Casilla et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Luis Delgado, Patricia Samuel, Zhen Jun Chen, Valerie Derbyshire, Paul Dudek, Madeline DiCicco, Peter Cefalo, Rhoda Yin, Michael Cruz, Anthony Compoccia, Richard DiLoreto, Richard DePaola, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Kevin Curtis, Robin Dufek, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Walter Chrynwski, Clyde Dodds, Illona DiMiceli, Nina Cerfolio, Laurie Dufek, Victoria Discon, Janine Crafa, Renee Legette, Albert Deangelis, Robert DiCicco, James Derby, Douglas Curtis, Olga Churiy, Hilda Dunne, Michelle DiLoreto, Mark DiPierro, Kevin Daly, Jean Cotroneo, Donald Kelly, Kenneth Dunne, Robert Catalanello, Guanghi Li, Joan Donahue, Pamela Cleaves, Frederick Dufek, Margaret Edelman, James Donahue, Lydia Concepcion, Jason Dufek, Corinne DiPierro, Ronald Erbel, Emillian Emeagwali, Patrick Emeagwali, Balbina Cernadas, Faye Dewitt, Bashiek Collins, Angela Cefalo, Fred Cohen, Stella Cortijo, Leszek Cybulski, Joseph Dephillips, Elizabeth D'Angelo, Richard Costarella, Albert Cernadas, Frances Ekblom, Brenda Catalanello, Lester Edelman, Theresa Donahue, Lisa Daly, Joseph D'Angelo, Neil Ekblom, Michael Duffy, Vincent Dupont, Christopher Mouhlas, Julio Escalante, Xiu Mei Chen, Peter Corazzi, Aida Cruz, Terence Dougherty, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Brian Docherty, Theodore Cimino, Giacomo Pesce, Vincent D'Antonio, Anthony Casilla, Joann Costarella, S.G.T. John Dolan, Thomas Donahue, John Coughlin, Terri Hoffman, Diana Dillinger, Stanley Kornfeld, Irene Dorf, Rene Escabi Segarra, Kelly Dillinger, Jane Eng, Peter Cole, Iris Cruz, Troy Dufek, Lisa Dudek, Christine Dougherty, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, John Dimiceli, James A Drohan, Madeleine DiCicco, Xiu M. Chen, Theresa Donohue and Thomas S. Donohue
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11645
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (pc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Anthony Casilla, Brenda Catalanello, Robert Catalanello, Angela Cefalo, Peter Cefalo, Nina Cerfolio, Albert Cernadas, Balbina Cernadas, Xiu M. Chen, Zhen Jun Chen, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, Walter Chrynwski, Olga Churiy, Theodore Cimino, Pamela Cleaves, Fred Cohen, Peter Cole, Bashiek Collins, Anthony Compoccia, Lydia Concepcion, Peter Corazzi, Stella Cortijo, Joann Costarella, Richard Costarella, Jean Cotroneo, John Coughlin, Janine Crafa, Aida Cruz, Iris Cruz, Michael Cruz, Douglas Curtis, Kevin Curtis, Leszek Cybulski, Elizabeth D'Angelo, Joseph D'Angelo, Vincent D'Antonio, Kevin Daly, Lisa Daly, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Richard DePaola, Albert Deangelis, Luis Delgado, Joseph Dephillips, James Derby, Valerie Derbyshire, Faye Dewitt, Madeleine DiCicco, Robert DiCicco, Michelle DiLoreto, Richard DiLoreto, Illona DiMiceli, Corinne DiPierro, Mark DiPierro, Diana Dillinger, Kelly Dillinger, John Dimiceli, Victoria Discon, Brian Docherty, Clyde Dodds, John Dolan, James Donahue, Joan Donahue, Theresa Donohue, Thomas S. Donohue, Irene Dorf, Christine Dougherty, Terence Dougherty, James A Drohan, Lisa Dudek, Paul Dudek, Frederick Dufek, Jason Dufek, Laurie Dufek, Robin Dufek, Troy Dufek, Michael Duffy, Hilda Dunne, Kenneth Dunne, Vincent Dupont, Lester Edelman, Margaret Edelman, Frances Ekblom, Neil Ekblom, Emillian Emeagwali, Patrick Emeagwali, Jane Eng, Ronald Erbel, Julio Escalante, Terri Hoffman, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Donald Kelly, Stanley Kornfeld, Renee Legette, Guanghi Li, Christopher Mouhlas, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Giacomo Pesce, Patricia Samuel, Rene Escabi Segarra, Rhoda Yin. (Hansen, Daniel)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant Name Error; Defendant name as to whom the summons is being requested must be clear on the Summons PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Anthony Casilla, Brenda Catalanello, Robert Catalanello, Angela Cefalo, Peter Cefalo, Nina Cerfolio, Albert Cernadas, Balbina Cernadas, Xiu M. Chen, Zhen Jun Chen, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, Walter Chrynwski, Olga Churiy, Theodore Cimino, Pamela Cleaves, Fred Cohen, Peter Cole, Bashiek Collins, Anthony Compoccia, Lydia Concepcion, Peter Corazzi, Stella Cortijo, Joann Costarella, Richard Costarella, Jean Cotroneo, John Coughlin, Janine Crafa, Aida Cruz, Iris Cruz, Michael Cruz, Douglas Curtis, Kevin Curtis, Leszek Cybulski, Elizabeth D'Angelo, Joseph D'Angelo, Vincent D'Antonio, Kevin Daly, Lisa Daly, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Richard DePaola, Albert Deangelis, Luis Delgado, Joseph Dephillips, James Derby, Valerie Derbyshire, Faye Dewitt, Madeleine DiCicco, Robert DiCicco, Michelle DiLoreto, Richard DiLoreto, Illona DiMiceli, Corinne DiPierro, Mark DiPierro, Diana Dillinger, Kelly Dillinger, John Dimiceli, Victoria Discon, Brian Docherty, Clyde Dodds, John Dolan, James Donahue, Joan Donahue, Theresa Donohue, Thomas S. Donohue, Irene Dorf, Christine Dougherty, Terence Dougherty, James A Drohan, Lisa Dudek, Paul Dudek, Frederick Dufek, Jason Dufek, Laurie Dufek, Robin Dufek, Troy Dufek, Michael Duffy, Hilda Dunne, Kenneth Dunne, Vincent Dupont, Lester Edelman, Margaret Edelman, Frances Ekblom, Neil Ekblom, Emillian Emeagwali, Patrick Emeagwali, Jane Eng, Ronald Erbel, Julio Escalante, Terri Hoffman, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Donald Kelly, Stanley Kornfeld, Renee Legette, Guanghi Li, Christopher Mouhlas, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Giacomo Pesce, Patricia Samuel, Rene Escabi Segarra, Rhoda Yin. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/26/2018 (dnh).
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Daniel J. Hansen dated 12/21/2018 re: Related action. Document filed by Anthony Casilla, Brenda Catalanello, Robert Catalanello, Angela Cefalo, Peter Cefalo, Nina Cerfolio, Albert Cernadas, Balbina Cernadas, Xiu M. Chen, Zhen Jun Chen, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, Walter Chrynwski, Olga Churiy, Theodore Cimino, Pamela Cleaves, Fred Cohen, Peter Cole, Bashiek Collins, Anthony Compoccia, Lydia Concepcion, Peter Corazzi, Stella Cortijo, Joann Costarella, Richard Costarella, Jean Cotroneo, John Coughlin, Janine Crafa, Aida Cruz, Iris Cruz, Michael Cruz, Douglas Curtis, Kevin Curtis, Leszek Cybulski, Elizabeth D'Angelo, Joseph D'Angelo, Vincent D'Antonio, Kevin Daly, Lisa Daly, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Richard DePaola, Albert Deangelis, Luis Delgado, Joseph Dephillips, James Derby, Valerie Derbyshire, Faye Dewitt, Madeleine DiCicco, Robert DiCicco, Michelle DiLoreto, Richard DiLoreto, Illona DiMiceli, Corinne DiPierro, Mark DiPierro, Diana Dillinger, Kelly Dillinger, John Dimiceli, Victoria Discon, Brian Docherty, Clyde Dodds, John Dolan, James Donahue, Joan Donahue, Theresa Donohue, Thomas S. Donohue, Irene Dorf, Christine Dougherty, Terence Dougherty, James A Drohan, Lisa Dudek, Paul Dudek, Frederick Dufek, Jason Dufek, Laurie Dufek, Robin Dufek, Troy Dufek, Michael Duffy, Hilda Dunne, Kenneth Dunne, Vincent Dupont, Lester Edelman, Margaret Edelman, Frances Ekblom, Neil Ekblom, Emillian Emeagwali, Patrick Emeagwali, Jane Eng, Ronald Erbel, Julio Escalante, Terri Hoffman, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Donald Kelly, Stanley Kornfeld, Renee Legette, Guanghi Li, Christopher Mouhlas, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Giacomo Pesce, Patricia Samuel, Rene Escabi Segarra, Rhoda Yin.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Daniel J. Hansen dated 12/21/2018 re: Related action. Document filed by Anthony Casilla, Brenda Catalanello, Robert Catalanello, Angela Cefalo, Peter Cefalo, Nina Cerfolio, Albert Cernadas, Balbina Cernadas, Xiu M. Chen, Zhen Jun Chen, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, Walter Chrynwski, Olga Churiy, Theodore Cimino, Pamela Cleaves, Fred Cohen, Peter Cole, Bashiek Collins, Anthony Compoccia, Lydia Concepcion, Peter Corazzi, Stella Cortijo, Joann Costarella, Richard Costarella, Jean Cotroneo, John Coughlin, Janine Crafa, Aida Cruz, Iris Cruz, Michael Cruz, Douglas Curtis, Kevin Curtis, Leszek Cybulski, Elizabeth D'Angelo, Joseph D'Angelo, Vincent D'Antonio, Kevin Daly, Lisa Daly, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Richard DePaola, Albert Deangelis, Luis Delgado, Joseph Dephillips, James Derby, Valerie Derbyshire, Faye Dewitt, Madeleine DiCicco, Robert DiCicco, Michelle DiLoreto, Richard DiLoreto, Illona DiMiceli, Corinne DiPierro, Mark DiPierro, Diana Dillinger, Kelly Dillinger, John Dimiceli, Victoria Discon, Brian Docherty, Clyde Dodds, John Dolan, James Donahue, Joan Donahue, Theresa Donohue, Thomas S. Donohue, Irene Dorf, Christine Dougherty, Terence Dougherty, James A Drohan, Lisa Dudek, Paul Dudek, Frederick Dufek, Jason Dufek, Laurie Dufek, Robin Dufek, Troy Dufek, Michael Duffy, Hilda Dunne, Kenneth Dunne, Vincent Dupont, Lester Edelman, Margaret Edelman, Frances Ekblom, Neil Ekblom, Emillian Emeagwali, Patrick Emeagwali, Jane Eng, Ronald Erbel, Julio Escalante, Terri Hoffman, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Donald Kelly, Stanley Kornfeld, Renee Legette, Guanghi Li, Christopher Mouhlas, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Giacomo Pesce, Patricia Samuel, Rene Escabi Segarra, Rhoda Yin.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Anthony Casilla, Brenda Catalanello, Robert Catalanello, Angela Cefalo, Peter Cefalo, Nina Cerfolio, Albert Cernadas, Balbina Cernadas, Xiu M. Chen, Zhen Jun Chen, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, Walter Chrynwski, Olga Churiy, Theodore Cimino, Pamela Cleaves, Fred Cohen, Peter Cole, Bashiek Collins, Anthony Compoccia, Lydia Concepcion, Peter Corazzi, Stella Cortijo, Joann Costarella, Richard Costarella, Jean Cotroneo, John Coughlin, Janine Crafa, Aida Cruz, Iris Cruz, Michael Cruz, Douglas Curtis, Kevin Curtis, Leszek Cybulski, Elizabeth D'Angelo, Joseph D'Angelo, Vincent D'Antonio, Kevin Daly, Lisa Daly, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Richard DePaola, Albert Deangelis, Luis Delgado, Joseph Dephillips, James Derby, Valerie Derbyshire, Faye Dewitt, Madeleine DiCicco, Robert DiCicco, Michelle DiLoreto, Richard DiLoreto, Illona DiMiceli, Corinne DiPierro, Mark DiPierro, Diana Dillinger, Kelly Dillinger, John Dimiceli, Victoria Discon, Brian Docherty, Clyde Dodds, John Dolan, James Donahue, Joan Donahue, Theresa Donohue, Thomas S. Donohue, Irene Dorf, Christine Dougherty, Terence Dougherty, James A Drohan, Lisa Dudek, Paul Dudek, Frederick Dufek, Jason Dufek, Laurie Dufek, Robin Dufek, Troy Dufek, Michael Duffy, Hilda Dunne, Kenneth Dunne, Vincent Dupont, Lester Edelman, Margaret Edelman, Frances Ekblom, Neil Ekblom, Emillian Emeagwali, Patrick Emeagwali, Jane Eng, Ronald Erbel, Julio Escalante, Terri Hoffman, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Donald Kelly, Stanley Kornfeld, Renee Legette, Guanghi Li, Christopher Mouhlas, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Giacomo Pesce, Patricia Samuel, Rene Escabi Segarra, Rhoda Yin. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/26/2018 (dnh).
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MD1570. Document filed by Anthony Casilla, Brenda Catalanello, Robert Catalanello, Angela Cefalo, Peter Cefalo, Nina Cerfolio, Albert Cernadas, Balbina Cernadas, Xiu M. Chen, Zhen Jun Chen, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, Walter Chrynwski, Olga Churiy, Theodore Cimino, Pamela Cleaves, Fred Cohen, Peter Cole, Bashiek Collins, Anthony Compoccia, Lydia Concepcion, Peter Corazzi, Stella Cortijo, Joann Costarella, Richard Costarella, Jean Cotroneo, John Coughlin, Janine Crafa, Aida Cruz, Iris Cruz, Michael Cruz, Douglas Curtis, Kevin Curtis, Leszek Cybulski, Elizabeth D'Angelo, Joseph D'Angelo, Vincent D'Antonio, Kevin Daly, Lisa Daly, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Richard DePaola, Albert Deangelis, Luis Delgado, Joseph Dephillips, James Derby, Valerie Derbyshire, Faye Dewitt, Madeleine DiCicco, Robert DiCicco, Michelle DiLoreto, Richard DiLoreto, Illona DiMiceli, Corinne DiPierro, Mark DiPierro, Diana Dillinger, Kelly Dillinger, John Dimiceli, Victoria Discon, Brian Docherty, Clyde Dodds, John Dolan, James Donahue, Joan Donahue, Theresa Donohue, Thomas S. Donohue, Irene Dorf, Christine Dougherty, Terence Dougherty, James A Drohan, Lisa Dudek, Paul Dudek, Frederick Dufek, Jason Dufek, Laurie Dufek, Robin Dufek, Troy Dufek, Michael Duffy, Hilda Dunne, Kenneth Dunne, Vincent Dupont, Lester Edelman, Margaret Edelman, Frances Ekblom, Neil Ekblom, Emillian Emeagwali, Patrick Emeagwali, Jane Eng, Ronald Erbel, Julio Escalante, Terri Hoffman, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Donald Kelly, Stanley Kornfeld, Renee Legette, Guanghi Li, Christopher Mouhlas, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Giacomo Pesce, Patricia Samuel, Rene Escabi Segarra, Rhoda Yin.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Mark DiPierro, Aida Cruz, Patricia Samuel, Zhen Jun Chen, Nina Cerfolio, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Julio Escalante, Theresa Donohue, Kevin Daly, Albert Deangelis, Walter Chrynwski, Frances Ekblom, Anthony Compoccia, Jean Cotroneo, Elizabeth D'Angelo, Pamela Cleaves, Lester Edelman, Donald Kelly, Faye Dewitt, Vincent Dupont, Fred Cohen, Robin Dufek, John Dolan, Joan Donahue, Lisa Dudek, Thomas S. Donohue, Victoria Discon, Rene Escabi Segarra, Frederick Dufek, Brenda Catalanello, Giacomo Pesce, Luis Delgado, Michael Duffy, Lisa Daly, James A Drohan, Richard Costarella, Terence Dougherty, Renee Legette, Kenneth Dunne, Laurie Dufek, Hilda Dunne, Michelle DiLoreto, Angela Cefalo, Guanghi Li, Theodore Cimino, Neil Ekblom, Stella Cortijo, James Donahue, Kelly Dillinger, Douglas Curtis, Peter Cole, Jason Dufek, Joseph D'Angelo, Richard DePaola, Balbina Cernadas, Joann Costarella, Peter Corazzi, Bashiek Collins, Rhoda Yin, Irene Dorf, Olga Churiy, Stanley Kornfeld, Brian Docherty, Peter Cefalo, Diana Dillinger, Anthony Casilla, Emillian Emeagwali, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, Xiu M. Chen, Margaret Edelman, Kevin Curtis, Michael Cruz, Terri Hoffman, Madeleine DiCicco, John Dimiceli, John Coughlin, Richard DiLoreto, Paul Dudek, Troy Dufek, Robert DiCicco, Joseph Dephillips, Christine Dougherty, James Derby, Leszek Cybulski, Iris Cruz, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Robert Catalanello, Ronald Erbel, Corinne DiPierro, Albert Cernadas, Valerie Derbyshire, Jane Eng, Vincent D'Antonio, Janine Crafa, Lydia Concepcion, Christopher Mouhlas, Patrick Emeagwali, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Clyde Dodds, Illona DiMiceli. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Xiu M. Chen; Madeleine DiCicco; Thomas S. Donohue; Theresa Donohue. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Office code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the Statement of Relatedness;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 13, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Donald Kelly, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Stanley Kornfeld, Julio Escalante, Terri Hoffman, Rhoda Yin, Patricia Samuel, Giacomo Pesce, Guanghi Li, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Renee Legette, Christopher Mouhlas added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Donald Kelly, Kelly O'Neill-Duffy, Stanley Kornfeld, Julio Escalante, Terri Hoffman, Rhoda Yin, Patricia Samuel, Giacomo Pesce, Guanghi Li, Maureen Jackman-DePaola, Renee Legette, Christopher Mouhlas. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Thomas Donahue, Luis Delgado, Terence Dougherty, Faye Dewitt, Neil Ekblom, Theresa Donahue, Richard DePaola, Joan Donahue, Ronald Erbel, James A Drohan, John Dolan, Vincent D'Antonio, Rene Escabi Segarra, Vincent Dupont, Clyde Dodds, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Christine Dougherty, Hilda Dunne, Frances Ekblom, Mark DiPierro, Diana Dillinger, Robert DiCicco, Laurie Dufek, Madeline DiCicco, Kelly Dillinger, Brian Docherty, Emillian Emeagwali, James Derby, John Dimiceli, Margaret Edelman, Michelle DiLoreto, Lisa Dudek, James Donahue, Troy Dufek, Kenneth Dunne, Corinne DiPierro, Lester Edelman, Robin Dufek, Irene Dorf, Michael Duffy, Patrick Emeagwali, Illona DiMiceli, Jason Dufek, Victoria Discon, Richard DiLoreto, Albert Deangelis, Joseph Dephillips, Jane Eng, Valerie Derbyshire, Paul Dudek, Frederick Dufek added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Thomas Donahue, Luis Delgado, Terence Dougherty, Faye Dewitt, Neil Ekblom, Theresa Donahue, Richard DePaola, Joan Donahue, Ronald Erbel, James A Drohan, John Dolan, Vincent D'Antonio, Rene Escabi Segarra, Vincent Dupont, Clyde Dodds, Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner, Christine Dougherty, Hilda Dunne, Frances Ekblom, Mark DiPierro, Diana Dillinger, Robert DiCicco, Laurie Dufek, Madeline DiCicco, Kelly Dillinger, Brian Docherty, Emillian Emeagwali, James Derby, John Dimiceli, Margaret Edelman, Michelle DiLoreto, Lisa Dudek, James Donahue, Troy Dufek, Kenneth Dunne, Corinne DiPierro, Lester Edelman, Robin Dufek, Irene Dorf, Michael Duffy, Patrick Emeagwali, Illona DiMiceli, Jason Dufek, Victoria Discon, Richard DiLoreto, Albert Deangelis, Joseph Dephillips, Jane Eng, Valerie Derbyshire, Paul Dudek, Frederick Dufek. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Anthony Compoccia, Kevin Daly, Fred Cohen, Iris Cruz, John Coughlin, Nina Cerfolio, Kevin Curtis, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, Aida Cruz, Lydia Concepcion, Albert Cernadas, Janine Crafa, Michael Cruz, Leszek Cybulski, Jean Cotroneo, Robert Catalanello, Richard Costarella, Angela Cefalo, Douglas Curtis, Bashiek Collins, Joseph D'Angelo, Stella Cortijo, Peter Cole, Peter Corazzi, Theodore Cimino, Balbina Cernadas, Peter Cefalo, Olga Churiy, Walter Chrynwski, Pamela Cleaves, Joann Costarella, Lisa Daly, Zhen Jun Chen, Xiu Mei Chen, Elizabeth D'Angelo added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Anthony Compoccia, Kevin Daly, Fred Cohen, Iris Cruz, John Coughlin, Nina Cerfolio, Kevin Curtis, Myrta M Chico-Acevedo, Aida Cruz, Lydia Concepcion, Albert Cernadas, Janine Crafa, Michael Cruz, Leszek Cybulski, Jean Cotroneo, Robert Catalanello, Richard Costarella, Angela Cefalo, Douglas Curtis, Bashiek Collins, Joseph D'Angelo, Stella Cortijo, Peter Cole, Peter Corazzi, Theodore Cimino, Balbina Cernadas, Peter Cefalo, Olga Churiy, Walter Chrynwski, Pamela Cleaves, Joann Costarella, Lisa Daly, Zhen Jun Chen, Xiu Mei Chen, Elizabeth D'Angelo. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Brenda Catalanello added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Brenda Catalanello. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MD1570. Document filed by Anthony Casilla.(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/14/2018 (jgo).
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/14/2018 (jgo).
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16048803)Document filed by Anthony Casilla. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/14/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casilla et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Delgado
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Samuel
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhen Jun Chen
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Derbyshire
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dudek
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline DiCicco
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Cefalo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhoda Yin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cruz
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Compoccia
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard DiLoreto
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard DePaola
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly O'Neill-Duffy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Curtis
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Dufek
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Jackman-DePaola
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Chrynwski
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Dodds
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illona DiMiceli
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Cerfolio
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Dufek
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Discon
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Crafa
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Legette
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Deangelis
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert DiCicco
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Derby
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Curtis
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Churiy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Dunne
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle DiLoreto
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark DiPierro
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Daly
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Cotroneo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Kelly
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Dunne
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Catalanello
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guanghi Li
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Donahue
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Cleaves
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Dufek
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Edelman
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Donahue
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Concepcion
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Dufek
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinne DiPierro
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Erbel
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emillian Emeagwali
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Emeagwali
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balbina Cernadas
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Dewitt
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bashiek Collins
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cefalo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Cohen
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Cortijo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leszek Cybulski
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dephillips
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth D'Angelo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Costarella
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Cernadas
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Ekblom
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Catalanello
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Edelman
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Donahue
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Daly
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph D'Angelo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Ekblom
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Duffy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Dupont
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mouhlas
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Escalante
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiu Mei Chen
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Corazzi
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aida Cruz
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Dougherty
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilhelmina Davis-Skinner
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Docherty
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Cimino
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giacomo Pesce
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent D'Antonio
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Casilla
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Costarella
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.G.T. John Dolan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Donahue
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Coughlin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Hoffman
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Dillinger
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Kornfeld
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Dorf
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Escabi Segarra
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Dillinger
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Eng
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Cole
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Cruz
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Dufek
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Dudek
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Dougherty
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrta M Chico-Acevedo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dimiceli
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Drohan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeleine DiCicco
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiu M. Chen
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Donohue
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S. Donohue
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?