Tucker v. Alexander Gray Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Henry Tucker
Defendant: Alexander Gray Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11680
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Alexander Gray Associates, LLC served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Doughtery, Agent. Document filed by Henry Tucker. (Mizrahi, Joseph)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexander Gray Associates, LLC. (pne)
December 14, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 14, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexander Gray Associates, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Henry Tucker. (Mizrahi, Joseph)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mizrahi, Joseph)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexander Gray Associates, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16052415)Document filed by Henry Tucker.(Mizrahi, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Alexander Gray Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Gray Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Tucker
Represented By: Joseph H Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?