Silian Ventures LLC v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: Silian Ventures LLC
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, in its individual capacity and as Trustee for the Covered Trusts and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 1:2018cv11763
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: THEREFORE, the parties hereby stipulate and agree that BNYM shall have up to and including February 22, 2019, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. (The Bank of New York Mellon(as trustee for the Covered Trusts) answer due 2/22/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/5/2019) (jca)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon(as trustee for the Covered Trusts). (Ingber, Matthew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher James Houpt on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon(as trustee for the Covered Trusts), The Bank of New York Mellon(in its individual capacity). (Houpt, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon(as trustee for the Covered Trusts), The Bank of New York Mellon(in its individual capacity).(Ingber, Matthew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew D. Ingber on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon(as trustee for the Covered Trusts), The Bank of New York Mellon(in its individual capacity). (Ingber, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT AND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, the parties hereby stipulate and agree as follows: 1. BNYM hereby authorizes Mayer Brown to accept, and Mayer Brown does accept, service of the Complaint on its behalf. 2. BNYM shall have up to and including February 1, 2019, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. (The Bank of New York Mellon(as trustee for the Covered Trusts) answer due 2/1/2019; The Bank of New York Mellon(in its individual capacity) answer due 2/1/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/10/2019) (jca)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Silian Ventures LLC. (Pickhardt, Jonathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neil Thomas Phillips on behalf of Silian Ventures LLC. (Phillips, Neil)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Blair Alexander Adams on behalf of Silian Ventures LLC. (Adams, Blair)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maaren Alia Shah on behalf of Silian Ventures LLC. (Shah, Maaren)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial pretrial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Thursday, April 18, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, new York, and as further set forth in this Order. Initial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/18/2018) (kv)
December 17, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents The Bank of New York Mellon added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Silian Ventures LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Pickhardt, Jonathan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Bank of New York Mellon. (pc)
December 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
December 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
December 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Pickhardt. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $76,000,000; County code Delaware;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $75,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
December 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Pickhardt re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add The Bank of New York Mellon with the party text "as trustee for the Covered Trusts" to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
December 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Pickhardt. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Bank of New York Mellon, in its individual capacity and as Trustee for the Covered Trusts. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 15, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pickhardt, Jonathan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Silian Ventures LLC.(Pickhardt, Jonathan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Bank of New York Mellon, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Silian Ventures LLC. (Pickhardt, Jonathan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Bank of New York Mellon, in its individual capacity and as Trustee for the Covered Trusts. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16060890)Document filed by Silian Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pickhardt, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silian Ventures LLC v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, in its individual capacity and as Trustee for the Covered Trusts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Christopher James Houpt
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silian Ventures LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Pickhardt
Represented By: Neil Thomas Phillips
Represented By: Maaren Alia Shah
Represented By: Blair Alexander Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?