Abraham et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: James Mohan, Paul Adams, Robert McGrath, Pamela Carter, Paul Wewe, Mohammed Ali Sha, Michael O'Brien, Nelida Cruz, James O'Neill, Jr., Anthony Flammia, Adam Ashton, Marlando Williams, Michael Liporace, Kenneth Donohue, Diego Betancur, Thomas Tracy, Thomas Manning, Steven Farkas, Lawrence Rottkamp, Rodney Morris, Susan Arvanites, George Camacho, James Braunstein, Brian Thompson, Joseph Rivera, Kevin Boshell, Michael McCarroll, Louise Friscia, James Barrett, Keith Pommells, Dean Abruscato, Richard Cozzolino, Howard Lemkin, Thomas Ryan, Angel Rosado, Angela Bianco, Eligia Carradero, Wendy Mella-Mejia, Joseph Cooney, Michael Fitzpatrick, Thomas Carton, Roy Bell, Anthony Ubides, Inocencio Rivera, Joseph Anzalone, Donald Bruce, Michael Curley, Theodore Goldfarb, Carmen Anzalota, Angelo C. Charles-Pepe, Michael O'Donnell, Thomas McTigue, Raphael Fragola, Dennis Ditucci, Albert Troche, John Cookson, William Denis, Milton Gordon, James Leonard, Robert Abraham, Barbara Neidich, Carol Ginsburg, Mathew von Seydewitz, Robert Morgan, Thomas Willoughby, William Zuk, Clayton Othiossinir, Dyke Nikqi, Adele Verde, Joseph Vitto, Larry Stewart, John P. Ryan, Ciro Migliore, William Rendino, Antoinette Holley, Samuel Aizer, John Goetz, Richard Holmberg, James Cash, Jose R. Arias, William Kehoe, Edwin Webster, Robin Ormsby, Roseann Dorval-Penna, Jonantony Paese, John Cavelli, Patrick Carr, Vijaya Sinha, Mokhtar Mullaei, John Kiernan, Vincent Tesoriero, John Ryan, Denis McCarthy, William Hucks, Juan Martinez, Louis Depirro, Mario Marsich, Michael Contino, Joan Riche and Carlos Gonzalez
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11833
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by William Kehoe; Louis Depirro; William Denis; Pamela Carter; Carmen Anzalota; Michael Contino; Adele Verde; Thomas Tracy; Thomas McTigue; George Camacho; Michael Liporace; Juan Martinez; James Braunstein; John Cookson; Mario Marsich; Vincent Tesoriero; Albert Troche; Eligia Carradero; Lawrence Rottkamp; Raphael Fragola; Brian Thompson; James O'Neill, Jr.; Michael O'Brien; James Mohan; Vijaya Sinha; Adam Ashton; Michael Curley; Joan Riche; Kenneth Donohue; Theodore Goldfarb; James Barrett; John Goetz; William Zuk; Robert McGrath; Thomas Ryan; Marlando Williams; Ciro Migliore; Inocencio Rivera; Richard Holmberg; Richard Cozzolino; Paul Wewe; Joseph Vitto; Michael O'Donnell; Dyke Nikqi; Milton Gordon; Roy Bell; Howard Lemkin; Kevin Boshell; John Kiernan; Carol Ginsburg; Angel Rosado; Anthony Flammia; Patrick Carr; Jonantony Paese; Mohammed Ali Sha; William Hucks; Robert Abraham; Donald Bruce; Mathew von Seydewitz; Nelida Cruz; John Ryan; Angelo C. Charles-Pepe; Joseph Cooney; Barbara Neidich; Angela Bianco; Denis McCarthy; Anthony Ubides; Thomas Manning; Thomas Willoughby; John Cavelli; Louise Friscia; Clayton Othiossinir; Wendy Mella-Mejia; Robin Ormsby; Edwin Webster; Carlos Gonzalez; Robert Morgan; Thomas Carton; James Cash; Diego Betancur; Joseph Rivera; Keith Pommells; Joseph Anzalone; Antoinette Holley; Dean Abruscato; Roseann Dorval-Penna; James Leonard; Michael McCarroll; Mokhtar Mullaei; Susan Arvanites; Jose R. Arias; Michael Fitzpatrick; Paul Adams; Dennis Ditucci; Rodney Morris; Steven Farkas; John P. Ryan; William Rendino; Larry Stewart; Samuel Aizer. (Kreindler, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 19, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 19, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1570. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03 MDL 1570 (GBD) (SN). Document filed by Robert Abraham, Dean Abruscato, Paul Adams, Samuel Aizer, Joseph Anzalone, Carmen Anzalota, Jose R. Arias, Susan Arvanites, Adam Ashton, James Barrett, Roy Bell, Diego Betancur, Angela Bianco, Kevin Boshell, James Braunstein, Donald Bruce, George Camacho, Patrick Carr, Eligia Carradero, Pamela Carter, Thomas Carton, James Cash, John Cavelli, Angelo C. Charles-Pepe, Michael Contino, John Cookson, Joseph Cooney, Richard Cozzolino, Nelida Cruz, Michael Curley, William Denis, Louis Depirro, Dennis Ditucci, Kenneth Donohue, Roseann Dorval-Penna, Steven Farkas, Michael Fitzpatrick, Anthony Flammia, Raphael Fragola, Louise Friscia, Carol Ginsburg, John Goetz, Theodore Goldfarb, Carlos Gonzalez, Milton Gordon, Antoinette Holley, Richard Holmberg, William Hucks, William Kehoe, John Kiernan, Howard Lemkin, James Leonard, Michael Liporace, Thomas Manning, Mario Marsich, Juan Martinez, Michael McCarroll, Denis McCarthy, Robert McGrath, Thomas McTigue, Wendy Mella-Mejia, Ciro Migliore, James Mohan, Robert Morgan, Rodney Morris, Mokhtar Mullaei, Barbara Neidich, Dyke Nikqi, Michael O'Brien, Michael O'Donnell, James O'Neill, Jr., Robin Ormsby, Clayton Othiossinir, Jonantony Paese, Keith Pommells, William Rendino, Joan Riche, Inocencio Rivera, Joseph Rivera, Angel Rosado, Lawrence Rottkamp, John Ryan, John P. Ryan, Thomas Ryan, Mohammed Ali Sha, Vijaya Sinha, Larry Stewart, Vincent Tesoriero, Brian Thompson, Thomas Tracy, Albert Troche, Anthony Ubides, Adele Verde, Joseph Vitto, Edwin Webster, Paul Wewe, Marlando Williams, Thomas Willoughby, William Zuk, Mathew von Seydewitz.(Benett, Megan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Benett, Megan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16066689)Document filed by Louis Depirro, William Denis, Pamela Carter, Carmen Anzalota, Michael Contino, George Camacho, James Braunstein, John Cookson, Eligia Carradero, Adam Ashton, Michael Curley, Kenneth Donohue, James Barrett, Richard Cozzolino, Roy Bell, Kevin Boshell, Patrick Carr, Robert Abraham, Donald Bruce, Nelida Cruz, Angelo C. Charles-Pepe, Joseph Cooney, Angela Bianco, John Cavelli, Thomas Carton, James Cash, Diego Betancur, Joseph Anzalone, Dean Abruscato, Roseann Dorval-Penna, Susan Arvanites, Jose R. Arias, Michael Fitzpatrick, Paul Adams, Dennis Ditucci, Steven Farkas, Samuel Aizer, Marlando Williams, Robert Morgan, Carol Ginsburg, Barbara Neidich, Antoinette Holley, Thomas Ryan, James Mohan, John Goetz, Ciro Migliore, Vincent Tesoriero, Dyke Nikqi, Thomas McTigue, Anthony Flammia, Brian Thompson, Joseph Rivera, Robert McGrath, Raphael Fragola, Mokhtar Mullaei, Joan Riche, Albert Troche, John P. Ryan, Thomas Tracy, Edwin Webster, Joseph Vitto, Juan Martinez, William Kehoe, William Hucks, Clayton Othiossinir, Richard Holmberg, Denis McCarthy, John Kiernan, Mohammed Ali Sha, Mathew von Seydewitz, Carlos Gonzalez, Thomas Manning, John Ryan, Paul Wewe, Michael O'Brien, Howard Lemkin, Wendy Mella-Mejia, Inocencio Rivera, Keith Pommells, Mario Marsich, Lawrence Rottkamp, Jonantony Paese, William Zuk, Rodney Morris, William Rendino, Angel Rosado, Vijaya Sinha, Thomas Willoughby, Michael Liporace, Robin Ormsby, Michael McCarroll, James Leonard, Louise Friscia, Theodore Goldfarb, Anthony Ubides, Adele Verde, Larry Stewart, Michael O'Donnell, Milton Gordon, James O'Neill, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Benett, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mohan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Adams
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McGrath
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Carter
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Wewe
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Ali Sha
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelida Cruz
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Neill, Jr.
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Flammia
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Ashton
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlando Williams
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Liporace
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Donohue
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Betancur
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tracy
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Manning
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Farkas
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Rottkamp
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Morris
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Arvanites
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Camacho
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Braunstein
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Thompson
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rivera
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Boshell
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCarroll
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Friscia
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Barrett
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Pommells
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Abruscato
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cozzolino
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Lemkin
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ryan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Rosado
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Bianco
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eligia Carradero
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Mella-Mejia
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cooney
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Carton
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Bell
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ubides
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inocencio Rivera
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Anzalone
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Bruce
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Curley
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Goldfarb
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Anzalota
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo C. Charles-Pepe
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Donnell
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McTigue
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raphael Fragola
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ditucci
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Troche
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cookson
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Denis
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Gordon
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Leonard
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Abraham
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Neidich
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ginsburg
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew von Seydewitz
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Morgan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Willoughby
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Zuk
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Othiossinir
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyke Nikqi
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adele Verde
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Vitto
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Stewart
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Ryan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciro Migliore
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rendino
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Holley
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Aizer
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Goetz
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Holmberg
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cash
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R. Arias
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kehoe
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Webster
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Ormsby
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseann Dorval-Penna
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonantony Paese
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cavelli
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Carr
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vijaya Sinha
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mokhtar Mullaei
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kiernan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Tesoriero
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ryan
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis McCarthy
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hucks
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Martinez
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Depirro
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Marsich
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Contino
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Riche
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gonzalez
Represented By: Megan Wolfe Benett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?