Moody-Theinert et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Ida Riese, Rosa Occhicone, Daniel B Ploger, Deborah Palmer, Ralph Parkes, Dana M Runfola, Portia Morales, Brian Perez, Daniel T Phelan, Estrellita Sanchez, Zena T. Wilderman, Zaneta Frances Flores, Genoveffa Palmieri, Wayne David Ploger, Wendy L Ploger, Gregory Fiehrer Ploger, Anya Parkes, Kimberly Phelan, Antonio Perez, Savlatore L Pepe, Wendy Lynn Ploger, Sonia Lowe, Mark S Raines, Dianne Lynn Hudder, Alyssa Palmer, Joseph Raines, Kenneth J Phelan, Jr., Erin Phelan, Gloria Reinholtz, Wayne D Ploger, Catherine Ng-Pepe, JoAnn Boutureira, Alfia L. Gilligan, Lesli Rice, Sherwin Morales, Maria Perez, Michael Richard, Patricia Phelan-Byrnes, James H Kenworthy, Teresa J Pycior, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero, Scott Perez, William O Kenworthy, Shannon Moran, Alex M Patrocino, Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg, Olivia Vilardi-Perez, Paola Cepeda, Michael Murray, Keith Palmer, Jeanine Rao, Deirdre Moody, Mary Phelan-Cox, Gilbert Norman Flores, Duane Orloske, Marianne Ploger Hill, Elizabeth O Kenworthy, Robert M Peterson, Jessica Moody, Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Marguerite Ploger, Leonida R Pepe, John Capodanno, Rosemary Pepe, David Potorti, Patricia Mulligan, Gerald Thomas Flores, Jose Ottenwalder, Sean Moody, Felipe Oyola, Zenda F Gutierrez-Klingberg, Patrizia Davis, Mark A Jonas, Maureen Moody-Theinert, Monique Powell, Anna Faustini, Erin Cherubin, Zenda Gutierrez and Estrellita Ortiz
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2018cv11876
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Robert Maxwell on behalf of JoAnn Boutureira, John Capodanno, Paola Cepeda, Erin Cherubin, Patrizia Davis, Anna Faustini, Gerald Thomas Flores, Gilbert Norman Flores, Zaneta Frances Flores, Alfia L. Gilligan, Zenda Gutierrez, Zenda F Gutierrez-Klingberg, Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Marianne Ploger Hill, Dianne Lynn Hudder, Mark A Jonas, Elizabeth O Kenworthy, James H Kenworthy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Virginia Ormiston, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Virginia Ormiston), James H Kenworthy(individually, as surviving spouse of Virginia Ormiston), William O Kenworthy, Sonia Lowe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Parkes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Parkes), Sonia Lowe(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Parkes), Deirdre Moody, Jessica Moody, Sean Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Portia Morales, Sherwin Morales, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Michael Murray, Catherine Ng-Pepe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore F. Pepe, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore F. Pepe), Catherine Ng-Pepe(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore F. Pepe), Rosa Occhicone, Duane Orloske, Jose Ottenwalder, Felipe Oyola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Adianes Oyola, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Adianes Oyola), Felipe Oyola(individually, as surviving spouse of Adianes Oyola), Alyssa Palmer, Deborah Palmer(individually, as surviving spouse of Orio J. Palmer), Deborah Palmer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Orio J. Palmer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Orio J. Palmer), Keith Palmer, Genoveffa Palmieri, Anya Parkes, Ralph Parkes, Alex M Patrocino, Leonida R Pepe, Savlatore L Pepe, Rosemary Pepe, Antonio Perez, Brian Perez, Maria Perez, Scott Perez, Robert M Peterson, Daniel T Phelan, Erin Phelan, Kenneth J Phelan, Jr, Kimberly Phelan, Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Phelan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth Phelan), Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(individually, as surviving parent of Kenneth Phelan), Mary Phelan-Cox, Daniel B Ploger, Gregory Fiehrer Ploger, Marguerite Ploger, Wayne David Ploger, Wayne D Ploger, Wendy Lynn Ploger(individually, as surviving child of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy Lynn Ploger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert R. Ploger III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy L Ploger, David Potorti, Monique Powell, Teresa J Pycior(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph J. Pycior, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph J. Pycior), Teresa J Pycior(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph J. Pycior), Joseph Raines, Mark S Raines, Jeanine Rao(individually, as surviving sibling of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mario Nardone, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Nardone, deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Gloria Reinholtz, Lesli Rice, Michael Richard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Cecelia E. Richard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Cecelia E. Richard), Michael Richard(individually, as surviving spouse of Cecelia E. Richard), Ida Riese(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gloria Raines, deceased, the late parent of Harry Raines), Ida Riese(individually, as surviving sibling of Harry Raines), Dana M Runfola, Estrellita Sanchez(individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Ortiz Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(as Natural Guardian of RBO, a minor, as surviving child of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Olivia Vilardi-Perez, Zena T. Wilderman. (Maxwell, Nicholas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of JoAnn Boutureira, John Capodanno, Paola Cepeda, Erin Cherubin, Patrizia Davis, Anna Faustini, Gerald Thomas Flores, Gilbert Norman Flores, Zaneta Frances Flores, Alfia L. Gilligan, Zenda Gutierrez, Zenda F Gutierrez-Klingberg, Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Marianne Ploger Hill, Dianne Lynn Hudder, Mark A Jonas, Elizabeth O Kenworthy, James H Kenworthy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Virginia Ormiston, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Virginia Ormiston), James H Kenworthy(individually, as surviving spouse of Virginia Ormiston), William O Kenworthy, Sonia Lowe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Parkes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Parkes), Sonia Lowe(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Parkes), Deirdre Moody, Jessica Moody, Sean Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Portia Morales, Sherwin Morales, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Michael Murray, Catherine Ng-Pepe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore F. Pepe, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore F. Pepe), Catherine Ng-Pepe(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore F. Pepe), Rosa Occhicone, Duane Orloske, Jose Ottenwalder, Felipe Oyola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Adianes Oyola, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Adianes Oyola), Felipe Oyola(individually, as surviving spouse of Adianes Oyola), Alyssa Palmer, Deborah Palmer(individually, as surviving spouse of Orio J. Palmer), Deborah Palmer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Orio J. Palmer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Orio J. Palmer), Keith Palmer, Genoveffa Palmieri, Anya Parkes, Ralph Parkes, Alex M Patrocino, Leonida R Pepe, Savlatore L Pepe, Rosemary Pepe, Antonio Perez, Brian Perez, Maria Perez, Scott Perez, Robert M Peterson, Daniel T Phelan, Erin Phelan, Kenneth J Phelan, Jr, Kimberly Phelan, Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Phelan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth Phelan), Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(individually, as surviving parent of Kenneth Phelan), Mary Phelan-Cox, Daniel B Ploger, Gregory Fiehrer Ploger, Marguerite Ploger, Wayne David Ploger, Wayne D Ploger, Wendy Lynn Ploger(individually, as surviving child of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy Lynn Ploger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert R. Ploger III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy L Ploger, David Potorti, Monique Powell, Teresa J Pycior(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph J. Pycior, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph J. Pycior), Teresa J Pycior(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph J. Pycior), Joseph Raines, Mark S Raines, Jeanine Rao(individually, as surviving sibling of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mario Nardone, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Nardone, deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Gloria Reinholtz, Lesli Rice, Michael Richard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Cecelia E. Richard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Cecelia E. Richard), Michael Richard(individually, as surviving spouse of Cecelia E. Richard), Ida Riese(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gloria Raines, deceased, the late parent of Harry Raines), Ida Riese(individually, as surviving sibling of Harry Raines), Dana M Runfola, Estrellita Sanchez(individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Ortiz Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(as Natural Guardian of RBO, a minor, as surviving child of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Olivia Vilardi-Perez, Zena T. Wilderman. (Strong, Bruce)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kanishka Agarwala on behalf of JoAnn Boutureira, John Capodanno, Paola Cepeda, Erin Cherubin, Patrizia Davis, Anna Faustini, Gerald Thomas Flores, Gilbert Norman Flores, Zaneta Frances Flores, Alfia L. Gilligan, Zenda Gutierrez, Zenda F Gutierrez-Klingberg, Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Marianne Ploger Hill, Dianne Lynn Hudder, Mark A Jonas, Elizabeth O Kenworthy, James H Kenworthy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Virginia Ormiston, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Virginia Ormiston), James H Kenworthy(individually, as surviving spouse of Virginia Ormiston), William O Kenworthy, Sonia Lowe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Parkes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Parkes), Sonia Lowe(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Parkes), Deirdre Moody, Jessica Moody, Sean Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Portia Morales, Sherwin Morales, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Michael Murray, Catherine Ng-Pepe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore F. Pepe, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore F. Pepe), Catherine Ng-Pepe(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore F. Pepe), Rosa Occhicone, Duane Orloske, Jose Ottenwalder, Felipe Oyola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Adianes Oyola, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Adianes Oyola), Felipe Oyola(individually, as surviving spouse of Adianes Oyola), Alyssa Palmer, Deborah Palmer(individually, as surviving spouse of Orio J. Palmer), Deborah Palmer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Orio J. Palmer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Orio J. Palmer), Keith Palmer, Genoveffa Palmieri, Anya Parkes, Ralph Parkes, Alex M Patrocino, Leonida R Pepe, Savlatore L Pepe, Rosemary Pepe, Antonio Perez, Brian Perez, Maria Perez, Scott Perez, Robert M Peterson, Daniel T Phelan, Erin Phelan, Kenneth J Phelan, Jr, Kimberly Phelan, Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Phelan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth Phelan), Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(individually, as surviving parent of Kenneth Phelan), Mary Phelan-Cox, Daniel B Ploger, Gregory Fiehrer Ploger, Marguerite Ploger, Wayne David Ploger, Wayne D Ploger, Wendy Lynn Ploger(individually, as surviving child of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy Lynn Ploger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert R. Ploger III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy L Ploger, David Potorti, Monique Powell, Teresa J Pycior(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph J. Pycior, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph J. Pycior), Teresa J Pycior(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph J. Pycior), Joseph Raines, Mark S Raines, Jeanine Rao(individually, as surviving sibling of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mario Nardone, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Nardone, deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Gloria Reinholtz, Lesli Rice, Michael Richard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Cecelia E. Richard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Cecelia E. Richard), Michael Richard(individually, as surviving spouse of Cecelia E. Richard), Ida Riese(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gloria Raines, deceased, the late parent of Harry Raines), Ida Riese(individually, as surviving sibling of Harry Raines), Dana M Runfola, Estrellita Sanchez(individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Ortiz Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(as Natural Guardian of RBO, a minor, as surviving child of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Olivia Vilardi-Perez, Zena T. Wilderman. (Agarwala, Kanishka)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03-md-01570. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Estrellita Sanchez. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by JoAnn Boutureira, John Capodanno, Paola Cepeda, Erin Cherubin, Patrizia Davis, Anna Faustini, Gerald Thomas Flores, Gilbert Norman Flores, Zaneta Frances Flores, Alfia L. Gilligan, Zenda Gutierrez, Zenda F Gutierrez-Klingberg, Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Marianne Ploger Hill, Dianne Lynn Hudder, Mark A Jonas, Elizabeth O Kenworthy, James H Kenworthy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Virginia Ormiston, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Virginia Ormiston), James H Kenworthy(individually, as surviving spouse of Virginia Ormiston), William O Kenworthy, Sonia Lowe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Parkes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Parkes), Sonia Lowe(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Parkes), Deirdre Moody, Jessica Moody, Sean Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Portia Morales, Sherwin Morales, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Michael Murray, Catherine Ng-Pepe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore F. Pepe, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore F. Pepe), Catherine Ng-Pepe(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore F. Pepe), Rosa Occhicone, Duane Orloske, Jose Ottenwalder, Felipe Oyola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Adianes Oyola, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Adianes Oyola), Felipe Oyola(individually, as surviving spouse of Adianes Oyola), Alyssa Palmer, Deborah Palmer(individually, as surviving spouse of Orio J. Palmer), Deborah Palmer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Orio J. Palmer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Orio J. Palmer), Keith Palmer, Genoveffa Palmieri, Anya Parkes, Ralph Parkes, Alex M Patrocino, Leonida R Pepe, Savlatore L Pepe, Rosemary Pepe, Antonio Perez, Brian Perez, Maria Perez, Scott Perez, Robert M Peterson, Daniel T Phelan, Erin Phelan, Kenneth J Phelan, Jr, Kimberly Phelan, Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Phelan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth Phelan), Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(individually, as surviving parent of Kenneth Phelan), Mary Phelan-Cox, Daniel B Ploger, Gregory Fiehrer Ploger, Marguerite Ploger, Wayne David Ploger, Wayne D Ploger, Wendy Lynn Ploger(individually, as surviving child of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy Lynn Ploger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert R. Ploger III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy L Ploger, David Potorti, Monique Powell, Teresa J Pycior(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph J. Pycior, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph J. Pycior), Teresa J Pycior(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph J. Pycior), Joseph Raines, Mark S Raines, Jeanine Rao(individually, as surviving sibling of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mario Nardone, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Nardone, deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Gloria Reinholtz, Lesli Rice, Michael Richard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Cecelia E. Richard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Cecelia E. Richard), Michael Richard(individually, as surviving spouse of Cecelia E. Richard), Ida Riese(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gloria Raines, deceased, the late parent of Harry Raines), Ida Riese(individually, as surviving sibling of Harry Raines), Dana M Runfola, Estrellita Sanchez(a/k/a Estrellita Ortiz, individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(a/k/a Estrellita Ortiz, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Ortiz Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(a/k/a Estrellita Ortiz, as Natural Guardian of RBO, a minor, as surviving child of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Olivia Vilardi-Perez, Zena T. Wilderman.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by JoAnn Boutureira, John Capodanno, Paola Cepeda, Erin Cherubin, Patrizia Davis, Anna Faustini, Gerald Thomas Flores, Gilbert Norman Flores, Zaneta Frances Flores, Alfia L. Gilligan, Zenda Gutierrez, Zenda F Gutierrez-Klingberg, Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Marianne Ploger Hill, Dianne Lynn Hudder, Mark A Jonas, Elizabeth O Kenworthy, James H Kenworthy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Virginia Ormiston, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Virginia Ormiston), James H Kenworthy(individually, as surviving spouse of Virginia Ormiston), William O Kenworthy, Sonia Lowe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Parkes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Parkes), Sonia Lowe(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Parkes), Deirdre Moody, Jessica Moody, Sean Moody, Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Portia Morales, Sherwin Morales, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Michael Murray, Catherine Ng-Pepe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore F. Pepe, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore F. Pepe), Catherine Ng-Pepe(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore F. Pepe), Rosa Occhicone, Duane Orloske, Jose Ottenwalder, Felipe Oyola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Adianes Oyola, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Adianes Oyola), Felipe Oyola(individually, as surviving spouse of Adianes Oyola), Alyssa Palmer, Deborah Palmer(individually, as surviving spouse of Orio J. Palmer), Deborah Palmer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Orio J. Palmer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Orio J. Palmer), Keith Palmer, Genoveffa Palmieri, Anya Parkes, Ralph Parkes, Alex M Patrocino, Leonida R Pepe, Savlatore L Pepe, Rosemary Pepe, Antonio Perez, Brian Perez, Maria Perez, Scott Perez, Robert M Peterson, Daniel T Phelan, Erin Phelan, Kenneth J Phelan, Jr, Kimberly Phelan, Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Phelan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth Phelan), Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(individually, as surviving parent of Kenneth Phelan), Mary Phelan-Cox, Daniel B Ploger, Gregory Fiehrer Ploger, Marguerite Ploger, Wayne David Ploger, Wayne D Ploger, Wendy Lynn Ploger(individually, as surviving child of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy Lynn Ploger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert R. Ploger III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert R. Ploger III), Wendy L Ploger, David Potorti, Monique Powell, Teresa J Pycior(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph J. Pycior, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph J. Pycior), Teresa J Pycior(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph J. Pycior), Joseph Raines, Mark S Raines, Jeanine Rao(individually, as surviving sibling of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mario Nardone, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Nardone, deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Gloria Reinholtz, Lesli Rice, Michael Richard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Cecelia E. Richard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Cecelia E. Richard), Michael Richard(individually, as surviving spouse of Cecelia E. Richard), Ida Riese(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gloria Raines, deceased, the late parent of Harry Raines), Ida Riese(individually, as surviving sibling of Harry Raines), Dana M Runfola, Estrellita Sanchez(a/k/a Estrellita Ortiz, individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(a/k/a Estrellita Ortiz, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Ortiz Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Estrellita Sanchez(a/k/a Estrellita Ortiz, as Natural Guardian of RBO, a minor, as surviving child of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Olivia Vilardi-Perez, Zena T. Wilderman. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16069911)Document filed by Deborah Palmer(individually, as surviving spouse of Orio J. Palmer), Felipe Oyola(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Adianes Oyola, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Adianes Oyola), Kenneth J Phelan, Jr, Duane Orloske, JoAnn Boutureira, Marianne Ploger Hill, Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paula E. Morales, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paula E. Morales), Estrellita Sanchez(a/k/a Estrellita Ortiz, individually, as surviving spouse of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Gilbert Norman Flores, Jeanine Rao(individually, as surviving sibling of Mario Nardone Jr.), Wayne David Ploger, Michael Murray, Catherine Ng-Pepe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore F. Pepe, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore F. Pepe), Brian Perez, Estrellita Sanchez(a/k/a Estrellita Ortiz, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul Ortiz Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul Ortiz Jr.), David Potorti, Zenda Gutierrez, Lesli Rice, Robert M Peterson, Daniel T Phelan, Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mario Nardone, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Gloria Reinholtz, Ida Riese(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gloria Raines, deceased, the late parent of Harry Raines), Portia Morales, Felipe Oyola(individually, as surviving spouse of Adianes Oyola), Alyssa Palmer, Shannon Moran(individually, as surviving child of Gerard Moran), Mark S Raines, Zenda F Gutierrez-Klingberg, Leonida R Pepe, Teresa J Pycior(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph J. Pycior, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph J. Pycior), Ida Riese(individually, as surviving sibling of Harry Raines), Wendy L Ploger, Mary Phelan-Cox, Jose Ottenwalder, Savlatore L Pepe, Sonia Lowe(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Parkes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Parkes), Kimberly Phelan, Michael Richard(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Cecelia E. Richard, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Cecelia E. Richard), Ralph Parkes, Shannon Moran(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerard Moran, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gerard Moran), Dianne Lynn Hudder, Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Frigo a/k/a Mary Catherine Brady, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Olivia Vilardi-Perez, Zaneta Frances Flores, Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Phelan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kenneth Phelan), Scott Perez, Wendy Lynn Ploger(individually, as surviving child of Robert R. Ploger III), Wayne D Ploger, Anna Faustini, Jeanine Rao(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Nardone, deceased, the late parent of Mario Nardone Jr.), Teresa J Pycior(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph J. Pycior), Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores), deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Erin Phelan, Antonio Perez, Wendy Lynn Ploger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert R. Ploger III, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert R. Ploger III), Marguerite Ploger, Daniel B Ploger, John Capodanno, Maureen Moody-Theinert(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas (Capt.) Moody, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Maureen Moody-Theinert(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas (Capt.) Moody), Joseph Raines, Paola Cepeda, Zena T. Wilderman, William O Kenworthy, Estrellita Sanchez(a/k/a Estrellita Ortiz, as Natural Guardian of RBO, a minor, as surviving child of Paul Ortiz Jr.), Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Zandra Marie Cooper Ploger (nee Flores)), Erin Cherubin, Anya Parkes, Patricia Mulligan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mulligan, deceased, the late parent of Dennis M. Mulligan), Gregory Fiehrer Ploger, Patricia Phelan-Byrnes(individually, as surviving parent of Kenneth Phelan), Rosemary Pepe, Elizabeth O Kenworthy, Maria Perez, Gerald Thomas Flores, James H Kenworthy(individually, as surviving spouse of Virginia Ormiston), Alex M Patrocino, Patrizia Davis, James H Kenworthy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Virginia Ormiston, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Virginia Ormiston), Alfia L. Gilligan, Michael Richard(individually, as surviving spouse of Cecelia E. Richard), Stephanie Morales-Guerrero(individually, as surviving child of Paula E. Morales), Monique Powell, Jessica Moody, Keith Palmer, Mark A Jonas, Sherwin Morales, Genoveffa Palmieri, Rosa Occhicone, Petal S Stanford-Sylvert, Sonia Lowe(individually, as surviving parent of Michael Parkes), Deirdre Moody, Deborah Palmer(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Orio J. Palmer, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Orio J. Palmer), Dana M Runfola, Catherine Ng-Pepe(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore F. Pepe), Sean Moody.(Goldman, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody-Theinert et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Riese
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Occhicone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel B Ploger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Palmer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Parkes
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana M Runfola
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portia Morales
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Perez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T Phelan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estrellita Sanchez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zena T. Wilderman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaneta Frances Flores
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genoveffa Palmieri
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne David Ploger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy L Ploger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Fiehrer Ploger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anya Parkes
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Phelan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Perez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savlatore L Pepe
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Lynn Ploger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Lowe
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S Raines
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Lynn Hudder
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Palmer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Raines
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth J Phelan, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Phelan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Reinholtz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne D Ploger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Ng-Pepe
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Boutureira
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfia L. Gilligan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesli Rice
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherwin Morales
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Perez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Richard
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Phelan-Byrnes
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Kenworthy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa J Pycior
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Morales-Guerrero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Perez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William O Kenworthy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Moran
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex M Patrocino
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenda Flores Gutierrez-Klingenberg
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Vilardi-Perez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Cepeda
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Murray
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Palmer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine Rao
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deirdre Moody
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Phelan-Cox
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Norman Flores
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Orloske
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Ploger Hill
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth O Kenworthy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M Peterson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Moody
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petal S Stanford-Sylvert
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Ploger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonida R Pepe
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Capodanno
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Pepe
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Potorti
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mulligan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Thomas Flores
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ottenwalder
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Moody
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Oyola
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenda F Gutierrez-Klingberg
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrizia Davis
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Jonas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Moody-Theinert
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Powell
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Faustini
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Cherubin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenda Gutierrez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estrellita Ortiz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Maxwell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Kanishka Agarwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?