Kim et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Andrea Stauter, Dawn Gonzalez, Rozelda Bailey-Green, Nina Fisher, Kyle Fisher, Jacobo Castro, Andrea Statuter, Maria R Fisher, Deepa R Gopu, Christopher Geis, Darril Garo, Ryan P Fisher, Douglas Hall, Frances Grouzalis, Venkata Subba Reddy Gopu, Catherine Ericson, Amy Radin, Christina D Fisher, Margaret Ann Williams, Arthur Harris, Bernice Dawn Dillard, Donna Struzzieri, Robert Hofmiller, Shari Florio, Kathryn Nesbit, Tina M Fisher, Christine Sandra Wilson, Amanda Feliciano, Edith Otelia Harris, Helen Carole Ericson, Stephanie E Lang, Brenda Garrett, Michael J Florio, Chang Don Kim, Catherine M Eklund, Carlene Wynn, Bridget E Fisher, Valestine Henderson, John Fisher, Obed Garo, Anne Marie Hartney, Tara Butzbaugh, Rachel James, Peter Fisher, Norma Geraghty, Bebe Hafiz, Nina A Fisher, Patrick T Wynn, Kylie Eve Florio, David D Henwood, Jr., Joan Aiello, Gregory Hrycak, David Fogel, Katherine Wynn, John R Eichler, Erin N Siegel, Michael T Griffin, Evan H Fisher, David D Henwood, III, Paul Gyulavary, Jonathan Goody, Brenda S Goody, Alexis Feliciano, Isaac Feliciano, Sarah DeSimone, Talat Hamdani, Alexis Goody-Harding, Joseph Francis, Mary L Henwood, Selma M Friedman, Marie E Fisher, Catherine A Chiola, Joe Green, Douglas W Hall, Adilakshumma Gopu, James P Geis, Shawn C Hall, Mary C Henwood, Madlene Brown, Jennifer Green, Elizabeth Ann Kiel, John Florio and Anthony D. Harris
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2018cv11870
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 77 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Judgment 2)Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages and Liability, dated September 10, 2019 3)Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages Dated February 5, 2020 4)Instructions for Appealing Judgment 5)A copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C. 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.) 6)Affidavit of Translator mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran Iman Khomeini Avenue Tehran, Iran ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif on 2/19/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) by Federal Express tracking # 8138 7042 2793.(smc)
February 18, 2020 Filing 76 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (126 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 111 in 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN, 74 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 5952 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 74 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 66 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN) Order. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's January 23, 2020 Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs' motions; (Report, ECF No.5735, at 12), is adopted, as it pertains to Plaintiffs John Proodian, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Julio Masa Lebron, George A. Cuellar, and Rebecca Sue Loethen. Plaintiffs motion for Final Judgments (ECF Nos. 4930, 4914, 4910, 4918, and 4934), are granted as they pertain to John Proodian, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Julio Masa Lebron, George A. Cuellar, and Rebecca Sue Loethen. it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgmentfor solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages awards may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those PlaintiffsAppearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of John Prodian against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Reginald Colon against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Rosa Colon against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Julio Masa Lebron against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of George A. Cuellar against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $12,500,000.00, and in favor of Rebecca Sue Loethen against the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 12,500,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (dt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judgment served on Islamic Republic of Iran on 2/18/2020. Document filed by Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim), Chang Don Kim(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Soh Ryang Kim, deceased, the late parent of Lawrence Don Kim)..(Goldman, Jerry)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re: (34 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 4930 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment, (4918 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 85 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment, (4914 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 84 in 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment: Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF Nos. 4930, 4914, 4910, 4918, and 4934), are GRANTED as they pertain to Plaintiffs John Proodian, Reginald Colon, Rosa Colon, Julio Masa Lebron, George A. Cuellar, and Rebecca Sue Loethen. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions for which this Court has not granted extensions of time for plaintiffs to object in 03 MDL 1570, (ECF Nos. 4930, 4914, and 4918), 18 Civ. 12387, (ECF No. 34), 18 Civ. 5320 (ECF No. 84), and 18 Civ. 5306 (ECF No. 85), accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (58 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 71 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 5759 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2020) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/6/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN (jwh)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS ON BEHALF OF KIM PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED IN EXHIBITS A AND B III: ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Kim III, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of an individual killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/5/2020) (jwh)
January 29, 2020 Filing 71 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated 1/29/2020 Document filed by Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Chang Kim.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
January 23, 2020 Filing 70 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiffs should receive solatium damages as follows: (See document.) The solatium claims for Diana Patricia Castano, Margaret Ann Williams, Christine Wilson, Katherine Wynn, Edith Otelia Harris, the Estate of Lelia Wynn, and the Estate of Dorothy Lee Coles should be DENIED under the principles established in Hoglan IV. Plaintiffs should also be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, through the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. See ECF No. 3358, adopted by, ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by the Court on this issue. Finally, any Rowenhorst, Agyeman, Abel, DeRubbio, and Kim Plaintiffs not appearing in this motion and who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), (d) (adding three additional days when service is made under Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(C), (D), or (F)). A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/23/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
January 16, 2020 Filing 69 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated 1/15/2020 Document filed by Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim), Chang Don Kim(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Soh Ryang Kim, deceased, the late parent of Lawrence Don Kim).(Goldman, Jerry)
January 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (5617 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 67 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(dt)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting (5532) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (62) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN. The individuals included on Exhibit A to the Motion shall be substituted into the Kim case. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN. (ras)
January 15, 2020 Filing 67 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Strong, Bruce) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 15, 2020 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: (5610 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 64 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment III .. Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Strong, Bruce)
January 15, 2020 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5610 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 64 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment III . . Document filed by Chang Kim. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Strong, Bruce)
January 15, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION Partial Final Judgment III . Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Strong, Bruce)
January 14, 2020 Filing 63 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Related Document Number: [5532, 62]. (Strong, Bruce) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 14, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Dawn Gonzalez, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jenine Gonzalez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jenine Gonzalez. Razelda Green, New Party: Dawn Gonzalez, as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Jenine Gonzalez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jenine Gonzalez. Kevin Anthony Green, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Razelda Bailey Green, deceased, the late parent of Derrick A. Green . Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Strong, Bruce)
January 13, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Iran Notice of Amendment re: (1 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (46 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, (47 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, (5234 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Order,,. Document filed by William H. Taylor, III, Thomas Gonzalez, Jr, Thomas Gonzalez, Jr, Kaitlyn Fisher, Margaret Fisher, Eugene A. Harris, Cynthia M. Harris, Anthony D. Harris, Chang Kim. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
January 9, 2020 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the following documents in English and Farsi: Notices of Judgment; Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages and Liability dated September 10, 2019; Judgment, dated September 11, 2019; Instructions for Appealing Judgment; a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C. 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.); and Affidavit of Translator mailed to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, c/o Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, on 09/12/2019, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 9/12/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 8148 5856 7249, per #53 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (smc)
January 9, 2020 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the following documents in English and Farsi: Notice of Judgment; Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages, dated September 3, 2019; Notice of Appeal; a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C. 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.); and Affidavit of Translator mailed to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, c/o Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif on 09/11/2019, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA -29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 9/11/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 8148 5856 7400, per #52 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (smc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Iran Notice of Amendment Nunc Pro Tunc. Document filed by Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim). (Goldman, Jerry)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER TO WITHDRAW BENJAMIN D. MARGO AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: It is ORDERED that Benjamin D. Margo be withdrawn as counsel for the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia in the above-referenced action. (Attorney Benjamin David Margo.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (jwh)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting (5182) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (524) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; granting (96) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (95) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (44) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN; granting (54) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (45) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (46) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; granting (48) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Iran Notices of Amendment Nunc Pro Tunc, in the above-captioned matters, it is hereby; ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' motion is granted; ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file the Iran Notices of Amendment Nunc Pro Tunc, attached hereto as Exhibits A - I. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/23/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
October 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (51 in 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN, 47 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN, 57 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 98 in 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN, 49 in 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN, 527 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 99 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 5185 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 57 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jessica Derubbio, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, John O'Neill, Matthew Rowenhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) Related Document Number: [5182, 524, 96, 95, 44, 54, 45, 48, 46, 48]. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 2, 2019 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (96 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN, 5182 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 95 in 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN, 45 in 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 54 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN, 524 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION for Leave to File Iran Notices Of Amendment NUNC PRO TUNC . . Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jessica Derubbio, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, John O'Neill, Matthew Rowenhorst. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
October 2, 2019 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: (95 in 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN, 45 in 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN, 54 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN, 96 in 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN, 5182 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN, 524 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION for Leave to File Iran Notices Of Amendment NUNC PRO TUNC .. Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jessica Derubbio, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, John O'Neill, Matthew Rowenhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
October 2, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Iran Notices Of Amendment NUNC PRO TUNC . Document filed by Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jessica Derubbio, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, John O'Neill, John O'Neill, Matthew Rowenhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 53 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the following documents in English and Farsi: Notices of Judgment; Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages and Liability dated September 10, 2019; Judgment, dated September 11, 2019; Instructions for Appealing Judgment; a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C. 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.); and Affidavit of Translator, for service on defendant ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, c/o Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, on 09/12/2019, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), by Federal Express tracking # 8148 5856 7249.(gpe)
September 12, 2019 Filing 52 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the following documents in English and Farsi: Notice of Judgment; Order of Partial Final Judgment for Damages, dated September 3, 2019; Notice of Appeal; a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C. 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.); and Affidavit of Translator, for service on defendant ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, c/o Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif on 09/11/2019, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4, by Federal Express tracking # 8148 5856 7400. (gpe)
September 11, 2019 Filing 51 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (5122 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 50 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated September 10, 2019, that Plaintiffs' motion for partial final judgment, (ECF No. 4934) is granted in part and denied in part; this Court's determination on solatium damages and prejudgment interest for all non-immediate-family member claimants shall be decided by separate opinions because the specific factual circumstances of the non-immediate family members require further analysis; Final judgment is entered on behalf of all Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A against the Islamic Republic of Iran (the "Kim II Plaintiffs"), with the exception of Margret Ann Williams, Christine Sandra Wilson, Katherine Wynn, Edith Otelia Harris, Carlene Wynn as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lelia Mae Wynn, and Brenda Garrett as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Lee Coles; and it is ORDERED that all other Kim II Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it isORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated as a rate of 4.96% per annum; all interest compounded over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that will be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings;(1) Elizabeth Ann Kiel in the amount of $4,250,000, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period;(2) John Florio in the amount of $8,500,000.00, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period;(3) Bebe Hafiz as Personal Representative of the Estate of Cecil Mohammed Ishmael Hafiz in the amount of $8,500,000.00, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period;(4) Douglas Hall as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herman W. Hall in the amount of $8,500,000.00, plus prejudgment interest at 4.96% per annum compounded annually over the same period. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 09/11/2019) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(dt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (4934) Motion in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting in part and denying in part (40) Motion in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN: ORDERED that all other Kim II Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96% per annum; all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that will be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions in 03 md 1570, (ECF No. 4934), and 18 Civ. 11870, (ECF No. 40), accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. Modified on 9/10/2019 (jwh).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT: that the Motion is granted and default judgment as to liability is entered in favor of all plaintiffs in Chang Dom Kim et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, 1:18-cv-11870 (GBD)(SN) and against the Islamic Republic of Iran. Partial final judgment is entered against Iran and on behalf of those Plaintiffs who are identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling (or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A. Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A. Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of the judgment. Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have no previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue. The remaining Plaintiffs in Chang Dom Kim et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, 1:18-cv-11870(GBD)(SN) not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent such plaintiffs are similarly situated to those appearing on Exhibit A, the application will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. Motions terminated: (33 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 4841 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment . filed by Chang Don Kim. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(tro)
August 27, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samantha Emily Smith on behalf of C. O'Neill, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Marie DeConto LeBlanc, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Estate of of John P. O'Neill, Sr., Allison Garger, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Karyl Kincaid-Noel, Stephanie Lang, Queen Mercer, Deirdre Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. I. O'Neill, John O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Smith, Samantha)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting (4907) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (37) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 08/23/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN. (ras)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting (4829) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (30) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 08/23/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN. (ras)
August 23, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vianny Maria Pichardo on behalf of C. O'Neill, Erik Aamoth, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jr, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Joseph Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, Carly Gordenstein, David Gordenstein, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Marinella Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, Jackie Mercer, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, Timothy Murray, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. I. O'Neill, J. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Shannon Spence, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Pichardo, Vianny)
August 21, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Wah on behalf of Erik Aamoth, Gordon Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Jr, Lloyd Abel, Sr, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, Raymond DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Joseph Deuel, Joseph Deuel, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, Carly Gordenstein, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Marinella Hemenway, Robert Hemenway, Robert Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Horace Morris, Michael Murray, Michael Murray, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. O'Neill, C. I. O'Neill, Ana Ortiz, Berta Perez, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Deborah Rooney, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Barbara Spence, Edward Stackpole, Michael Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Wah, Stephen)
August 21, 2019 Filing 43 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 21, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: (40 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 4934 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment .. Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 21, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (40 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 4934 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment . . Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 21, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION Partial Final Judgment . Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (4937 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 43 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(ad)
August 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (4909 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(ad)
August 20, 2019 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Chang Kim. Related Document Number: [4907, 37]. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 20, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (4907 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 37 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) MOTION to Amend/Correct . . Document filed by Chang Kim. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 20, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. #36 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
August 14, 2019 Filing 36 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 14, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: (33 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 4841 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment .. Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 14, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (33 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 4841 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment . . Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 14, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION Partial Final Judgment . Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 14, 2019 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Chang Kim. Related Document Number: [4829, 4830, 30, 31]. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 14, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (4829 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 30 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN) MOTION to Amend/Correct . . Document filed by Chang Kim. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 14, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #32 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
August 13, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to The Islamic Republic of Iran, issued on August 13, 2019. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(dt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samantha Emily Smith on behalf of Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Smith, Samantha)
August 13, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: (26 in 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN, 4804 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Chang Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN(Goldman, Jerry)
August 13, 2019 Filing 26 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Chang Kim. (Goldman, Jerry) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vianny Maria Pichardo on behalf of Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Pichardo, Vianny)
August 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Wah on behalf of Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Wah, Stephen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey E Glen on behalf of Gordon Aamoth, Peter Aamoth, Lloyd Abel, Lloyd Abel, Audrey Ades, Roberta Agyeman, Margarite Bonomo, Rodney Bush, William Cintron-Lugos, David DeConto, Jessica Derubbio, Richard Deuel, Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr., Allison Garger, David Gordenstein, Arthur Harris, Desiree Hemenway, Alexander Jimenez, Bakahityar Kamardinova, Chang Kim, Kristian Kincaid, Stephanie Lang, Queen Mercer, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Dahlia Morris, Michael Murray, Ana Ortiz, Mario Perez, Hopeton Richards, Cheryl Rivelli, Matthew Rowenhorst, Laurence Schlissel, Shannon Spence, Michael Stackpole, Jack Zelmanowitz. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Glen, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 LETTERS ROGATORY (Doc. #4702) ISSUED July 25, 2019, as to Cathy Hawara Assistant Commissioner, Appeal Canada Rvenue Agency, Connaught Building, 555 MacKenzie Avenue, 7the Floor, Ottawa, Ontario in Canada. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Islamic Republic of Iran served on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Document filed by Ryan P Fisher; Evan H Fisher; Carlene Wynn; Stephanie E Lang(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Andrew Fisher); Jennifer Green; Douglas W Hall; John R Eichler (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret L. Eichler, deceased, the late spouse of John E. Eichler); Mary L Henwood; John Fisher(as Personal Representatives of the Estate of John F. Fisher, deceased, the late parent of Andrew Fisher); Amanda Feliciano; Shawn C Hall; Isaac Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of Rose Maria Feliciano); Joseph Francis; Brenda S Goody(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Harry Goody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Harry Goody); Valestine Henderson; Arthur Harris(individually, as surviving parent of Peggie Hurt); John Fisher(individually, as surviving sibling of Andrew Fisher); Jonathan Goody; Darril Garo; Adilakshumma Gopu; Stephanie E Lang(individually, as surviving spouse of Andrew Fisher); Rachel James; Edith Otelia Harris; Helen Carole Ericson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ulf Ramm Ericson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ulf Ramm Ericson); Catherine A Chiola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Roger Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Roger Fisher); Kyle Fisher; Catherine Ericson; Katherine Wynn; Catherine M Eklund; Donna Struzzieri(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Gary, deceased, the late parent of Bruce Gary); Brenda Garrett; Mary C Henwood; Jacobo Castro; Michael T Griffin; Peter Fisher; James P Geis; Shari Florio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Florio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John J. Florio); Joe Green; Deepa R Gopu(individually, as surviving sibling of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu); Michael J Florio; Sarah DeSimone(individually, as surviving child of Catherine Fagan); Anne Marie Hartney; David D Henwood, III; Dawn Gonzalez(individually, as surviving sibling of Jenine Gonzalez); Venkata Subba Reddy Gopu; Alexis Goody-Harding; Amy Radin; Talat Hamdani; Frances Grouzalis; Margaret Ann Williams; David D Henwood, Jr; Alexis Feliciano; Rozelda Bailey-Green; Brenda S Goody(individually, as surviving spouse of Harry Goody); Paul Gyulavary; Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herman W. Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall); Bebe Hafiz; Chang Don Kim(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Soh Ryang Kim, deceased, the late parent of Lawrence Don Kim); Isaac Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Rose Maria Feliciano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Rose Maria Feliciano); Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim); Christine Sandra Wilson; Catherine A Chiola(individually, as surviving sibling of John Roger Fisher); Robert Hofmiller; Nina Fisher; Nina A Fisher; Gregory Hrycak; Bernice Dawn Dillard; Kylie Eve Florio; Kathryn Nesbit; Deepa R Gopu(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu); Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall); Christopher Geis; Maria R Fisher; Dawn Gonzalez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jenine Gonzalez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jenine Gonzalez); Tara Butzbaugh; Christina D Fisher; David Fogel; Selma M Friedman; Marie E Fisher; Sarah DeSimone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Catherine Fagan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Catherine Fagan); Madlene Brown; John R Eichler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John E. Eichler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John E. Eichler); Arthur Harris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Peggie Hurt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Peggie Hurt); Andrea Stauter(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward T. Earhart, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward T. Earhart); Erin N Siegel; Obed Garo; Helen Carole Ericson(individually, as surviving spouse of Ulf Ramm Ericson); Norma Geraghty; Donna Struzzieri(individually, as surviving sibling of Bruce Gary); Joan Aiello; Shari Florio(individually, as surviving spouse of John J. Florio); Andrea Stauter(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charlotte Earhart, deceased, the late parent of Edward T. Earhart); Bridget E Fisher; Tina M Fisher; Patrick T Wynn; Andrea Statuter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goldman, Jerry)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Mamdouh Mahmud Salim for October 8, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Wadith elHage for October 7, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
July 12, 2019 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Summons, Complaint deemed filed on December 17, 2018, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Suit prepared in accordance with 22 CF 93.2 with a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330 and Affidavit of Translator (along with translations of the above documents) mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iman Khomeini Avenue Tehran, Iran ATTN: H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif on 03/27/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 8606 6542 7373, as per #18 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (Roberts, Melina)
May 28, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (4561) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(lb)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Summons, Complaint deemed filed on December 17, 2018, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Suit prepared in accordance with 22 CF 93.2 with a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330 and Affidavit of Translator (along with translations of the above documents) mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran Iman Khomeini Avenue Tehran, Iran ATTN: H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif on 3/27/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 8606 6542 7373, c/o the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (smc) (Main Document 18 replaced on 7/12/2019) (smc).
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom., (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy B. Fleming, #2 Exhibit Havlish Public Comments on USVSST Fund interpretations 6.29.16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint deemed filed on December 17, 2018, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Suit prepared in accordance with 22 CF 93.2 with a copy of 28 U.S.C. 1330, Affidavit of Translator (Along with translations of the above documents) mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran at Imam, Khomeini Avenue. ATTN: Mohammad Javad Zarif on 2/20/2019 by Registered Mail tracking # RB596317516US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (smc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Robert Maxwell on behalf of Joan Aiello, Rozelda Bailey-Green, Madlene Brown, Tara Butzbaugh, Jacobo Castro, Catherine A Chiola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Roger Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Roger Fisher), Catherine A Chiola(individually, as surviving sibling of John Roger Fisher), Sarah DeSimone(individually, as surviving child of Catherine Fagan), Sarah DeSimone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Catherine Fagan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Catherine Fagan), Bernice Dawn Dillard, John R Eichler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John E. Eichler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John E. Eichler), John R Eichler (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret L. Eichler, deceased, the late spouse of John E. Eichler), Catherine M Eklund, Catherine Ericson, Helen Carole Ericson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ulf Ramm Ericson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Helen Carole Ericson(individually, as surviving spouse of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Alexis Feliciano, Amanda Feliciano, Isaac Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of Rose Maria Feliciano), Isaac Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Rose Maria Feliciano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Rose Maria Feliciano), Bridget E Fisher, Christina D Fisher, Evan H Fisher, John Fisher(as Personal Representatives of the Estate of John F. Fisher, deceased, the late parent of Andrew Fisher), John Fisher(individually, as surviving sibling of Andrew Fisher), Kyle Fisher, Maria R Fisher, Marie E Fisher, Nina A Fisher, Nina Fisher, Peter Fisher, Ryan P Fisher, Tina M Fisher, Kylie Eve Florio, Michael J Florio, Shari Florio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Florio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John J. Florio), Shari Florio(individually, as surviving spouse of John J. Florio), David Fogel, Joseph Francis, Selma M Friedman, Darril Garo, Obed Garo, Brenda Garrett, Christopher Geis, James P Geis, Norma Geraghty, Dawn Gonzalez(individually, as surviving sibling of Jenine Gonzalez), Dawn Gonzalez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jenine Gonzalez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jenine Gonzalez), Brenda S Goody(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Harry Goody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Harry Goody), Brenda S Goody(individually, as surviving spouse of Harry Goody), Jonathan Goody, Alexis Goody-Harding, Adilakshumma Gopu, Deepa R Gopu(individually, as surviving sibling of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Deepa R Gopu(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Venkata Subba Reddy Gopu, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Michael T Griffin, Frances Grouzalis, Paul Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herman W. Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas W Hall, Shawn C Hall, Talat Hamdani, Arthur Harris(individually, as surviving parent of Peggie Hurt), Arthur Harris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Peggie Hurt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Peggie Hurt), Edith Otelia Harris, Anne Marie Hartney, Valestine Henderson, David D Henwood, Jr, Mary L Henwood, Mary C Henwood, David D Henwood, III, Robert Hofmiller, Gregory Hrycak, Rachel James, Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim), Chang Don Kim(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Soh Ryang Kim, deceased, the late parent of Lawrence Don Kim), Stephanie E Lang(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Andrew Fisher), Stephanie E Lang(individually, as surviving spouse of Andrew Fisher), Kathryn Nesbit, Amy Radin, Erin N Siegel, Andrea Statuter, Andrea Stauter(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward T. Earhart, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward T. Earhart), Andrea Stauter(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charlotte Earhart, deceased, the late parent of Edward T. Earhart), Donna Struzzieri(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Gary, deceased, the late parent of Bruce Gary), Donna Struzzieri(individually, as surviving sibling of Bruce Gary), Margaret Ann Williams, Christine Sandra Wilson, Carlene Wynn, Katherine Wynn, Patrick T Wynn. (Maxwell, Nicholas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kanishka Agarwala on behalf of Joan Aiello, Rozelda Bailey-Green, Madlene Brown, Tara Butzbaugh, Jacobo Castro, Catherine A Chiola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Roger Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Roger Fisher), Catherine A Chiola(individually, as surviving sibling of John Roger Fisher), Sarah DeSimone(individually, as surviving child of Catherine Fagan), Sarah DeSimone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Catherine Fagan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Catherine Fagan), Bernice Dawn Dillard, John R Eichler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John E. Eichler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John E. Eichler), John R Eichler (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret L. Eichler, deceased, the late spouse of John E. Eichler), Catherine M Eklund, Catherine Ericson, Helen Carole Ericson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ulf Ramm Ericson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Helen Carole Ericson(individually, as surviving spouse of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Alexis Feliciano, Amanda Feliciano, Isaac Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of Rose Maria Feliciano), Isaac Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Rose Maria Feliciano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Rose Maria Feliciano), Bridget E Fisher, Christina D Fisher, Evan H Fisher, John Fisher(as Personal Representatives of the Estate of John F. Fisher, deceased, the late parent of Andrew Fisher), John Fisher(individually, as surviving sibling of Andrew Fisher), Kyle Fisher, Maria R Fisher, Marie E Fisher, Nina A Fisher, Nina Fisher, Peter Fisher, Ryan P Fisher, Tina M Fisher, Kylie Eve Florio, Michael J Florio, Shari Florio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Florio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John J. Florio), Shari Florio(individually, as surviving spouse of John J. Florio), David Fogel, Joseph Francis, Selma M Friedman, Darril Garo, Obed Garo, Brenda Garrett, Christopher Geis, James P Geis, Norma Geraghty, Dawn Gonzalez(individually, as surviving sibling of Jenine Gonzalez), Dawn Gonzalez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jenine Gonzalez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jenine Gonzalez), Brenda S Goody(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Harry Goody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Harry Goody), Brenda S Goody(individually, as surviving spouse of Harry Goody), Jonathan Goody, Alexis Goody-Harding, Adilakshumma Gopu, Deepa R Gopu(individually, as surviving sibling of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Deepa R Gopu(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Venkata Subba Reddy Gopu, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Michael T Griffin, Frances Grouzalis, Paul Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herman W. Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas W Hall, Shawn C Hall, Talat Hamdani, Arthur Harris(individually, as surviving parent of Peggie Hurt), Arthur Harris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Peggie Hurt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Peggie Hurt), Edith Otelia Harris, Anne Marie Hartney, Valestine Henderson, David D Henwood, Jr, Mary L Henwood, Mary C Henwood, David D Henwood, III, Robert Hofmiller, Gregory Hrycak, Rachel James, Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim), Chang Don Kim(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Soh Ryang Kim, deceased, the late parent of Lawrence Don Kim), Stephanie E Lang(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Andrew Fisher), Stephanie E Lang(individually, as surviving spouse of Andrew Fisher), Kathryn Nesbit, Amy Radin, Erin N Siegel, Andrea Statuter, Andrea Stauter(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward T. Earhart, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward T. Earhart), Andrea Stauter(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charlotte Earhart, deceased, the late parent of Edward T. Earhart), Donna Struzzieri(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Gary, deceased, the late parent of Bruce Gary), Donna Struzzieri(individually, as surviving sibling of Bruce Gary), Margaret Ann Williams, Christine Sandra Wilson, Carlene Wynn, Katherine Wynn, Patrick T Wynn. (Agarwala, Kanishka)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Joan Aiello, Rozelda Bailey-Green, Madlene Brown, Tara Butzbaugh, Jacobo Castro, Catherine A Chiola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Roger Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Roger Fisher), Catherine A Chiola(individually, as surviving sibling of John Roger Fisher), Sarah DeSimone(individually, as surviving child of Catherine Fagan), Sarah DeSimone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Catherine Fagan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Catherine Fagan), Bernice Dawn Dillard, John R Eichler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John E. Eichler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John E. Eichler), John R Eichler (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret L. Eichler, deceased, the late spouse of John E. Eichler), Catherine M Eklund, Catherine Ericson, Helen Carole Ericson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ulf Ramm Ericson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Helen Carole Ericson(individually, as surviving spouse of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Alexis Feliciano, Amanda Feliciano, Isaac Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of Rose Maria Feliciano), Isaac Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Rose Maria Feliciano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Rose Maria Feliciano), Bridget E Fisher, Christina D Fisher, Evan H Fisher, John Fisher(as Personal Representatives of the Estate of John F. Fisher, deceased, the late parent of Andrew Fisher), John Fisher(individually, as surviving sibling of Andrew Fisher), Kyle Fisher, Maria R Fisher, Marie E Fisher, Nina A Fisher, Nina Fisher, Peter Fisher, Ryan P Fisher, Tina M Fisher, Kylie Eve Florio, Michael J Florio, Shari Florio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Florio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John J. Florio), Shari Florio(individually, as surviving spouse of John J. Florio), David Fogel, Joseph Francis, Selma M Friedman, Darril Garo, Obed Garo, Brenda Garrett, Christopher Geis, James P Geis, Norma Geraghty, Dawn Gonzalez(individually, as surviving sibling of Jenine Gonzalez), Dawn Gonzalez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jenine Gonzalez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jenine Gonzalez), Brenda S Goody(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Harry Goody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Harry Goody), Brenda S Goody(individually, as surviving spouse of Harry Goody), Jonathan Goody, Alexis Goody-Harding, Adilakshumma Gopu, Deepa R Gopu(individually, as surviving sibling of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Deepa R Gopu(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Venkata Subba Reddy Gopu, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Michael T Griffin, Frances Grouzalis, Paul Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herman W. Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas W Hall, Shawn C Hall, Talat Hamdani, Arthur Harris(individually, as surviving parent of Peggie Hurt), Arthur Harris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Peggie Hurt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Peggie Hurt), Edith Otelia Harris, Anne Marie Hartney, Valestine Henderson, David D Henwood, Jr, Mary L Henwood, Mary C Henwood, David D Henwood, III, Robert Hofmiller, Gregory Hrycak, Rachel James, Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim), Chang Don Kim(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Soh Ryang Kim, deceased, the late parent of Lawrence Don Kim), Stephanie E Lang(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Andrew Fisher), Stephanie E Lang(individually, as surviving spouse of Andrew Fisher), Kathryn Nesbit, Amy Radin, Erin N Siegel, Andrea Statuter, Andrea Stauter(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward T. Earhart, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward T. Earhart), Andrea Stauter(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charlotte Earhart, deceased, the late parent of Edward T. Earhart), Donna Struzzieri(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Gary, deceased, the late parent of Bruce Gary), Donna Struzzieri(individually, as surviving sibling of Bruce Gary), Margaret Ann Williams, Christine Sandra Wilson, Carlene Wynn, Katherine Wynn, Patrick T Wynn. (Strong, Bruce)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 19, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 19, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (dnh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Joan Aiello, Rozelda Bailey-Green, Madlene Brown, Tara Butzbaugh, Jacobo Castro, Catherine A Chiola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Roger Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Roger Fisher), Catherine A Chiola(individually, as surviving sibling of John Roger Fisher), Sarah DeSimone(individually, as surviving child of Catherine Fagan), Sarah DeSimone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Catherine Fagan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Catherine Fagan), Bernice Dawn Dillard, John R Eichler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John E. Eichler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John E. Eichler), John R Eichler (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret L. Eichler, deceased, the late spouse of John E. Eichler), Catherine M Eklund, Catherine Ericson, Helen Carole Ericson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ulf Ramm Ericson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Helen Carole Ericson(individually, as surviving spouse of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Alexis Feliciano, Amanda Feliciano, Isaac Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of Rose Maria Feliciano), Isaac Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Rose Maria Feliciano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Rose Maria Feliciano), Bridget E Fisher, Christina D Fisher, Evan H Fisher, John Fisher(as Personal Representatives of the Estate of John F. Fisher, deceased, the late parent of Andrew Fisher), John Fisher(individually, as surviving sibling of Andrew Fisher), Kyle Fisher, Maria R Fisher, Marie E Fisher, Nina A Fisher, Nina Fisher, Peter Fisher, Ryan P Fisher, Tina M Fisher, Kylie Eve Florio, Michael J Florio, Shari Florio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Florio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John J. Florio), Shari Florio(individually, as surviving spouse of John J. Florio), David Fogel, Joseph Francis, Selma M Friedman, Darril Garo, Obed Garo, Brenda Garrett, Christopher Geis, James P Geis, Norma Geraghty, Dawn Gonzalez(individually, as surviving sibling of Jenine Gonzalez), Dawn Gonzalez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jenine Gonzalez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jenine Gonzalez), Brenda S Goody(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Harry Goody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Harry Goody), Brenda S Goody(individually, as surviving spouse of Harry Goody), Jonathan Goody, Alexis Goody-Harding, Adilakshumma Gopu, Deepa R Gopu(individually, as surviving sibling of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Deepa R Gopu(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Venkata Subba Reddy Gopu, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Michael T Griffin, Frances Grouzalis, Paul Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herman W. Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas W Hall, Shawn C Hall, Talat Hamdani, Arthur Harris(individually, as surviving parent of Peggie Hurt), Arthur Harris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Peggie Hurt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Peggie Hurt), Edith Otelia Harris, Anne Marie Hartney, Valestine Henderson, David D Henwood, Jr, Mary L Henwood, Mary C Henwood, David D Henwood, III, Robert Hofmiller, Gregory Hrycak, Rachel James, Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim), Chang Don Kim(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Soh Ryang Kim, deceased, the late parent of Lawrence Don Kim), Stephanie E Lang(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Andrew Fisher), Stephanie E Lang(individually, as surviving spouse of Andrew Fisher), Kathryn Nesbit, Amy Radin, Erin N Siegel, Andrea Statuter, Andrea Stauter(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward T. Earhart, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward T. Earhart), Andrea Stauter(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charlotte Earhart, deceased, the late parent of Edward T. Earhart), Donna Struzzieri(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Gary, deceased, the late parent of Bruce Gary), Donna Struzzieri(individually, as surviving sibling of Bruce Gary), Margaret Ann Williams, Christine Sandra Wilson, Carlene Wynn, Katherine Wynn, Patrick T Wynn.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Joan Aiello, Rozelda Bailey-Green, Madlene Brown, Tara Butzbaugh, Jacobo Castro, Catherine A Chiola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Roger Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Roger Fisher), Catherine A Chiola(individually, as surviving sibling of John Roger Fisher), Sarah DeSimone(individually, as surviving child of Catherine Fagan), Sarah DeSimone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Catherine Fagan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Catherine Fagan), Bernice Dawn Dillard, John R Eichler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John E. Eichler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John E. Eichler), John R Eichler (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret L. Eichler, deceased, the late spouse of John E. Eichler), Catherine M Eklund, Catherine Ericson, Helen Carole Ericson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ulf Ramm Ericson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Helen Carole Ericson(individually, as surviving spouse of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Alexis Feliciano, Amanda Feliciano, Isaac Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of Rose Maria Feliciano), Isaac Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Rose Maria Feliciano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Rose Maria Feliciano), Bridget E Fisher, Christina D Fisher, Evan H Fisher, John Fisher(as Personal Representatives of the Estate of John F. Fisher, deceased, the late parent of Andrew Fisher), John Fisher(individually, as surviving sibling of Andrew Fisher), Kyle Fisher, Maria R Fisher, Marie E Fisher, Nina A Fisher, Nina Fisher, Peter Fisher, Ryan P Fisher, Tina M Fisher, Kylie Eve Florio, Michael J Florio, Shari Florio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Florio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John J. Florio), Shari Florio(individually, as surviving spouse of John J. Florio), David Fogel, Joseph Francis, Selma M Friedman, Darril Garo, Obed Garo, Brenda Garrett, Christopher Geis, James P Geis, Norma Geraghty, Dawn Gonzalez(individually, as surviving sibling of Jenine Gonzalez), Dawn Gonzalez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jenine Gonzalez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jenine Gonzalez), Brenda S Goody(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Harry Goody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Harry Goody), Brenda S Goody(individually, as surviving spouse of Harry Goody), Jonathan Goody, Alexis Goody-Harding, Adilakshumma Gopu, Deepa R Gopu(individually, as surviving sibling of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Deepa R Gopu(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Venkata Subba Reddy Gopu, Jennifer Green, Joe Green, Michael T Griffin, Frances Grouzalis, Paul Gyulavary, Bebe Hafiz, Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herman W. Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Douglas W Hall, Shawn C Hall, Talat Hamdani, Arthur Harris(individually, as surviving parent of Peggie Hurt), Arthur Harris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Peggie Hurt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Peggie Hurt), Edith Otelia Harris, Anne Marie Hartney, Valestine Henderson, David D Henwood, Jr, Mary L Henwood, Mary C Henwood, David D Henwood, III, Robert Hofmiller, Gregory Hrycak, Rachel James, Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim), Chang Don Kim(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Soh Ryang Kim, deceased, the late parent of Lawrence Don Kim), Stephanie E Lang(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Andrew Fisher), Stephanie E Lang(individually, as surviving spouse of Andrew Fisher), Kathryn Nesbit, Amy Radin, Erin N Siegel, Andrea Statuter, Andrea Stauter(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward T. Earhart, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward T. Earhart), Andrea Stauter(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charlotte Earhart, deceased, the late parent of Edward T. Earhart), Donna Struzzieri(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Gary, deceased, the late parent of Bruce Gary), Donna Struzzieri(individually, as surviving sibling of Bruce Gary), Margaret Ann Williams, Christine Sandra Wilson, Carlene Wynn, Katherine Wynn, Patrick T Wynn. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16069589)Document filed by Ryan P Fisher, Evan H Fisher, Carlene Wynn, Stephanie E Lang(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Andrew Fisher), Jennifer Green, Douglas W Hall, John R Eichler (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret L. Eichler, deceased, the late spouse of John E. Eichler), Mary L Henwood, John Fisher(as Personal Representatives of the Estate of John F. Fisher, deceased, the late parent of Andrew Fisher), Amanda Feliciano, Shawn C Hall, Isaac Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of Rose Maria Feliciano), Joseph Francis, Brenda S Goody(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Harry Goody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Harry Goody), Valestine Henderson, Arthur Harris(individually, as surviving parent of Peggie Hurt), John Fisher(individually, as surviving sibling of Andrew Fisher), Jonathan Goody, Darril Garo, Adilakshumma Gopu, Stephanie E Lang(individually, as surviving spouse of Andrew Fisher), Rachel James, Edith Otelia Harris, Helen Carole Ericson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ulf Ramm Ericson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Catherine A Chiola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Roger Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Roger Fisher), Kyle Fisher, Catherine Ericson, Katherine Wynn, Catherine M Eklund, Donna Struzzieri(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Alice Gary, deceased, the late parent of Bruce Gary), Brenda Garrett, Mary C Henwood, Jacobo Castro, Michael T Griffin, Peter Fisher, James P Geis, Shari Florio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Florio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John J. Florio), Joe Green, Deepa R Gopu(individually, as surviving sibling of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Michael J Florio, Sarah DeSimone(individually, as surviving child of Catherine Fagan), Anne Marie Hartney, David D Henwood, III, Dawn Gonzalez(individually, as surviving sibling of Jenine Gonzalez), Venkata Subba Reddy Gopu, Alexis Goody-Harding, Amy Radin, Talat Hamdani, Frances Grouzalis, Margaret Ann Williams, David D Henwood, Jr, Alexis Feliciano, Rozelda Bailey-Green, Brenda S Goody(individually, as surviving spouse of Harry Goody), Paul Gyulavary, Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herman W. Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Bebe Hafiz, Chang Don Kim(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Soh Ryang Kim, deceased, the late parent of Lawrence Don Kim), Isaac Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Rose Maria Feliciano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Rose Maria Feliciano), Chang Don Kim(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Lawrence Don Kim, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lawrence Don Kim), Christine Sandra Wilson, Catherine A Chiola(individually, as surviving sibling of John Roger Fisher), Robert Hofmiller, Nina Fisher, Nina A Fisher, Gregory Hrycak, Bernice Dawn Dillard, Kylie Eve Florio, Kathryn Nesbit, Deepa R Gopu(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kiran Kumar Reddy Gopu), Douglas Hall(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Hall, deceased, the late parent of Richard Hall), Christopher Geis, Maria R Fisher, Dawn Gonzalez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jenine Gonzalez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jenine Gonzalez), Tara Butzbaugh, Christina D Fisher, David Fogel, Selma M Friedman, Marie E Fisher, Sarah DeSimone(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Catherine Fagan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Catherine Fagan), Madlene Brown, John R Eichler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John E. Eichler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John E. Eichler), Arthur Harris(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Peggie Hurt, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Peggie Hurt), Andrea Stauter(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward T. Earhart, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward T. Earhart), Erin N Siegel, Obed Garo, Helen Carole Ericson(individually, as surviving spouse of Ulf Ramm Ericson), Norma Geraghty, Donna Struzzieri(individually, as surviving sibling of Bruce Gary), Joan Aiello, Shari Florio(individually, as surviving spouse of John J. Florio), Andrea Stauter(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charlotte Earhart, deceased, the late parent of Edward T. Earhart), Bridget E Fisher, Tina M Fisher, Patrick T Wynn, Andrea Statuter.(Goldman, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Stauter
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Gonzalez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rozelda Bailey-Green
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacobo Castro
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Statuter
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria R Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deepa R Gopu
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Geis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darril Garo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan P Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hall
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Grouzalis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venkata Subba Reddy Gopu
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Ericson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Radin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina D Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Ann Williams
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Harris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Dawn Dillard
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Struzzieri
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hofmiller
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Florio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Nesbit
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Sandra Wilson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Feliciano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Otelia Harris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Carole Ericson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie E Lang
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Garrett
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Florio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chang Don Kim
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Represented By: Vianny Maria Pichardo
Represented By: Jeffrey E Glen
Represented By: Stephen Wah
Represented By: Samantha Emily Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine M Eklund
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlene Wynn
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget E Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valestine Henderson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obed Garo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Marie Hartney
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Butzbaugh
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel James
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Geraghty
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bebe Hafiz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina A Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick T Wynn
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie Eve Florio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D Henwood, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Aiello
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hrycak
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fogel
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Wynn
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Eichler
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin N Siegel
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T Griffin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan H Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D Henwood, III
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gyulavary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Goody
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda S Goody
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Feliciano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Feliciano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah DeSimone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talat Hamdani
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Goody-Harding
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Francis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L Henwood
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selma M Friedman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie E Fisher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine A Chiola
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Green
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas W Hall
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adilakshumma Gopu
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P Geis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn C Hall
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary C Henwood
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madlene Brown
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Green
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Kiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?