Adorno v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Anthony Adorno, Martin Dunne, Kieran Creighton, Anthony Damato, Tara Cruz, Robert Darienzo, Tarik Clyburn, Sheila Assael, Michael Dittrich, Sean Donovan, Joseph Decicco, Terrance Daniels, Michael Debonis, Gabriel Diaz, Emma Drop, Edward Barry, Ronald Deconne, Dionne Davis, Cleneth Dais, Mark Deluca, Tricia Curullli, Frank Devlin, Paul Dunne, Wiener Denizard, Michael Dicecco, Hairo Cuellar, Edward Donnelly, John Delgaudio, Thomas Delahanty, Stephen Davis, Robert D'Amodio, Conrad Crump, Peter Deblasio, Gerardo Blanco, Frank Dipreta, Peter Devine, Roxanne Coley, Kenneth Caprio, John Donnellan, Guy D'Alessio, Steven Decrescenzo, James Donohue, Philip Cuffaro, Vincent Desantis, Dean Dibitonto, Robert Dana, Joseph Derby, Jr., Keith Brenner, John Delgardo, Brulinda Derby, Robert Donofrio, Salvatore Comodo, Andrew Cupidore, Debrua Deas-Coleman, Elvis Delgado, Michael Dimino, James Delaney, Eileen Duncan, Stephen Delduca, John Donohue, Phyllis Curreri, Mia Diperi, Thomas Bodkin, Paul Depace, Athena Dunlap, Carolyn Crummey, Stephen Digena, Juan Duque, Robert Dunn, William Bernitt, IV., Nicholas D'Amico, Karen Diperi, Jabded Ahmed, Joseph Domiano, Louis Curreri, Barbara Drogan, Todd Cracco, Anthony Cutrone, Michael J Diperi, Frederick Davis, Calogero Dimaggio, Kerry Donovan, Adam Curcio, Steven Dulisse, Elena Donnell, Tara Cuccias, Kevin Craig, Zoran Despot, Kevin Drain, Adrienne Breland-Gardner, Michael A Diperi, Howard Distafano, Raymond Bazilio, Anthony Delouisa, Charlane Brown, Mark Ditoro, Robert Dean, Edward Degennaro and Julio Deleon
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11578
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by Adam Curcio; Peter Deblasio; Raymond Bazilio; Edward Barry; Martin Dunne; Steven Decrescenzo; Tara Cuccias; John Delgardo; Steven Dulisse; Joseph Derby, Jr.; Todd Cracco; Stephen Delduca; Louis Curreri; Kerry Donovan; Vincent Desantis; Robert Donofrio; Conrad Crump; Gerardo Blanco; Ronald Deconne; Karen Diperi; Julio Deleon; Dean Dibitonto; Calogero Dimaggio; William Bernitt, IV.; Phyllis Curreri(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Curreri, Deceased;); Kieran Creighton; Juan Duque; Michael Dittrich; Thomas Bodkin; Elvis Delgado; Sean Donovan; Michael Dicecco; Peter Devine; Kenneth Caprio; Carolyn Crummey; Michael A Diperi; Philip Cuffaro; Paul Dunne; Joseph Decicco; Jabded Ahmed; Gabriel Diaz; Salvatore Comodo; Brulinda Derby; Michael J Diperi; Sheila Assael; Guy D'Alessio; Edward Degennaro; Andrew Cupidore; Charlane Brown; Kevin Drain; Stephen Digena; Eileen Duncan; Joseph Domiano; Emma Drop; John Donnellan; Anthony Adorno; Phyllis Curreri(, Individually;); Dionne Davis; Michael Debonis; John Donohue; Mark Ditoro; James Delaney; Stephen Davis; Keith Brenner; Mark Deluca; John Delgaudio; Adrienne Breland-Gardner; Edward Donnelly; Robert Dunn; Elena Donnell; Roxanne Coley; Tarik Clyburn; Robert Darienzo; Howard Distafano; Kevin Craig; Wiener Denizard; Robert Dean; Thomas Delahanty; Frank Devlin; Paul Depace; Tara Cruz; Zoran Despot; Debrua Deas-Coleman; Anthony Damato; Anthony Delouisa; James Donohue; Anthony Cutrone; Cleneth Dais; Robert Dana; Frank Dipreta; Frederick Davis; Robert D'Amodio; Tricia Curullli; Terrance Daniels; Barbara Drogan; Mia Diperi; Nicholas D'Amico; Athena Dunlap; Hairo Cuellar; Michael Dimino. (Kreindler, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 13, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 13, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 13, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 12, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
December 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Adam Curcio, Peter Deblasio, Raymond Bazilio, Edward Barry, Martin Dunne, Steven Decrescenzo, Tara Cuccias, John Delgardo, Steven Dulisse, Joseph Derby, Jr., Todd Cracco, Stephen Delduca, Louis Curreri, Kerry Donovan, Vincent Desantis, Robert Donofrio, Conrad Crump, Gerardo Blanco, Ronald Deconne, Karen Diperi, Julio Deleon, Dean Dibitonto, Calogero Dimaggio, William Bernitt, IV., Phyllis Curreri(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Curreri, Deceased;), Kieran Creighton, Juan Duque, Michael Dittrich, Thomas Bodkin, Elvis Delgado, Sean Donovan, Michael Dicecco, Peter Devine, Kenneth Caprio, Carolyn Crummey, Michael A Diperi, Philip Cuffaro, Paul Dunne, Joseph Decicco, Jabded Ahmed, Gabriel Diaz, Salvatore Comodo, Brulinda Derby, Michael J Diperi, Sheila Assael, Guy D'Alessio, Edward Degennaro, Andrew Cupidore, Charlane Brown, Kevin Drain, Stephen Digena, Eileen Duncan, Joseph Domiano, Emma Drop, John Donnellan, Anthony Adorno, Phyllis Curreri(, Individually;), Dionne Davis, Michael Debonis, John Donohue, Mark Ditoro, James Delaney, Stephen Davis, Keith Brenner, Mark Deluca, John Delgaudio, Adrienne Breland-Gardner, Edward Donnelly, Robert Dunn, Elena Donnell, Roxanne Coley, Tarik Clyburn, Robert Darienzo, Howard Distafano, Kevin Craig, Wiener Denizard, Robert Dean, Thomas Delahanty, Frank Devlin, Paul Depace, Tara Cruz, Zoran Despot, Debrua Deas-Coleman, Anthony Damato, Anthony Delouisa, James Donohue, Anthony Cutrone, Cleneth Dais, Robert Dana, Frank Dipreta, Frederick Davis, Robert D'Amodio, Tricia Curullli, Terrance Daniels, Barbara Drogan, Mia Diperi, Nicholas D'Amico, Athena Dunlap, Hairo Cuellar, Michael Dimino. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Pounian, Steven)
December 12, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners John Donohue, Emma Drop, Kerry Donovan, Edward Donnelly, Robert Donofrio, Athena Dunlap, Eileen Duncan, Steven Dulisse, Robert Dunn, Kevin Drain, Martin Dunne, Juan Duque, Paul Dunne, James Donohue, Sean Donovan, Barbara Drogan added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by John Donohue, Emma Drop, Kerry Donovan, Edward Donnelly, Robert Donofrio, Athena Dunlap, Eileen Duncan, Steven Dulisse, Robert Dunn, Kevin Drain, Martin Dunne, Juan Duque, Paul Dunne, James Donohue, Sean Donovan, Barbara Drogan. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Pounian, Steven)
December 12, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners John Donnellan, Paul Depace, Peter Devine, Elena Donnell, Brulinda Derby, Joseph Domiano, Mark Ditoro, Anthony Delouisa, Howard Distafano, Mark Deluca, Michael A Diperi, Dean Dibitonto, Gabriel Diaz, Frank Devlin, Michael Dicecco, Frank Dipreta, Vincent Desantis, Karen Diperi, Stephen Digena, Michael Dittrich, Mia Diperi, Michael Dimino, Michael J Diperi, Calogero Dimaggio, Wiener Denizard, Joseph Derby, Jr., Zoran Despot added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by John Donnellan, Paul Depace, Peter Devine, Elena Donnell, Brulinda Derby, Joseph Domiano, Mark Ditoro, Anthony Delouisa, Howard Distafano, Mark Deluca, Michael A Diperi, Dean Dibitonto, Gabriel Diaz, Frank Devlin, Michael Dicecco, Frank Dipreta, Vincent Desantis, Karen Diperi, Stephen Digena, Michael Dittrich, Mia Diperi, Michael Dimino, Michael J Diperi, Calogero Dimaggio, Wiener Denizard, Joseph Derby, Jr., Zoran Despot. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Pounian, Steven)
December 12, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Stephen Delduca, Edward Degennaro, Dionne Davis, Peter Deblasio, Julio Deleon, Frederick Davis, Robert Dana, Terrance Daniels, James Delaney, John Delgardo, Thomas Delahanty, Elvis Delgado, Ronald Deconne, Stephen Davis, Robert Darienzo, Joseph Decicco, Michael Debonis, Steven Decrescenzo, John Delgaudio, Debrua Deas-Coleman, Robert Dean added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Stephen Delduca, Edward Degennaro, Dionne Davis, Peter Deblasio, Julio Deleon, Frederick Davis, Robert Dana, Terrance Daniels, James Delaney, John Delgardo, Thomas Delahanty, Elvis Delgado, Ronald Deconne, Stephen Davis, Robert Darienzo, Joseph Decicco, Michael Debonis, Steven Decrescenzo, John Delgaudio, Debrua Deas-Coleman, Robert Dean. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Pounian, Steven)
December 12, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Kieran Creighton, Cleneth Dais, Salvatore Comodo, Phyllis Curreri, Andrew Cupidore, Raymond Bazilio, Anthony Cutrone, Keith Brenner, Louis Curreri, Carolyn Crummey, William Bernitt, IV., Adam Curcio, Phyllis Curreri, Nicholas D'Amico, Philip Cuffaro, Jabded Ahmed, Hairo Cuellar, Sheila Assael, Tricia Curullli, Kevin Craig, Robert D'Amodio, Tara Cruz, Todd Cracco, Conrad Crump, Tarik Clyburn, Gerardo Blanco, Edward Barry, Kenneth Caprio, Charlane Brown, Roxanne Coley, Tara Cuccias, Guy D'Alessio, Adrienne Breland-Gardner, Thomas Bodkin, Anthony Damato added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Kieran Creighton, Cleneth Dais, Salvatore Comodo, Phyllis Curreri, Andrew Cupidore, Raymond Bazilio, Anthony Cutrone, Keith Brenner, Louis Curreri, Carolyn Crummey, William Bernitt, IV., Adam Curcio, Phyllis Curreri, Nicholas D'Amico, Philip Cuffaro, Jabded Ahmed, Hairo Cuellar, Sheila Assael, Tricia Curullli, Kevin Craig, Robert D'Amodio, Tara Cruz, Todd Cracco, Conrad Crump, Tarik Clyburn, Gerardo Blanco, Edward Barry, Kenneth Caprio, Charlane Brown, Roxanne Coley, Tara Cuccias, Guy D'Alessio, Adrienne Breland-Gardner, Thomas Bodkin, Anthony Damato. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Pounian, Steven)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Anthony Adorno.(Pounian, Steven)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pounian, Steven)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16038934)Document filed by Anthony Adorno. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Pounian, Steven) Modified on 12/12/2018 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adorno v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Adorno
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Dunne
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kieran Creighton
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Damato
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Cruz
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Darienzo
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarik Clyburn
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Assael
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dittrich
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Donovan
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Decicco
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Daniels
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Debonis
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Diaz
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Drop
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Barry
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Deconne
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Davis
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleneth Dais
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Deluca
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Curullli
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Devlin
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dunne
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiener Denizard
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dicecco
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hairo Cuellar
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Donnelly
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Delgaudio
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Delahanty
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Davis
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D'Amodio
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Crump
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Deblasio
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Blanco
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Dipreta
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Devine
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Coley
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Caprio
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Donnellan
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy D'Alessio
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Decrescenzo
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Donohue
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Cuffaro
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Desantis
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Dibitonto
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dana
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Derby, Jr.
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Brenner
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Delgardo
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brulinda Derby
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Donofrio
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Comodo
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Cupidore
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debrua Deas-Coleman
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Delgado
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dimino
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Delaney
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Duncan
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Delduca
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Donohue
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Curreri
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Diperi
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bodkin
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Depace
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athena Dunlap
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Crummey
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Digena
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Duque
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dunn
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bernitt, IV.
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas D'Amico
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Diperi
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabded Ahmed
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Domiano
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Curreri
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Drogan
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Cracco
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cutrone
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Diperi
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Davis
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calogero Dimaggio
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Donovan
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Curcio
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dulisse
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Donnell
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Cuccias
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Craig
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoran Despot
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Drain
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Breland-Gardner
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Diperi
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Distafano
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Bazilio
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Delouisa
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlane Brown
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ditoro
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dean
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Degennaro
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Deleon
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?