Rix et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Patrick Stranzl, John D. Snow, William Schumacher, John F. Taylor, Steve Slabodski, Bruce Smith, Richard Roeill, Conrad Tinney, Daniel Tegano, Edward Santore, Dean Stephan, George J. Tripptree, Mark Schweighardt, Nicholas Schwartz, Eugene Slabodski, Patricia Stines, Richard Shannon, Oscar Thompson, Kevin Scanlon, Anthony Rucco, David Russell, Martin Tighe, Jason Spiller, James Sandas, Tamara Smith, Max Steinbach, Gary R. Sims, Frank Santonastaso, Kevin F. Sullivan, Sr., Craig Santandrea, Gerard Suden, Robert A. Scalia, Peter Sciurca, David J. Sperandeo, Robert Russo, Peter Scarlatos, Kenneth G. Scheich, Gerard Roche, Gerald A. Sweeney, Lloyd A. Sherman, Thomas Rogers, Robert Sosa, Matthew J. Taylor, Michael V. Singer, Gregory Scott, Joseph Sangiorgio, Kathryn Stanley, Eugene Schramm, Michael Schnugg, William Rix, Joseph L. Sciurca, Gregory Sarne, Arthur Schwab, Christine Santamaria, Ira Thorner, Jeremiah Ryan, Phillip Sabella, Brian Spisto, Thomas Tommaso, Jeff Scherer, Stanley Rybak, Robert Traver, Wayne Trivelli, William Rosenbaum, Roberto Santos, Michael A. Saccomanno, Daniel J. Sweeney, Charles Rojas, Ricky Scott, Diane Seitz, Raymond M. Seeley, Warren Terry, Eric Szillus, Frank Ryan, Kevin Stumpf, Alfred Trinidad, James Silecchia, Louis Rocco, William Scanlan, Ronaldo L. Robledo, Thomas A. Sullivan, John Senica, Carmen L. Sepulveda, Miguel Ruiz, Richard S. Roccabruna, Michael P. Ryan, Leon Stephenson, Ann Schlagel, Conrad Theiss, III, Jose Saenz, Evan Steinert, Philip Ruvolo, Hans Taylor, John Scaltro, Christopher Traumer, William Stupnikov, Kevin Spillane, Robert Stiehl, Robert Serra, David Rowan, Eugene Slobodski and Steve Slobodski
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11798
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by John Senica; John Scaltro; Robert A. Scalia; Phillip Sabella; Richard Roeill; Christine Santamaria; Robert Serra; Robert Stiehl; Jeremiah Ryan; Kevin Stumpf; Dean Stephan; Philip Ruvolo; Nicholas Schwartz; Craig Santandrea; Martin Tighe; Patricia Stines; Stanley Rybak; Kevin F. Sullivan, Sr; Gerard Suden; Michael V. Singer; Steve Slobodski; Ira Thorner; William Rosenbaum; Gregory Sarne; Thomas Tommaso; Kevin Scanlon; Kathryn Stanley; David Rowan; Leon Stephenson; Richard Shannon; Gregory Scott; Christopher Traumer; Evan Steinert; Edward Santore; Alfred Trinidad; Hans Taylor; Thomas A. Sullivan; Gerald A. Sweeney; Raymond M. Seeley; Ann Schlagel; Daniel J. Sweeney; Eugene Schramm; Anthony Rucco; Max Steinbach; Robert Russo; William Stupnikov; Jason Spiller; Mark Schweighardt; Michael P. Ryan; Robert Sosa; Warren Terry; Wayne Trivelli; William Rix ; Frank Ryan; Conrad Tinney; Roberto Santos; Joseph Sangiorgio; Bruce Smith; Frank Santonastaso; Michael Schnugg; David Russell; Carmen L. Sepulveda; David J. Sperandeo; Tamara Smith; Ricky Scott; John F. Taylor; James Sandas; Eric Szillus; Oscar Thompson; John D. Snow; Daniel Tegano; George J. Tripptree; Brian Spisto; Michael A. Saccomanno; William Schumacher; Joseph L. Sciurca; Jose Saenz; Miguel Ruiz; Patrick Stranzl; Gerard Roche; Gary R. Sims; Ronaldo L. Robledo; Peter Scarlatos; Kevin Spillane; Robert Traver; Charles Rojas; Diane Seitz; Eugene Slobodski; Peter Sciurca; Thomas Rogers; Jeff Scherer; Richard S. Roccabruna; William Scanlan; Conrad Theiss, III; Kenneth G. Scheich; Arthur Schwab; Lloyd A. Sherman; Matthew J. Taylor; Louis Rocco; James Silecchia. (Kreindler, James)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Richard S. Roccabruna, William Rix, Ronaldo L. Robledo, Louis Rocco, Gerard Roche, Richard Roeill, Thomas Rogers, Charles Rojas, William Rosenbaum, David Rowan, Anthony Rucco, Miguel Ruiz, David Russell, Robert Russo, Philip Ruvolo, Frank Ryan, Jeremiah Ryan, Michael P. Ryan, Stanley Rybak, Phillip Sabella, Michael A. Saccomanno, Jose Saenz, James Sandas, Joseph Sangiorgio, Christine Santamaria, Craig Santandrea, Frank Santonastaso, Edward Santore, Roberto Santos, Gregory Sarne, Robert A. Scalia, John Scaltro, William Scanlan, Kevin Scanlon, Peter Scarlatos, Kenneth G. Scheich, Jeff Scherer, Ann Schlagel, Michael Schnugg, Eugene Schramm, William Schumacher, Arthur Schwab, Nicholas Schwartz, Mark Schweighardt, Joseph L. Sciurca, Peter Sciurca, Gregory Scott, Ricky Scott, Raymond M. Seeley, Diane Seitz, John Senica, Carmen L. Sepulveda, Robert Serra, Richard Shannon, Lloyd A. Sherman, James Silecchia, Gary R. Sims, Michael V. Singer, Eugene Slobodski, Steve Slobodski, Bruce Smith, Tamara Smith, John D. Snow, Robert Sosa, David J. Sperandeo, Kevin Spillane, Jason Spiller, Brian Spisto, Kathryn Stanley, Max Steinbach, Evan Steinert, Dean Stephan, Leon Stephenson, Robert Stiehl, Patricia Stines, Patrick Stranzl, Kevin Stumpf, William Stupnikov, Gerard Suden, Thomas A. Sullivan, Kevin F. Sullivan, Sr, Daniel J. Sweeney, Gerald A. Sweeney, Eric Szillus, Hans Taylor, John F. Taylor, Matthew J. Taylor, Daniel Tegano, Warren Terry, Conrad Theiss, III, Oscar Thompson, Ira Thorner, Martin Tighe, Conrad Tinney, Thomas Tommaso, Christopher Traumer, Robert Traver, Alfred Trinidad, George J. Tripptree, Wayne Trivelli.(Rose, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by John Senica, John Scaltro, Robert A. Scalia, Phillip Sabella, Richard Roeill, Christine Santamaria, Robert Serra, Robert Stiehl, Jeremiah Ryan, Kevin Stumpf, Dean Stephan, Philip Ruvolo, Nicholas Schwartz, Craig Santandrea, Martin Tighe, Patricia Stines, Stanley Rybak, Kevin F. Sullivan, Sr, Gerard Suden, Michael V. Singer, Steve Slobodski, Ira Thorner, William Rosenbaum, Gregory Sarne, Thomas Tommaso, Kevin Scanlon, Kathryn Stanley, David Rowan, Leon Stephenson, Richard Shannon, Gregory Scott, Christopher Traumer, Evan Steinert, Edward Santore, Alfred Trinidad, Hans Taylor, Thomas A. Sullivan, Gerald A. Sweeney, Raymond M. Seeley, Ann Schlagel, Daniel J. Sweeney, Eugene Schramm, Anthony Rucco, Max Steinbach, Robert Russo, William Stupnikov, Jason Spiller, Mark Schweighardt, Michael P. Ryan, Robert Sosa, Warren Terry, Wayne Trivelli, William Rix, Frank Ryan, Conrad Tinney, Roberto Santos, Joseph Sangiorgio, Bruce Smith, Frank Santonastaso, Michael Schnugg, David Russell, Carmen L. Sepulveda, David J. Sperandeo, Tamara Smith, Ricky Scott, John F. Taylor, James Sandas, Eric Szillus, Oscar Thompson, John D. Snow, Daniel Tegano, George J. Tripptree, Brian Spisto, Michael A. Saccomanno, William Schumacher, Joseph L. Sciurca, Jose Saenz, Miguel Ruiz, Patrick Stranzl, Gerard Roche, Gary R. Sims, Ronaldo L. Robledo, Peter Scarlatos, Kevin Spillane, Robert Traver, Charles Rojas, Diane Seitz, Eugene Slobodski, Peter Sciurca, Thomas Rogers, Jeff Scherer, Richard S. Roccabruna, William Scanlan, Conrad Theiss, III, Kenneth G. Scheich, Arthur Schwab, Lloyd A. Sherman, Matthew J. Taylor, Louis Rocco, James Silecchia. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Rose, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Daniel O. Rose to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel O. Rose to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel O. Rose. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Eugene Slobodski; Steve Slobodski. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Richard S. Roccabruna, William Rix, Ronaldo L. Robledo, Louis Rocco, Gerard Roche, Richard Roeill, Thomas Rogers, Charles Rojas, William Rosenbaum, David Rowan, Anthony Rucco, Miguel Ruiz, David Russell, Robert Russo, Philip Ruvolo, Frank Ryan, Jeremiah Ryan, Michael P. Ryan, Stanley Rybak, Phillip Sabella, Michael A. Saccomanno, Jose Saenz, James Sandas, Joseph Sangiorgio, Christine Santamaria, Craig Santandrea, Frank Santonastaso, Edward Santore, Roberto Santos, Gregory Sarne, Robert A. Scalia, John Scaltro, William Scanlan, Kevin Scanlon, Peter Scarlatos, Kenneth G. Scheich, Jeff Scherer, Ann Schlagel, Michael Schnugg, Eugene Schramm, William Schumacher, Arthur Schwab, Nicholas Schwartz, Mark Schweighardt, Joseph L. Sciurca, Peter Sciurca, Gregory Scott, Ricky Scott, Raymond M. Seeley, Diane Seitz, John Senica, Carmen L. Sepulveda, Robert Serra, Richard Shannon, Lloyd A. Sherman, James Silecchia, Gary R. Sims, Michael V. Singer, Eugene Slabodski, Steve Slabodski, Bruce Smith, Tamara Smith, John D. Snow, Robert Sosa, David J. Sperandeo, Kevin Spillane, Jason Spiller, Brian Spisto, Kathryn Stanley, Max Steinbach, Evan Steinert, Dean Stephan, Leon Stephenson, Robert Stiehl, Patricia Stines, Patrick Stranzl, Kevin Stumpf, William Stupnikov, Gerard Suden, Thomas A. Sullivan, Kevin F. Sullivan, Sr, Daniel J. Sweeney, Gerald A. Sweeney, Eric Szillus, Hans Taylor, John F. Taylor, Matthew J. Taylor, Daniel Tegano, Warren Terry, Conrad Theiss, III, Oscar Thompson, Ira Thorner, Martin Tighe, Conrad Tinney, Thomas Tommaso, Christopher Traumer, Robert Traver, Alfred Trinidad, George J. Tripptree, Wayne Trivelli.(Rose, Daniel) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jgo).
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rose, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by John Scaltro, Robert A. Scalia, Phillip Sabella, Richard Roeill, Christine Santamaria, Jeremiah Ryan, Philip Ruvolo, Nicholas Schwartz, Craig Santandrea, Stanley Rybak, William Rosenbaum, Gregory Sarne, Kevin Scanlon, David Rowan, Gregory Scott, Edward Santore, Raymond M. Seeley, Ann Schlagel, Eugene Schramm, Anthony Rucco, Robert Russo, Mark Schweighardt, Michael P. Ryan, William Rix, Frank Ryan, Roberto Santos, Joseph Sangiorgio, Frank Santonastaso, Michael Schnugg, David Russell, Ricky Scott, James Sandas, Michael A. Saccomanno, William Schumacher, Joseph L. Sciurca, Jose Saenz, Miguel Ruiz, Gerard Roche, Ronaldo L. Robledo, Peter Scarlatos, Charles Rojas, Diane Seitz, Peter Sciurca, Thomas Rogers, Jeff Scherer, Richard S. Roccabruna, William Scanlan, Kenneth G. Scheich, Arthur Schwab, Louis Rocco, Patrick Stranzl, Richard Shannon, Gerard Suden, Eugene Slabodski, Thomas Tommaso, Patricia Stines, Lloyd A. Sherman, Robert Stiehl, George J. Tripptree, Thomas A. Sullivan, Dean Stephan, John Senica, Wayne Trivelli, Oscar Thompson, Evan Steinert, Carmen L. Sepulveda, William Stupnikov, Warren Terry, Conrad Tinney, Brian Spisto, Tamara Smith, Bruce Smith, Hans Taylor, Steve Slabodski, Max Steinbach, John D. Snow, Christopher Traumer, Gary R. Sims, Martin Tighe, Kevin F. Sullivan, Sr, Robert Sosa, Leon Stephenson, Conrad Theiss, III, Matthew J. Taylor, Jason Spiller, Ira Thorner, John F. Taylor, Kevin Stumpf, Daniel Tegano, Robert Traver, Kevin Spillane, Eric Szillus, Kathryn Stanley, David J. Sperandeo, Robert Serra, James Silecchia, Alfred Trinidad, Daniel J. Sweeney, Michael V. Singer, Gerald A. Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Rose, Daniel) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jgo).
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16064241)Document filed by John Scaltro, Robert A. Scalia, Phillip Sabella, Richard Roeill, Christine Santamaria, Frank Ryan, William Rix, Jeremiah Ryan, Roberto Santos, Philip Ruvolo, Nicholas Schwartz, Craig Santandrea, Joseph Sangiorgio, Frank Santonastaso, Michael Schnugg, Stanley Rybak, David Russell, James Sandas, William Rosenbaum, Gregory Sarne, Kevin Scanlon, David Rowan, William Schumacher, Michael A. Saccomanno, Miguel Ruiz, Jose Saenz, Edward Santore, Gerard Roche, Ann Schlagel, Ronaldo L. Robledo, Peter Scarlatos, Charles Rojas, Eugene Schramm, Anthony Rucco, Robert Russo, Jeff Scherer, Thomas Rogers, William Scanlan, Mark Schweighardt, Kenneth G. Scheich, Arthur Schwab, Michael P. Ryan, Louis Rocco. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Rose, Daniel) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rix et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Stranzl
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Snow
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Schumacher
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Taylor
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Slabodski
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Smith
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Roeill
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Tinney
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Tegano
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Santore
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Stephan
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George J. Tripptree
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Schweighardt
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Schwartz
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Slabodski
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Stines
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Shannon
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Thompson
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Scanlon
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rucco
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Russell
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Tighe
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Spiller
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sandas
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Smith
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Steinbach
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary R. Sims
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Santonastaso
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin F. Sullivan, Sr.
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Santandrea
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Suden
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Scalia
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Sciurca
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Sperandeo
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Russo
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Scarlatos
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth G. Scheich
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Roche
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald A. Sweeney
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd A. Sherman
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Rogers
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sosa
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Taylor
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael V. Singer
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sangiorgio
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Stanley
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Schramm
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schnugg
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rix
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Sciurca
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sarne
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Schwab
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Santamaria
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Thorner
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Ryan
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Sabella
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Spisto
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tommaso
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Scherer
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Rybak
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Traver
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Trivelli
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rosenbaum
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Santos
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Saccomanno
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Sweeney
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rojas
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Scott
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Seitz
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond M. Seeley
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Terry
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Szillus
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ryan
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Stumpf
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Trinidad
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Silecchia
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Rocco
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Scanlan
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronaldo L. Robledo
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Sullivan
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Senica
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen L. Sepulveda
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Ruiz
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S. Roccabruna
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Ryan
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Stephenson
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Schlagel
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Theiss, III
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Saenz
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Steinert
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Ruvolo
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Taylor
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Scaltro
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Traumer
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stupnikov
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Spillane
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stiehl
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Serra
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rowan
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Slobodski
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Slobodski
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?