Fischer v. Verizon New York, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Fischer and James H. Fischer
Defendant: Verizon New York, Inc. and Verizon Communications, Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Verizon Online, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11628
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #96 Letter, filed by Verizon Online, LLC, Verizon New York, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall follow the modified briefing schedule proposed above. SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #96 Letter, #94 MOTION for Sanctions (Responses due by 1/10/2020, Replies due by 1/24/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/17/2019) (rro)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Justin A. Corbalis, Esq. dated 12/17/19 re: Extension on Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Sanctions Motion. Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC.(Corbalis, Justin)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 12/12/19 re: Case Status Update. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for Sanctions . Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #92 Letter filed by James H. Fischer. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall brief the sanctions motion on the schedule listed above. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 11/22/2019., Responses due by 12/20/2019, Replies due by 1/6/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/12/2019) (rro)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from James Fischer dated 11/08/19 re: Proposed Schedule, per your Order in Doc #86. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: As discussed on the record at today's conference, the parties shall file a joint status letter by December 12, 2019. Within one week after Magistrate Judge Wang rules on Plaintiff's anticipated motion for sanctions, the parties shall file a joint status letter proposing a briefing schedule for summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/8/2019) (jwh)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Status Conference held on 11/8/2019. (Court Reporter Pam Utter) (arc)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #90 Memorandum & Opinion to James Fischer at 99 Wall St Suite 1956, New York, NY 10005. (arc)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: #62 SECOND MOTION to Remand filed by James H. Fischer. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's second motion to remand this case is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 62. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/4/2019) (mml)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 11/4/2019 re: Addendum To Doc #88. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Justin A Corbalis, Esq. dated 11/1/2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC.(Corbalis, Justin)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying #83 Motion to Seal Document. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's request to file call logs under seal, and for an extension of the discovery deadline to permit such filing. (ECF 83). That request is DENIED. Discovery materials generally should not be filed with the Court, and Plaintiff has not shown why an exception exists here. See Local Rule 5.1. If Plaintiff has questions about how to use discovery, he may consult the following pamphlet: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/discovery-guide-for-pro-se-litigants. The Clerk is directed to close ECF 83. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/1/2019) (rro)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying #82 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's request for a discovery conference and Defendants' response. (ECF 82, 85). Because discovery is now closed, the request for a discovery conference is DENIED. It is unclear whether Plaintiff's mention of an anticipated "motion in limine" is intended to reference an actual "motion in limine," which is a trial motion, or a motion for sanctions. If Plaintiff seeks to bring a motion in limine, such a motion would be premature at this time and should be brought later before Judge Abrams. If Plaintiff seeks to bring a sanctions motion, which would be before the undersigned, he shall first meet and confer with Defendants and propose a briefing schedule for such a motion. By Friday, November 8, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a status letter informing the Court of his intention and providing a briefing schedule, if necessary. The Clerk is directed to close ECF 82. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/31/2019) (kv)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Justin A. Corbalis, Esq. dated 10/29/19 re: Plaintiff's Request for Discovery Conference. Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC.(Corbalis, Justin)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Defendants shall file a response, not to exceed 3 pages, to Plaintiff's letter motion for a conference, ECF 82, by Tuesday, October 29, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/24/2019) (drf)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document and to extend Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from James Fischer dated 10/24/19. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 LETTER MOTION for Conference per your Individual Rules addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from James Fischer dated 10/18/19. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: In light of the extension of the discovery deadline, see Dkt. 80, the post-discovery conference in this matter is adjourned until November 8, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. No later than November 1, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint letter updating the Court as to the status of thecase, including whether either party intends to file a dispositive motion and what efforts the parties have made to settle this action. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/10/2019) (jca) Modified on 10/11/2019 (jca).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #77 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Justin Corbalis, Esq. dated 10/4/2019 re: Status Update. Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Discovery shall be completed by October 24, 2019. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 10/24/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/9/2019) (rjm)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/11/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Justin Corbalis, Esq. dated 10/4/2019 re: Status Update. Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC.(Corbalis, Justin)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for Mr. Darren Shasho.Document filed by James H. Fischer.(vba)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for Telesource Communications Inc.Document filed by James H. Fischer.(vba)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: light of the extension of the discovery deadline, see dkt. 75, the post-discovery conference in this matter is adjourned until October 25, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. No later than October 18, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint letter updating the Court as to the status of the case, including whether either party intends to file a dispositive motion and what efforts the parties have made to settle this action. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/12/2019) (jca)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Discovery deadline extended to October 12, 2019. Parties to submit a joint status letter on October 4, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 9-11-19) (Wang, Ona)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2019. (Quinn, Diane)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for Intelisys 1318 Redwood Way, Petaluma, CA 94954. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(aea)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for infoUSA, Inc 1020 East 1st Street, Papillion, NE 68046. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(aea)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for InTouch Communications 730 W. Randolph, 4th Floor, Chicago, IL 60661. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(aea)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for Dun & Bradstreet, Inc. 103 JFK Parkway, Short Hills, NJ 07078. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(aea)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: In light of the extension of the discovery deadline, see dkt. 73, the post-discovery conference in this matter is adjourned until October 11, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. No later than October 4, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint letter updating the Court as to the status of the case, including whether either party intends to file a dispositive motion and what efforts the parties have made to settle this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/27/2019) ( Status Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (ks)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for Dex YP 2200 West Airfield Drive, DFW Airport, TX 75261.Document filed by James H. Fischer.(aea)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for iConnectv 100 Somerset Corporate Blvd, Bridgewater Township, NJ 08807.Document filed by James H. Fischer.(aea)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Request for Subpoena Received (at the Pro Se Counter): Request for Three subpoena(s) to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action, from James Fischer received on 8/1/2019. (sac)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for Yext, Inc.; Neustar (Legal Complaince Dept.); Transaction Network Services Inc. Document filed by James H. Fischer. (sac)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #71 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application Granted. Discovery closes Sept. 28, 2019. Sept. 11, 2019 Status Call to remain as scheduled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/29/2019) (rro)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/28/2019. (rro)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiff shall directly request issuance of any subpoenas from the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff may contact the Pro Se Office, located in the United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, Room 105, New York, NY (telephone 212-805-0175) if he needs guidance on the proper procedures. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/26/2019) (rro)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from James Fischer dated 7/25/19. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
July 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #62 SECOND MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by James H. Fischer. (Fischer, James)
July 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SUBPOENA ISSUED for TNSI.Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #62 SECOND MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC. (Corbalis, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUBPOENA ISSUED for Yext, Inc..Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SUBPOENA ISSUED for Neustar, Inc.Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for Ooma, Inc 525 Almanor Avenue, Suite 200 Sunnyvale, CA 94085.Document filed by James H. Fischer. Summons sent by first class mail to Plaintiff James H. Fischer at 99 Wall St Suite 1956 New York, NY 10005 (aea)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #65 Memo Endorsement, to James H. Fischer James Fischer 99 Wall St Suite 1956 New York, NY 10005. (aea)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #48 Subpoena Issued filed by James H. Fischer. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. The Clerk of Court shall issue the attached subpoena and mail it to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/2/2019) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: The Court held a Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference in this matter on July 2, 2019. The Court will hold a Status Telephone Call on Wednesday, September 11, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Please call Chambers at 212-805-0260 when all counsel are on the line. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/2/2019) (rro)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Telephone Conference held on 7/2/2019. (wv)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent GTE LLC, Other Affiliate NYNEX LLC, Other Affiliate Verizon Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Verizon Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate GTE Wireless Incorporated for Verizon Online, LLC. Document filed by Verizon Online, LLC.(Rooney, Gavin)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Gavin J. Rooney to RE-FILE Document #59 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SECOND MOTION to Remand . Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC.(Rooney, Gavin)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE #61 Answer) - ANSWER to #46 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC.(Rooney, Gavin) Modified on 6/14/2019 (db).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent GTE LLC for Verizon Online, LLC. Document filed by Verizon Online, LLC.(Rooney, Gavin) Modified on 6/17/2019 (ldi).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: withdrawing #56 Motion in Limine; granting #57 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at docket entries 56 and 57. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/10/2019) (ama)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Withdraw of Motion in Limine addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from James Fischer dated 6/6/19. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION in Limine . Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: The parties have requested a settlement conference in this matter. (ECF 52). Accordingly, the Court will hold a Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call on Tuesday, July 02, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. Please call Chambers at 212-805-0260 when all counsel are on the line. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 6/4/2019) (mro)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application granted. By separate order, this matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Wang for a settlement conference. The post-discovery conference currently scheduled for July 12, 2019 is adjourned until August 30, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/3/2019) (ks)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/3/2019) (ne)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery And for Referral to Magistrate Judge for Settlement addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Justin A. Corbalis dated 5/31/19. Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC.(Corbalis, Justin)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Corbalis on behalf of Verizon Online, LLC. (Corbalis, Justin)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gavin J. Rooney on behalf of Verizon Online, LLC. (Rooney, Gavin)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by James H. Fischer. (Fischer, James)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUBPOENA ISSUED.Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION & ORDER re: #13 MOTION to Remand . filed by James H. Fischer. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs motion to remand this case is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/28/2019) (ks)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Verizon New York, Inc., Verizon Online, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUBPOENA ISSUED.Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 37. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/13/2019) (ks) Modified on 5/15/2019 (arc).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Mooting Motion To Amend addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 5/10/19. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #41 terminating #35 Motion to Strike. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 35. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/9/2019) (jwh)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Justin A Corbalis on behalf of Defendants dated 5/8/2019 re: Plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc..(Corbalis, Justin)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of Declaration of Custodian Records from RCN to James H. Fischer at 99 Wall St, Suite 1956, New York, NY 10005. (arc)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Corbalis, Justin)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER with respect to #38 LETTER MOTION for Discovery to Ms. Ruby J. Krajick In Re RCN's unusual Subpeona "compliance". Plaintiff is advised that he may contact Records Management at (212) 805 - 0700 for assistance obtaining discovery documents that are sent to the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/26/2019) (jca)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Discovery to Ms. Ruby J. Krajick In Re RCN's unusual Subpeona "compliance" addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 4/24/19. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #36 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Subpoena Issued to James H. Fischer James Fischer 99 Wall St Suite 1956 New York, NY 10005. (nb)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SUBPOENA ISSUED for Deborah Rankin on 05/08/2019. Document filed by James H. Fischer. (nb)
April 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct Admissions per FRCP 36(b). Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #36 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (ks)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to issue the attached subpoena and mail it to Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall serve the subpoena on the party to whom it is directed in the manner described in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/11/2019) (ks) Modified on 4/16/2019 (ks).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Strike Document No. #6 Affirmative Defenses. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena upon RCN, Inc. addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 4/8/19. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Corbalis on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Corbalis, Justin)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Justin A. Corbalis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #28 Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order to James Fischer at 99 Wall St, Suite 1956, New York, NY 10005. (arc)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Justin A. Corbalis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16573409. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Received returned mail: Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order was mailed to James H. Fischer at Box 287048 New York, NY 10128 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to forward. (arc)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Justin A. Corbalis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16573409. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbalis, Justin)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by James H. Fischer. (Fischer, James)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James H. Fischer. New Address: 99 Wall St, Suite 1956, New York, NY, US 10005, 917-628-4052. (Fischer, James)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #28 Case Management Plan to James H. Fischer at Box 287048 New York, NY 10128. (arc)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2019. Deposition due by 6/28/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Post Discovery Hearing set for 7/12/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/22/2019) (ks)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2019. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (arc)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #26 MOTION for Justin A. Corbalis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of New Jersey; the filing fee was not paid;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 2/21/19 re: No Objection to Justin Corbalis' Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Justin A. Corbalis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit Aff in Support of Motion)(Corbalis, Justin) Modified on 2/22/2019 (wb).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 2/15/2019 re: Plaintiff's Proposed Order (ECF won't accept a 'proposed order' - error 29). Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 2/15/2019 re: Case Summary, per Order (Doc #8). Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Rooney, Gavin)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Rooney, Gavin)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gavin J. Rooney dated 2/15/2019 re: Defendants' Case Summary. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc..(Rooney, Gavin)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/8/2019) (rj)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/15/2019 (rj)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time No Objection to Defendants' Request For Extension of Time addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 2/8/2019. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. dated 02.08.2019 re: briefing on motion to remand. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc..(Rooney, Gavin)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER terminating #15 Motion to Remand to State Court; terminating #16 Motion to Amend/Correct. Application granted. the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at docket entries 15 and 16. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/7/2019) (ks) Modified on 2/7/2019 (ks). Modified on 2/7/2019 (ks). Modified on 2/7/2019 (ks).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Doc #15 is a duplicate of Doc #13 - Please ignore. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(Fischer, James)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EX PARTE MOTION TO REMAND; re: to Remand to State Court. Document filed by James H. Fischer.(sc) Modified on 2/4/2019 (sc).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of James Fischer in Support re: #13 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by James H. Fischer. (Fischer, James)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Remand . Document filed by James H. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Fischer, James)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #11 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. The Court is in receipt of the attached letter from Plaintiff. Plaintiff is hereby granted permission to participate in electronic case filing (ECF) in this case. Plaintiff shall file the "motion to remand" referenced in the attached letter on ECF. Plaintiff is advised that all further communications with the Court shall be through ECF or through the Pro Se Intake Unit at 500 Pearl Street, Room 200, New York, New York 10007. Plaintiff is further advised that he may contact the NYLAG Legal Clinic for Pro Se Litigants in the Southern District of New York should he wish to seek assistance with this case. Attached to this Order is a flier containing information about the NYLAG clinic. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 11. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/09/2019) (ama)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING; re: for Permission for James Fischer to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by James Fischer.(sc)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: James Fischer consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by James Fischer.(sc)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James Fischer dated 12/20/2018 re: status of motion. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/21/2018) (rro)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #8 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to James Fischer 99 Wall St., Suite 1956 New York, NY 10005. (aea)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/17/2018) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses served on James Fischer on December 14, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Rooney, Gavin)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Rooney, Gavin)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Case Information Statement served on James Fischer on December 12, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Rooney, Gavin)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc..(Rooney, Gavin)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rooney, Gavin)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 160404/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16045382).Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rooney, Gavin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer v. Verizon New York, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon New York, Inc.
Represented By: Gavin J. Rooney
Represented By: Justin Corbalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Gavin J. Rooney
Represented By: Justin Corbalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Verizon Online, LLC
Represented By: Gavin J. Rooney
Represented By: Justin Corbalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?