Vazquez et al v. Fig & Olive Founders LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez, Francisco Corte, Fabian Fructuoso, Adan Gonzalez, Jorge Gregorio and Uriel Galindo
Defendant: Fig & Olive Fifth Avenue LLC, Fig & Olive Thirteen Street LLC, Fig & Olive Inc., Fig & Olive Holding LLC, Fig & Olive Founders LLC and Fig & Olive USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11846
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/22/2019. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/8/2016) (mf)
February 11, 2019 Filing 27 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jorge Gregorio.(Lee, C.K.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 26 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Uriel Galindo.(Lee, C.K.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Adan Gonzalez.(Lee, C.K.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Fabian Fructuoso.(Lee, C.K.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Francisco Corte.(Lee, C.K.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Rogelio Ramos.(Lee, C.K.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Alberto Vazquez.(Lee, C.K.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Taubenfeld on behalf of Fig & Olive Fifth Avenue LLC, Fig & Olive Founders LLC, Fig & Olive Holding LLC, Fig & Olive Inc., Fig & Olive Thirteen Street LLC, Fig & Olive USA Inc.. (Taubenfeld, Michael)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter filed by Francisco Corte, Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Fig & Olive Fifth Avenue LLC answer due 3/4/2019; Fig & Olive Founders LLC answer due 3/4/2019; Fig & Olive Holding LLC answer due 3/4/2019; Fig & Olive Inc. answer due 3/4/2019; Fig & Olive Thirteen Street LLC answer due 3/4/2019; Fig & Olive USA Inc. answer due 3/4/2019. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/5/2019) (kv)
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from C.K. Lee dated February 4, 2019 re: Extension of time to answer. Document filed by Francisco Corte, Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez.(Lee, C.K.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Fig & Olive Founders LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty (Secretary of State). Document filed by Alberto Vazquez; Francisco Corte; Rogelio Ramos. (Lee, C.K.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez. (Seelig, Anne)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/19/2018) (jca)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fig & Olive USA Inc.. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fig & Olive Fifth Avenue LLC. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fig & Olive Founders LLC. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fig & Olive Thirteen Street LLC. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fig & Olive Holding LLC. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fig & Olive Inc.. (pc)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney C.K. Lee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Francisco Corte. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fig & Olive USA Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Francisco Corte, Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez. (Lee, C.K.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fig & Olive Thirteen Street LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Francisco Corte, Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez. (Lee, C.K.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fig & Olive Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Francisco Corte, Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez. (Lee, C.K.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fig & Olive Holding LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Francisco Corte, Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez. (Lee, C.K.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fig & Olive Founders LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Francisco Corte, Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez. (Lee, C.K.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fig & Olive Fifth Avenue LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Francisco Corte, Rogelio Ramos, Alberto Vazquez. (Lee, C.K.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fig & Olive Fifth Avenue LLC, Fig & Olive Founders LLC, Fig & Olive Holding LLC, Fig & Olive Inc., Fig & Olive Thirteen Street LLC, Fig & Olive USA Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16068597)Document filed by Alberto Vazquez, Francisco Corte, Rogelio Ramos.(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez et al v. Fig & Olive Founders LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Ramos
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Represented By: Anne Melissa Seelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Vazquez
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Represented By: Anne Melissa Seelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Corte
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Fructuoso
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Gonzalez
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Gregorio
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uriel Galindo
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fig & Olive Fifth Avenue LLC
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fig & Olive Thirteen Street LLC
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fig & Olive Inc.
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fig & Olive Holding LLC
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fig & Olive Founders LLC
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fig & Olive USA Inc.
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?