Abdou et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Abdou Mohamed, Rodolfo Salcedo, John Hurley, Karl Williams, Jamie Kelly, Abraham Goldstein, Gazim Bruce, Michael O'Brien, Louis Colasanti, Christopher O'Brien, Delores Palmer, Tracy Mulqueen, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Sean O'Toole, Kok Heong Tseng, David Diaz, Darren Drake, Robert James, Jesus Antonio Rivera, Timothy Flynn, James Maxwell, Tracy Macari, Albert Meyer, Anthony DeRogatis, Winston Thompson, John Finlay, Michael Holtzman, MacArthur Bobbitt, Sylvia Fenton, Martha Garcia, Rosemarie Rowe-Leichter, Henry Feingersh, Bety St. Victor, William Scarola, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, Frank Crichlow, Keith Poney, Philip A Collins, Lawrence Gould, John Bender, Roberta Jackson, James Ford, Holman Robertson, Carmen Medina, Berton Smith, Fernando Pino, Steven Layne, Mohamed Abdou, Peter F Broderick, Keith Chamish, Paul Hoerner Jr, Elvia Carpio, Nikolaos Tserpelis, Carmen Marrero, Anthony Kong, Carol James, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Pietro Gambino, Igor Soloyev, Marie Lyons, Enrique Padilla, Robert Gill, Alexander Veltman, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Beverly Eaton, David Cohen, Yadira Sarday, Anne Albritton, Tania Wells, Gary Ruff, Carlos Lagos, Nikki Prasad, Peter Okeefe, Michael O'Connor, Drew Kiriazides, Peter DiNazzo, Dennis Edwards, Boston A Richards, Natalia Caballero, Vinicio Felix, Alan Kasman, Kim Slater, Ethan Ernest, Gjon Juncaj, Daisy Morales, John Alessi, Sandra Fagan, Steven G White, Steven Feingersh, Enrique Caballero, Alberto Roberson, Ramon Ramirez, Dilza Rosario, Nilda Rosa, Art Capri, Gerwyn Williams, Radek Sebek, Dana Frank, Richard Williams and Brian Williams
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11856
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by Enrique Padilla ; Robert James ; Enrique Caballero ; Dana Frank ; Rudolph DiMaggio Jr ; Beverly Eaton ; Sylvia Fenton ; Nikolaos Tserpelis ; Henry Feingersh ; David Cohen ; Rosemarie Rowe-Leichter ; Drew Kiriazides; Keith Poney ; Daisy Morales ; Robert Gill ; Natalia Caballero ; Steven Feingersh ; Rodolfo Salcedo ; Peter Okeefe ; David Diaz ; Pietro Gambino ; Kok Heong Tseng ; Abraham Goldstein ; Sandra Fagan ; Holman Robertson ; Boston A Richards ; Lawrence Gould ; Ramon Ramirez ; Tania Wells ; Steven G White ; Albert Meyer ; Jamie Kelly ; Keith Chamish ; Jesus Antonio Rivera ; John Hurley ; Peter DiNazzo ; Gary Ruff ; Paul Hoerner Jr ; Karl Williams ; Alexander Veltman ; Peter F Broderick ; Richard Williams ; Berton Smith ; John Alessi ; Philip A Collins ; Brian Williams ; Nicholas DelliVeneri; Dennis Edwards ; Gazim Bruce ; William Scarola ; Anthony DeRogatis ; Carol James ; Carmen Medina ; Mohamed Abdou; Michael O'Brien ; Ethan Ernest ; Louis Colasanti ; Tracy Macari ; Carmen Marrero ; John Finlay ; Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas ; John Bender ; Fernando Pino ; MacArthur Bobbitt ; Darren Drake ; James Maxwell ; Michael Holtzman ; Steven Layne ; Frank Crichlow ; Gerwyn Williams ; Michael O'Connor ; Sean O'Toole ; Marie Lyons ; Winston Thompson ; Anthony Kong ; Alan Kasman ; Bety St. Victor ; Gjon Juncaj ; Nilda Rosa ; Art Capri ; Christopher O'Brien ; Carlos Lagos ; Yadira Sarday ; Anne Albritton ; Dilza Rosario ; James Ford ; Elvia Carpio ; Kim Slater ; Vinicio Felix ; Alberto Roberson ; Roberta Jackson ; Tracy Mulqueen ; Delores Palmer ; Elizabeth Joanne Asencio ; Igor Soloyev ; Timothy Flynn ; Andrew Anthony Bevacqua ; Nikki Prasad ; Martha Garcia ; Radek Sebek. (Kreindler, James)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Mohamed Abdou, Anne Albritton, John Alessi, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, John Bender, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, MacArthur Bobbitt, Peter F Broderick, Gazim Bruce, Enrique Caballero, Natalia Caballero, Art Capri, Elvia Carpio, Keith Chamish, David Cohen, Louis Colasanti, Philip A Collins, Frank Crichlow, Anthony DeRogatis, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Peter DiNazzo, David Diaz, Darren Drake, Beverly Eaton, Dennis Edwards, Ethan Ernest, Sandra Fagan, Henry Feingersh, Steven Feingersh, Vinicio Felix, Sylvia Fenton, John Finlay, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, Timothy Flynn, James Ford, Dana Frank, Pietro Gambino, Martha Garcia, Robert Gill, Abraham Goldstein, Lawrence Gould, Paul Hoerner Jr, Michael Holtzman, John Hurley, Roberta Jackson, Carol James, Robert James, Gjon Juncaj, Alan Kasman, Jamie Kelly, Drew Kiriazides, Anthony Kong, Carlos Lagos, Steven Layne, Marie Lyons, Tracy Macari, Carmen Marrero, James Maxwell, Carmen Medina, Albert Meyer, Daisy Morales, Tracy Mulqueen, Christopher O'Brien, Michael O'Brien, Michael O'Connor, Sean O'Toole, Peter Okeefe, Enrique Padilla, Delores Palmer, Fernando Pino, Keith Poney, Nikki Prasad, Ramon Ramirez, Boston A Richards, Jesus Antonio Rivera, Alberto Roberson, Holman Robertson, Nilda Rosa, Dilza Rosario, Rosemarie Rowe-Leichter, Gary Ruff, Rodolfo Salcedo, Yadira Sarday, William Scarola, Radek Sebek, Kim Slater, Berton Smith, Igor Soloyev, Bety St. Victor, Winston Thompson, Kok Heong Tseng, Nikolaos Tserpelis, Alexander Veltman, Tania Wells, Steven G White, Brian Williams, Gerwyn Williams, Karl Williams, Richard Williams.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Enrique Padilla, Robert James, Enrique Caballero, Dana Frank, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Beverly Eaton, Sylvia Fenton, Nikolaos Tserpelis, Henry Feingersh, David Cohen, Rosemarie Rowe-Leichter, Drew Kiriazides, Keith Poney, Daisy Morales, Robert Gill, Natalia Caballero, Steven Feingersh, Rodolfo Salcedo, Peter Okeefe, David Diaz, Pietro Gambino, Kok Heong Tseng, Abraham Goldstein, Sandra Fagan, Holman Robertson, Boston A Richards, Lawrence Gould, Ramon Ramirez, Tania Wells, Steven G White, Albert Meyer, Jamie Kelly, Keith Chamish, Jesus Antonio Rivera, John Hurley, Peter DiNazzo, Gary Ruff, Paul Hoerner Jr, Karl Williams, Alexander Veltman, Peter F Broderick, Richard Williams, Berton Smith, John Alessi, Philip A Collins, Brian Williams, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Dennis Edwards, Gazim Bruce, William Scarola, Anthony DeRogatis, Carol James, Carmen Medina, Mohamed Abdou, Michael O'Brien, Ethan Ernest, Louis Colasanti, Tracy Macari, Carmen Marrero, John Finlay, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, John Bender, Fernando Pino, MacArthur Bobbitt, Darren Drake, James Maxwell, Michael Holtzman, Steven Layne, Frank Crichlow, Gerwyn Williams, Michael O'Connor, Sean O'Toole, Marie Lyons, Winston Thompson, Anthony Kong, Alan Kasman, Bety St. Victor, Gjon Juncaj, Nilda Rosa, Art Capri, Christopher O'Brien, Carlos Lagos, Yadira Sarday, Anne Albritton, Dilza Rosario, James Ford, Elvia Carpio, Kim Slater, Vinicio Felix, Alberto Roberson, Roberta Jackson, Tracy Mulqueen, Delores Palmer, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Igor Soloyev, Timothy Flynn, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Nikki Prasad, Martha Garcia, Radek Sebek. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Enrique Padilla, Robert James, Enrique Caballero, Dana Frank, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Beverly Eaton, Sylvia Fenton, Henry Feingersh, David Cohen, Drew Kiriazides, Keith Poney, Daisy Morales, Robert Gill, Natalia Caballero, Steven Feingersh, Peter Okeefe, David Diaz, Pietro Gambino, Abraham Goldstein, Sandra Fagan, Boston A Richards, Lawrence Gould, Ramon Ramirez, Albert Meyer, Jamie Kelly, Keith Chamish, Jesus Antonio Rivera, John Hurley, Peter DiNazzo, Paul Hoerner Jr, Peter F Broderick, John Alessi, Philip A Collins, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Dennis Edwards, Gazim Bruce, Anthony DeRogatis, Carol James, Carmen Medina, Mohamed Abdou, Michael O'Brien, Ethan Ernest, Louis Colasanti, Tracy Macari, Carmen Marrero, John Finlay, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, John Bender, Fernando Pino, MacArthur Bobbitt, Darren Drake, James Maxwell, Michael Holtzman, Steven Layne, Frank Crichlow, Michael O'Connor, Sean O'Toole, Marie Lyons, Anthony Kong, Alan Kasman, Gjon Juncaj, Art Capri, Christopher O'Brien, Carlos Lagos, Anne Albritton, James Ford, Elvia Carpio, Vinicio Felix, Alberto Roberson, Roberta Jackson, Tracy Mulqueen, Delores Palmer, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Timothy Flynn, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Nikki Prasad, Martha Garcia, Rosemarie Rowe-Leichter, Radek Sebek, Gary Ruff, Richard Williams, Holman Robertson, Karl Williams, Nilda Rosa, Steven G White, Igor Soloyev, Berton Smith, Kim Slater, Gerwyn Williams, Bety St. Victor, Yadira Sarday, Alexander Veltman, Winston Thompson, Tania Wells, Nikolaos Tserpelis, Brian Williams, Kok Heong Tseng, Rodolfo Salcedo, Dilza Rosario, William Scarola added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Enrique Padilla, Robert James, Enrique Caballero, Dana Frank, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Beverly Eaton, Sylvia Fenton, Henry Feingersh, David Cohen, Drew Kiriazides, Keith Poney, Daisy Morales, Robert Gill, Natalia Caballero, Steven Feingersh, Peter Okeefe, David Diaz, Pietro Gambino, Abraham Goldstein, Sandra Fagan, Boston A Richards, Lawrence Gould, Ramon Ramirez, Albert Meyer, Jamie Kelly, Keith Chamish, Jesus Antonio Rivera, John Hurley, Peter DiNazzo, Paul Hoerner Jr, Peter F Broderick, John Alessi, Philip A Collins, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Dennis Edwards, Gazim Bruce, Anthony DeRogatis, Carol James, Carmen Medina, Mohamed Abdou, Michael O'Brien, Ethan Ernest, Louis Colasanti, Tracy Macari, Carmen Marrero, John Finlay, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, John Bender, Fernando Pino, MacArthur Bobbitt, Darren Drake, James Maxwell, Michael Holtzman, Steven Layne, Frank Crichlow, Michael O'Connor, Sean O'Toole, Marie Lyons, Anthony Kong, Alan Kasman, Gjon Juncaj, Art Capri, Christopher O'Brien, Carlos Lagos, Anne Albritton, James Ford, Elvia Carpio, Vinicio Felix, Alberto Roberson, Roberta Jackson, Tracy Mulqueen, Delores Palmer, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Timothy Flynn, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Nikki Prasad, Martha Garcia, Rosemarie Rowe-Leichter, Radek Sebek, Gary Ruff, Richard Williams, Holman Robertson, Karl Williams, Nilda Rosa, Steven G White, Igor Soloyev, Berton Smith, Kim Slater, Gerwyn Williams, Bety St. Victor, Yadira Sarday, Alexander Veltman, Winston Thompson, Tania Wells, Nikolaos Tserpelis, Brian Williams, Kok Heong Tseng, Rodolfo Salcedo, Dilza Rosario, William Scarola. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Robert James, Enrique Caballero, Dana Frank, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Beverly Eaton, Sylvia Fenton, Henry Feingersh, David Cohen, Drew Kiriazides, Robert Gill, Natalia Caballero, Steven Feingersh, David Diaz, Pietro Gambino, Abraham Goldstein, Sandra Fagan, Lawrence Gould, Jamie Kelly, Keith Chamish, John Hurley, Peter DiNazzo, Paul Hoerner Jr, Peter F Broderick, John Alessi, Philip A Collins, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Dennis Edwards, Gazim Bruce, Anthony DeRogatis, Carol James, Mohamed Abdou, Ethan Ernest, Louis Colasanti, John Finlay, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, John Bender, MacArthur Bobbitt, Darren Drake, Michael Holtzman, Frank Crichlow, Alan Kasman, Gjon Juncaj, Art Capri, Anne Albritton, James Ford, Elvia Carpio, Vinicio Felix, Roberta Jackson, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Timothy Flynn, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Martha Garcia, Marie Lyons, Albert Meyer, Tracy Macari, Alberto Roberson, Boston A Richards, Anthony Kong, Ramon Ramirez, Carlos Lagos, Fernando Pino, Christopher O'Brien, Tracy Mulqueen, Daisy Morales, Nikki Prasad, Michael O'Brien, James Maxwell, Enrique Padilla, Michael O'Connor, Jesus Antonio Rivera, Delores Palmer, Sean O'Toole, Keith Poney, Peter Okeefe, Steven Layne, Carmen Marrero, Carmen Medina added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Robert James, Enrique Caballero, Dana Frank, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Beverly Eaton, Sylvia Fenton, Henry Feingersh, David Cohen, Drew Kiriazides, Robert Gill, Natalia Caballero, Steven Feingersh, David Diaz, Pietro Gambino, Abraham Goldstein, Sandra Fagan, Lawrence Gould, Jamie Kelly, Keith Chamish, John Hurley, Peter DiNazzo, Paul Hoerner Jr, Peter F Broderick, John Alessi, Philip A Collins, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Dennis Edwards, Gazim Bruce, Anthony DeRogatis, Carol James, Mohamed Abdou, Ethan Ernest, Louis Colasanti, John Finlay, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, John Bender, MacArthur Bobbitt, Darren Drake, Michael Holtzman, Frank Crichlow, Alan Kasman, Gjon Juncaj, Art Capri, Anne Albritton, James Ford, Elvia Carpio, Vinicio Felix, Roberta Jackson, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Timothy Flynn, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Martha Garcia, Marie Lyons, Albert Meyer, Tracy Macari, Alberto Roberson, Boston A Richards, Anthony Kong, Ramon Ramirez, Carlos Lagos, Fernando Pino, Christopher O'Brien, Tracy Mulqueen, Daisy Morales, Nikki Prasad, Michael O'Brien, James Maxwell, Enrique Padilla, Michael O'Connor, Jesus Antonio Rivera, Delores Palmer, Sean O'Toole, Keith Poney, Peter Okeefe, Steven Layne, Carmen Marrero, Carmen Medina. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Anthony DeRogatis, Enrique Caballero, Dana Frank, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Beverly Eaton, Sylvia Fenton, Henry Feingersh, David Cohen, Mohamed Abdou, Ethan Ernest, Louis Colasanti, John Finlay, Natalia Caballero, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, Steven Feingersh, John Bender, Darren Drake, MacArthur Bobbitt, David Diaz, Sandra Fagan, Frank Crichlow, Keith Chamish, Art Capri, Anne Albritton, James Ford, Peter DiNazzo, Peter F Broderick, Elvia Carpio, Vinicio Felix, John Alessi, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Timothy Flynn, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Philip A Collins, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Dennis Edwards, Gazim Bruce, Jamie Kelly, Abraham Goldstein, Roberta Jackson, Lawrence Gould, Pietro Gambino, Martha Garcia, Drew Kiriazides, Gjon Juncaj, Paul Hoerner Jr, Robert Gill, Robert James, Carol James, Alan Kasman, John Hurley, Michael Holtzman added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Anthony DeRogatis, Enrique Caballero, Dana Frank, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Beverly Eaton, Sylvia Fenton, Henry Feingersh, David Cohen, Mohamed Abdou, Ethan Ernest, Louis Colasanti, John Finlay, Natalia Caballero, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, Steven Feingersh, John Bender, Darren Drake, MacArthur Bobbitt, David Diaz, Sandra Fagan, Frank Crichlow, Keith Chamish, Art Capri, Anne Albritton, James Ford, Peter DiNazzo, Peter F Broderick, Elvia Carpio, Vinicio Felix, John Alessi, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Timothy Flynn, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Philip A Collins, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Dennis Edwards, Gazim Bruce, Jamie Kelly, Abraham Goldstein, Roberta Jackson, Lawrence Gould, Pietro Gambino, Martha Garcia, Drew Kiriazides, Gjon Juncaj, Paul Hoerner Jr, Robert Gill, Robert James, Carol James, Alan Kasman, John Hurley, Michael Holtzman. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Anthony DeRogatis, Enrique Caballero, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Beverly Eaton, David Cohen, Mohamed Abdou, Louis Colasanti, Natalia Caballero, John Bender, Darren Drake, MacArthur Bobbitt, David Diaz, Frank Crichlow, Keith Chamish, Art Capri, Anne Albritton, Peter DiNazzo, Peter F Broderick, Elvia Carpio, John Alessi, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Philip A Collins, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Gazim Bruce, Henry Feingersh, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, Steven Feingersh, Dennis Edwards, Ethan Ernest, Dana Frank, Sandra Fagan, Vinicio Felix, James Ford, Timothy Flynn, John Finlay, Sylvia Fenton added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Anthony DeRogatis, Enrique Caballero, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Beverly Eaton, David Cohen, Mohamed Abdou, Louis Colasanti, Natalia Caballero, John Bender, Darren Drake, MacArthur Bobbitt, David Diaz, Frank Crichlow, Keith Chamish, Art Capri, Anne Albritton, Peter DiNazzo, Peter F Broderick, Elvia Carpio, John Alessi, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Philip A Collins, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Gazim Bruce, Henry Feingersh, Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas, Steven Feingersh, Dennis Edwards, Ethan Ernest, Dana Frank, Sandra Fagan, Vinicio Felix, James Ford, Timothy Flynn, John Finlay, Sylvia Fenton. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Enrique Caballero, David Cohen, Mohamed Abdou, Keith Chamish, Art Capri, Anne Albritton, Louis Colasanti, Natalia Caballero, Peter F Broderick, John Bender, MacArthur Bobbitt, Elvia Carpio, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, John Alessi, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Philip A Collins, Gazim Bruce, David Diaz, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Peter DiNazzo, Anthony DeRogatis, Frank Crichlow, Beverly Eaton, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Darren Drake added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Enrique Caballero, David Cohen, Mohamed Abdou, Keith Chamish, Art Capri, Anne Albritton, Louis Colasanti, Natalia Caballero, Peter F Broderick, John Bender, MacArthur Bobbitt, Elvia Carpio, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, John Alessi, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Philip A Collins, Gazim Bruce, David Diaz, Rudolph DiMaggio Jr, Peter DiNazzo, Anthony DeRogatis, Frank Crichlow, Beverly Eaton, Nicholas DelliVeneri, Darren Drake. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mohamed Abdou, David Cohen, John Bender, Louis Colasanti, Enrique Caballero, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Elvia Carpio, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, MacArthur Bobbitt, Art Capri, Natalia Caballero, Anne Albritton, Keith Chamish, Peter F Broderick, John Alessi, Gazim Bruce, Philip A Collins added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Mohamed Abdou, David Cohen, John Bender, Louis Colasanti, Enrique Caballero, Andrew Anthony Bevacqua, Elvia Carpio, Elizabeth Joanne Asencio, MacArthur Bobbitt, Art Capri, Natalia Caballero, Anne Albritton, Keith Chamish, Peter F Broderick, John Alessi, Gazim Bruce, Philip A Collins. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney David Charles Cook to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Charles Cook. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mohamed Abdou. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered incorrectly. (sj)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Charles Cook to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS - FILER ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as Document filed by Abdou Mohamed.(Cook, David) Modified on 12/18/2018 (sj).
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cook, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16069139)Document filed by Abdou Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Cook, David) Modified on 12/18/2018 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdou et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdou Mohamed
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Salcedo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hurley
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Williams
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Kelly
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Goldstein
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gazim Bruce
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Brien
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Colasanti
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher O'Brien
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Palmer
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Mulqueen
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas DelliVeneri
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean O'Toole
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kok Heong Tseng
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Diaz
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Drake
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert James
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Antonio Rivera
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Flynn
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Maxwell
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Macari
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Meyer
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony DeRogatis
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Thompson
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Finlay
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Holtzman
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MacArthur Bobbitt
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Fenton
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Garcia
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Rowe-Leichter
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Feingersh
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bety St. Victor
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Scarola
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Fiorino Barnetas
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Crichlow
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Poney
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip A Collins
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Gould
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bender
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Jackson
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ford
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holman Robertson
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Medina
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berton Smith
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Pino
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Layne
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Abdou
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter F Broderick
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Chamish
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hoerner Jr
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvia Carpio
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikolaos Tserpelis
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Marrero
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Kong
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol James
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Joanne Asencio
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pietro Gambino
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Soloyev
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Lyons
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Padilla
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gill
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Veltman
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph DiMaggio Jr
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Anthony Bevacqua
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Eaton
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cohen
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Sarday
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Albritton
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tania Wells
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ruff
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Lagos
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Prasad
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Okeefe
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Connor
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Kiriazides
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter DiNazzo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Edwards
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston A Richards
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Caballero
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinicio Felix
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Kasman
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Slater
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Ernest
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gjon Juncaj
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Morales
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alessi
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Fagan
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven G White
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Feingersh
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Caballero
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Roberson
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Ramirez
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilza Rosario
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilda Rosa
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Capri
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerwyn Williams
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radek Sebek
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Frank
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Williams
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Williams
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?