Onatolu v. The People of The State of New York
Plaintiff: Adkunle A Onatolu
Defendant: The People of The State of New York
Case Number: 1:2018cv11704
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Adkunle A Onatolu were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
January 24, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #6 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #3 Order of Dismissal, #4 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint). Document filed by Adkunle A Onatolu. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP). (tp)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Document filed by Adkunle A Onatolu.(tp)
December 14, 2018 Mailed a copy of #3 Order of Dismissal, #4 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to Adkunle A Onatolu 217 S 12th Avenue Mount Vernon, NY 10550 with Right to Appeal Forms Attached. (aea)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued December 14, 2018, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that under the July 9, 2015 order in Onatolu v. U.S. Army, No. 15-CV-2829 (LAP) (S.D.N.Y. July 9, 2015), the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/14/2018) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 14, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jwh)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651: On July 9, 2015, Plaintiff was barred from filing any new action in forma pauperis (IFP) without first obtaining from the Court leave to file. See Onatolu v. U.S. Army, No. 15-CV-2829 (LAP) (S.D.N.Y. July 9, 2015). Plaintiff files this new pro se case, seeks IFP status, and has not sought leave from the Court. This action is therefore dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the July 9, 2015 order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/14/2018) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (ks)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against The People of The State of New York. Document filed by Adkunle A Onatolu. (ks)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Adkunle A Onatolu. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onatolu v. The People of The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adkunle A Onatolu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?