Bouattoura et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Bullette, James Bruno, Virginia Canady, Paul Coniglio, Shontay Campbell, Keith Brooks, Paul Clarke, Jerry Cohen, Robert Cooper, Deborah Burns, Brenda Carrion, John Churillo, Donald Brennan, Herbert Butler, Lorraine Carter, Anthony Brooks, Sharon Bykerk-Lonergan, Joseph Byrd, James Carney, Michael C Collins, Philip Ciambriello, Cynthia Clarke, Ian Cantor, Larry Clayton, Christopher Coffey, Jimmy Chin, John Brady, Joann Cepeda, Kyle Coles, Frank Cadicamo, Domenica Canterino, Thomas M Campo, Janice Chou, John Conway, Jennifer Carter, Carlos Cardona, Valentine Joseph Cassotta, Patricia Brawer, Dennis L Carrigan, Abbie L Clavio, Walton Claxton, Delores Cloud, Frank Cassara, Ruth Bowman, Adriana Ciancio, Jayvonia Brinkley, Veta Brome, Brian Clarke, Nellie Bray, Shonda Cephas, Kevin Burger, Lorraine Carlozzi, Xiao Mei Cai, Ieisha S Brown, Kenneth Cicala, Victor Cahill, Audrey Brown, Raoul Coquereau, Blanca Cap, Albert Camacho, Akila Bouattoura, Marie Cerchero, Daniel Civinski, Christine Brass, James Cassidy, Roman Brackman, Renee Brown, Nifrael Bujaj, German Castro, Anthony Christakos, Reuven Cohen, James Cicchetti, Annette Brown, Adriana Cires, Rolando Colombani, Walfredo Castillo, Lillie Brown, Lester Breisblatt, Charmane Collins, Phyllis Carter, Orlando Cales, Franklin Cooper, Chandra Calhoun-Neverson, Luciano Coppa, Marianne Buttiglieri, Celeste Carrasco, Carmen Cancel, Nancy Brennan, Vincent Caprio, Jazmin Conti, Herbert Bromberg, Annamaria Colecchia, Stephanie Conti, Angela Chan, Don Brown, Clemente Brathwaite, Nora Connor, John Clementi, Suilin W Chan and Nicholas Carcich
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11772
Filed: December 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (sj)
December 17, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
December 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the related case statement was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
December 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
December 15, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Akila Bouattoura, Ruth Bowman, Roman Brackman, John Brady, Christine Brass, Clemente Brathwaite, Patricia Brawer, Nellie Bray, Lester Breisblatt, Donald Brennan, Nancy Brennan, Jayvonia Brinkley, Herbert Bromberg, Veta Brome, Anthony Brooks, Keith Brooks, Annette Brown, Audrey Brown, Don Brown, Ieisha S Brown, Lillie Brown, Renee Brown, James Bruno, Nifrael Bujaj, Jacqueline Bullette, Kevin Burger, Deborah Burns, Herbert Butler, Marianne Buttiglieri, Sharon Bykerk-Lonergan, Joseph Byrd, Frank Cadicamo, Victor Cahill, Xiao Mei Cai, Orlando Cales, Chandra Calhoun-Neverson, Albert Camacho, Shontay Campbell, Thomas M Campo, Virginia Canady, Carmen Cancel, Domenica Canterino, Ian Cantor, Blanca Cap, Vincent Caprio, Nicholas Carcich, Carlos Cardona, Lorraine Carlozzi, James Carney, Celeste Carrasco, Dennis L Carrigan, Brenda Carrion, Jennifer Carter, Lorraine Carter, Phyllis Carter, Frank Cassara, James Cassidy, Valentine Joseph Cassotta, Walfredo Castillo, German Castro, Joann Cepeda, Shonda Cephas, Marie Cerchero, Angela Chan, Suilin W Chan, Jimmy Chin, Janice Chou, Anthony Christakos, John Churillo, Philip Ciambriello, Adriana Ciancio, Kenneth Cicala, James Cicchetti, Adriana Cires, Daniel Civinski, Brian Clarke, Cynthia Clarke, Paul Clarke, Abbie L Clavio, Walton Claxton, Larry Clayton, John Clementi, Delores Cloud, Christopher Coffey, Jerry Cohen, Reuven Cohen, Annamaria Colecchia, Kyle Coles, Charmane Collins, Michael C Collins, Rolando Colombani, Paul Coniglio, Nora Connor, Jazmin Conti, Stephanie Conti, John Conway, Franklin Cooper, Robert Cooper, Luciano Coppa, Raoul Coquereau. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 15, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/15/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-MD-1570 Action. Document filed by Akila Bouattoura, Ruth Bowman, Roman Brackman, John Brady, Christine Brass, Clemente Brathwaite, Patricia Brawer, Nellie Bray, Lester Breisblatt, Donald Brennan, Nancy Brennan, Jayvonia Brinkley, Herbert Bromberg, Veta Brome, Anthony Brooks, Keith Brooks, Annette Brown, Audrey Brown, Don Brown, Ieisha S Brown, Lillie Brown, Renee Brown, James Bruno, Nifrael Bujaj, Jacqueline Bullette, Kevin Burger, Deborah Burns, Herbert Butler, Marianne Buttiglieri, Sharon Bykerk-Lonergan, Joseph Byrd, Frank Cadicamo, Victor Cahill, Xiao Mei Cai, Orlando Cales, Chandra Calhoun-Neverson, Albert Camacho, Shontay Campbell, Thomas M Campo, Virginia Canady, Carmen Cancel, Domenica Canterino, Ian Cantor, Blanca Cap, Vincent Caprio, Nicholas Carcich, Carlos Cardona, Lorraine Carlozzi, James Carney, Celeste Carrasco, Dennis L Carrigan, Brenda Carrion, Jennifer Carter, Lorraine Carter, Phyllis Carter, Frank Cassara, James Cassidy, Valentine Joseph Cassotta, Walfredo Castillo, German Castro, Joann Cepeda, Shonda Cephas, Marie Cerchero, Angela Chan, Suilin W Chan, Jimmy Chin, Janice Chou, Anthony Christakos, John Churillo, Philip Ciambriello, Adriana Ciancio, Kenneth Cicala, James Cicchetti, Adriana Cires, Daniel Civinski, Brian Clarke, Cynthia Clarke, Paul Clarke, Abbie L Clavio, Walton Claxton, Larry Clayton, John Clementi, Delores Cloud, Christopher Coffey, Jerry Cohen, Reuven Cohen, Annamaria Colecchia, Kyle Coles, Charmane Collins, Michael C Collins, Rolando Colombani, Paul Coniglio, Nora Connor, Jazmin Conti, Stephanie Conti, John Conway, Franklin Cooper, Robert Cooper, Luciano Coppa, Raoul Coquereau.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 15, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/15/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-MD-1570 Action. Document filed by Akila Bouattoura, Ruth Bowman, Roman Brackman, John Brady, Christine Brass, Clemente Brathwaite, Patricia Brawer, Nellie Bray, Lester Breisblatt, Donald Brennan, Nancy Brennan, Jayvonia Brinkley, Herbert Bromberg, Veta Brome, Anthony Brooks, Keith Brooks, Annette Brown, Audrey Brown, Don Brown, Ieisha S Brown, Lillie Brown, Renee Brown, James Bruno, Nifrael Bujaj, Jacqueline Bullette, Kevin Burger, Deborah Burns, Herbert Butler, Marianne Buttiglieri, Sharon Bykerk-Lonergan, Joseph Byrd, Frank Cadicamo, Victor Cahill, Xiao Mei Cai, Orlando Cales, Chandra Calhoun-Neverson, Albert Camacho, Shontay Campbell, Thomas M Campo, Virginia Canady, Carmen Cancel, Domenica Canterino, Ian Cantor, Blanca Cap, Vincent Caprio, Nicholas Carcich, Carlos Cardona, Lorraine Carlozzi, James Carney, Celeste Carrasco, Dennis L Carrigan, Brenda Carrion, Jennifer Carter, Lorraine Carter, Phyllis Carter, Frank Cassara, James Cassidy, Valentine Joseph Cassotta, Walfredo Castillo, German Castro, Joann Cepeda, Shonda Cephas, Marie Cerchero, Angela Chan, Suilin W Chan, Jimmy Chin, Janice Chou, Anthony Christakos, John Churillo, Philip Ciambriello, Adriana Ciancio, Kenneth Cicala, James Cicchetti, Adriana Cires, Daniel Civinski, Brian Clarke, Cynthia Clarke, Paul Clarke, Abbie L Clavio, Walton Claxton, Larry Clayton, John Clementi, Delores Cloud, Christopher Coffey, Jerry Cohen, Reuven Cohen, Annamaria Colecchia, Kyle Coles, Charmane Collins, Michael C Collins, Rolando Colombani, Paul Coniglio, Nora Connor, Jazmin Conti, Stephanie Conti, John Conway, Franklin Cooper, Robert Cooper, Luciano Coppa, Raoul Coquereau.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 15, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS - SIGNATURE ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MD-1570. Document filed by Akila Bouattoura, Ruth Bowman, Roman Brackman, John Brady, Christine Brass, Clemente Brathwaite, Patricia Brawer, Nellie Bray, Lester Breisblatt, Donald Brennan, Nancy Brennan, Jayvonia Brinkley, Herbert Bromberg, Veta Brome, Anthony Brooks, Keith Brooks, Annette Brown, Audrey Brown, Don Brown, Ieisha S Brown, Lillie Brown, Renee Brown, James Bruno, Nifrael Bujaj, Jacqueline Bullette, Kevin Burger, Deborah Burns, Herbert Butler, Marianne Buttiglieri, Sharon Bykerk-Lonergan, Joseph Byrd, Frank Cadicamo, Victor Cahill, Xiao Mei Cai, Orlando Cales, Chandra Calhoun-Neverson, Albert Camacho, Shontay Campbell, Thomas M Campo, Virginia Canady, Carmen Cancel, Domenica Canterino, Ian Cantor, Blanca Cap, Vincent Caprio, Nicholas Carcich, Carlos Cardona, Lorraine Carlozzi, James Carney, Celeste Carrasco, Dennis L Carrigan, Brenda Carrion, Jennifer Carter, Lorraine Carter, Phyllis Carter, Frank Cassara, James Cassidy, Valentine Joseph Cassotta, Walfredo Castillo, German Castro, Joann Cepeda, Shonda Cephas, Marie Cerchero, Angela Chan, Suilin W Chan, Jimmy Chin, Janice Chou, Anthony Christakos, John Churillo, Philip Ciambriello, Adriana Ciancio, Kenneth Cicala, James Cicchetti, Adriana Cires, Daniel Civinski, Brian Clarke, Cynthia Clarke, Paul Clarke, Abbie L Clavio, Walton Claxton, Larry Clayton, John Clementi, Delores Cloud, Christopher Coffey, Jerry Cohen, Reuven Cohen, Annamaria Colecchia, Kyle Coles, Charmane Collins, Michael C Collins, Rolando Colombani, Paul Coniglio, Nora Connor, Jazmin Conti, Stephanie Conti, John Conway, Franklin Cooper, Robert Cooper, Luciano Coppa, Raoul Coquereau.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin) Modified on 12/17/2018 (sj).
December 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16061294)Document filed by Victor Cahill, Frank Cadicamo, Michael C Collins, Marie Cerchero, Audrey Brown, Adriana Ciancio, Patricia Brawer, Walton Claxton, Kevin Burger, Luciano Coppa, Annette Brown, Kenneth Cicala, Anthony Brooks, Blanca Cap, Jennifer Carter, Christopher Coffey, Adriana Cires, Deborah Burns, Stephanie Conti, James Cassidy, Joann Cepeda, Don Brown, Paul Coniglio, Charmane Collins, Donald Brennan, Joseph Byrd, Orlando Cales, Nancy Brennan, Rolando Colombani, Brian Clarke, Lorraine Carlozzi, Annamaria Colecchia, Nora Connor, Paul Clarke, Suilin W Chan, Marianne Buttiglieri, Celeste Carrasco, Thomas M Campo, Angela Chan, Franklin Cooper, Valentine Joseph Cassotta, Carmen Cancel, Jayvonia Brinkley, Keith Brooks, Larry Clayton, Brenda Carrion, German Castro, Frank Cassara, James Cicchetti, Jimmy Chin, Vincent Caprio, Reuven Cohen, Cynthia Clarke, Lillie Brown, Shonda Cephas, Phyllis Carter, Janice Chou, Philip Ciambriello, Anthony Christakos, Ruth Bowman, Renee Brown, Akila Bouattoura, Kyle Coles, Sharon Bykerk-Lonergan, Raoul Coquereau, John Clementi, Jacqueline Bullette, Herbert Butler, Delores Cloud, Daniel Civinski, Virginia Canady, Veta Brome, John Churillo, Walfredo Castillo, James Carney, Nifrael Bujaj, Lorraine Carter, Abbie L Clavio, Ieisha S Brown, Domenica Canterino, Nicholas Carcich, James Bruno, Herbert Bromberg, John Conway, Clemente Brathwaite, Jerry Cohen, Roman Brackman, Chandra Calhoun-Neverson, Jazmin Conti, Lester Breisblatt, Dennis L Carrigan, Carlos Cardona, Nellie Bray, Shontay Campbell, Robert Cooper, John Brady, Xiao Mei Cai, Albert Camacho, Ian Cantor, Christine Brass. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouattoura et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Bullette
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bruno
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Canady
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Coniglio
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shontay Campbell
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Brooks
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Clarke
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Cohen
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cooper
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Burns
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Carrion
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Churillo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Brennan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Butler
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Carter
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brooks
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Bykerk-Lonergan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Byrd
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carney
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C Collins
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Ciambriello
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Clarke
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Cantor
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Clayton
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Coffey
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Chin
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brady
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Cepeda
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Coles
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Cadicamo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domenica Canterino
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M Campo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Chou
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Conway
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Carter
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Cardona
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentine Joseph Cassotta
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Brawer
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis L Carrigan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbie L Clavio
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walton Claxton
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Cloud
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Cassara
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Bowman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Ciancio
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayvonia Brinkley
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veta Brome
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Clarke
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Bray
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonda Cephas
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Burger
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Carlozzi
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiao Mei Cai
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ieisha S Brown
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Cicala
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Cahill
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Brown
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raoul Coquereau
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Cap
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Camacho
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akila Bouattoura
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Cerchero
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Civinski
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Brass
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cassidy
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Brackman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Brown
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nifrael Bujaj
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Castro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Christakos
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuven Cohen
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cicchetti
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Brown
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Cires
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Colombani
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walfredo Castillo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Brown
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Breisblatt
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmane Collins
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Carter
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Cales
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Cooper
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Calhoun-Neverson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luciano Coppa
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Buttiglieri
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Carrasco
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Cancel
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Brennan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Caprio
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazmin Conti
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Bromberg
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annamaria Colecchia
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Conti
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Chan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Brown
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clemente Brathwaite
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Connor
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Clementi
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suilin W Chan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Carcich
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?