaulson, Sam)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Anton Linthorst on behalf of Lily Chan, Brian Derby, Carmen Gomez, Michael Grey, Lauren Keigler, Jacqueline Lucas, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc., Lisa Sweburg. (Linthorst, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Lily Chan, Brian Derby, Carmen Gomez, Michael Grey, Lauren Keigler, Jacqueline Lucas, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc., Lisa Sweburg. (Lunetta, Kimberley)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberley E. Lunetta on behalf of Lily Chan, Brian Derby, Carmen Gomez, Michael Grey, Lauren Keigler, Jacqueline Lucas, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc., Lisa Sweburg. (Lunetta, Kimberley)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to proceed anonymously, dated December 12, 2018, shall be heard at 12:00PM on Wednesday, January 30, 2019 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #23 FIRST MOTION for Confidentiality Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe". (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/7/2019) ( Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (ks) Modified on 1/11/2019 (ks).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lily Chan waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Brian Derby waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Carmen Gomez waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Michael Grey waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Lauren Keigler waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Jacqueline Lucas waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Lisa Sweburg waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 FIRST MOTION for Confidentiality Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe". . Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FIRST MOTION for Confidentiality Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe". Document filed by John Doe.(Melamed, Abraham)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Abraham Zev Wolf Melamed to RE-FILE Document #22 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document(s) linked to filing error. (db)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Abraham Zev Wolf Melamed to RE-FILE Document #21 FIRST MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe". Use the event type Confidentiality found under the event list Motion(s). (db)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 FIRST MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe". . Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham) Modified on 12/12/2018 (db).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff to proceed as "John Doe". Document filed by John Doe.(Melamed, Abraham) Modified on 12/12/2018 (db).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc.. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carmen Gomez. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lily Chan. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacqueline Lucas. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Derby. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Grey. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lisa Sweburg. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lauren Keigler. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Robert W. Sweet. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Abraham Zev Wolf Melamed. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:2003. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000(e). (sj)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Grey, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lauren Keigler, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lisa Sweburg, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian Derby, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JACQUELINE LUCAS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LILY CHAN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carmen Gomez, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MORGAN STANLEY SERVICES GROUP INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Melamed, Abraham)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lily Chan, Brian Derby, Carmen Gomez, Michael Grey, Lauren Keigler, Jacqueline Lucas, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc., Lisa Sweburg. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16032108)Document filed by John Doe.(Melamed, Abraham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Gomez
Represented By: Thomas Anton Linthorst
Represented By: Sam Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Thomas Anton Linthorst
Represented By: Sam Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lily Chan
Represented By: Thomas Anton Linthorst
Represented By: Sam Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Grey
Represented By: Thomas Anton Linthorst
Represented By: Sam Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Sweburg
Represented By: Thomas Anton Linthorst
Represented By: Sam Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Services Group Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Anton Linthorst
Represented By: Sam Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lucas
Represented By: Thomas Anton Linthorst
Represented By: Sam Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Derby
Represented By: Thomas Anton Linthorst
Represented By: Sam Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Keigler
Represented By: Thomas Anton Linthorst
Represented By: Sam Scott Shaulson
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Abraham Zev Wolf Melamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?